Nesse v. Donegan
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 0:22-bk-11541
Lead BK case is: 0:22-bk-11541
Maryland Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Maria Ellena Chavez-Ruark |
Case #: | 0:24-ap-00020 |
Nature of Suit | 31 Bankruptcy - Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - §363(h) |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Mirza J. Donegan
16005 Daven Pine Court
Gaithersburg, MD 20878 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janet M. Nesse
6404 Ivy Lane Suite 820
Greenbelt, MD 20770 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP Hearing (Auto-Docket)
Sat 09/14 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/13/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
court
Notice of Hearing
Wed 09/11 2:12 PM
Notice of Hearing . Hearing scheduled for 10/2/2024 at 10:00 AM. In person hearing Courtroom 3-C Greenbelt, Judge Chavez-Ruark. (Whitfield, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Opposition
Tue 09/03 10:30 PM
Opposition on behalf of Janet M. Nesse Filed by Jeffrey M. Orenstein . (Orenstein, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Schedules | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Amended SOFA | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - IRS POC | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Comptroller POC | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4A - Comptroller Detail | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Joint Claim Complaint | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Defendant's Motion to Dismiss | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Withdrawal of Document
Fri 08/30 9:10 AM
Withdrawal of Document Filed by Mirza J. Donegan RE:19 Motion to Dismiss Count V, VI, VII, and IX filed by Defendant Mirza J. Donegan. (Alexander, Lisa) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss Document
Thu 08/29 10:43 AM
Motion to Dismiss Document Docket Entry No. 19 Filed by Mirza J. Donegan. (Lusby, Keith) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss Count
Wed 08/28 3:07 PM
Motion to Dismiss Count V, VI, VII, and IX Filed by Mirza J. Donegan. (Lusby, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 08/19 3:28 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by Mirza J. Donegan. (Lusby, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 | ||
Att: 6 Affidavit Affidavit of Mirza Donegan | ||
Att: 7 Affidavit Affidavit of Andrew Scott | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit of Andrew Scott | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit of Andrew Scott | ||
Att: 10 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 08/05 10:07 AM
Notice of Service regarding REsponses to Defendant's Discovery Requests . Filed by Janet M. Nesse. (Orenstein, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, June 19, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Service
Wed 06/19 6:15 PM
Notice of Service regarding Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures . Filed by Janet M. Nesse. (Orenstein, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Service
Fri 05/24 11:50 AM
Notice of Service regarding Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents . Filed by Janet M. Nesse. (Orenstein, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Auto-Docket)
Thu 03/28 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/27/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 03/25 1:49 PM
Scheduling Order . Expert Witness and Reports due by 4/22/2024 and exchange expert reports by 6/20/2024. Discovery due by 7/22/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 8/19/2024. Exhibit List, Exhibits, and List of Witnesses due by 10/21/2024. Written Objections to Exhibits due by 11/19/2024. Pre-Trial Memoranda due by 11/19/2024. Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/27/2024 at 10:00 AM by videoconference or teleconference. For hearing access information see www.mdb.uscourts.gov/hearings or call 410-962-2688. Trial date-1 set for 12/4/2024 at 10:00 AM at 6500 Cherrywood Lane, Courtroom 3C, Greenbelt, MD 20770. The parties estimated that the length of the trial will be one (1) day. Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7012-1, all parties have consented, or are deemed to have consented, to entry of final orders or judgments by the presiding bankruptcy judge. The parties shall comply with the initial disclosure requirements set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1). Any other party must make a counter-designation of other parts of the deposition transcript to be offered, as set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 32(a)(6), by 11/4/2024. Failure to comply with this Order may result in sanctions being imposed by the Court on the offending party, including but not limited to dismissal of the action. All parties are advised to review carefully Local Bankruptcy Rule 9037-1 concerning their obligations to limit the introduction of private information and to review transcripts to redact private information. The parties shall read, be familiar with, and comply with the Courts Protocol for In-Person Hearings (https://www.mdb.uscourts.gov/judges-info/judge/maria-ellena-chavez-ruark). (Horning, Kelly) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
apmisc
Rule 7026/Discovery Report
Mon 03/18 4:26 PM
General Provisions Governing Discovery - Rule 26 Report Filed by Jeffrey M. Orenstein. (Orenstein, Jeffrey) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/18 10:34 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Mirza J. Donegan. (Lusby, Keith) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Auto-Docket)
Sat 03/09 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/08/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Stipulation and Order
Wed 03/06 11:52 AM
Stipulation and Consent Order . (Horning, Kelly) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
apmisc
Stipulation
Tue 03/05 3:12 PM
Stipulation By Mirza J. Donegan and Plaintiff, Janet M. Nesse, and Defendant, Mirza J. Donegan Filed by Keith M. Lusby . (Lusby, Keith) |
|
Thursday, February 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 02/29 1:34 PM
Stipulation and Consent Order . (Horning, Kelly) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
court
Court Instruction
Mon 02/26 10:24 AM
Court Instruction- The defendant is directed to submit a proposed order that complies with Appendix H to the Local Bankruptcy Rules (see Section IV.B.1.) within five business days. . Responses due by 3/1/2024. (Horning, Kelly) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
apmisc
Stipulation
Thu 02/22 12:07 PM
Stipulation By Mirza J. Donegan and Plaintiff, Janet M. Nesse, and Defendant, Mizra J. Donegan Filed by Keith M. Lusby . (Lusby, Keith) |
|
Saturday, January 27, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP (Auto-Docket)
Sun 01/28 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/27/2024. (Admin.) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Affidavit of Summons Service
Sat 01/27 2:24 PM
Affidavit of Summons Service Executed on Mirza J. Donegan 1/27/2024. (Orenstein, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Thu 01/25 12:20 PM
Summons Issued on Mirza J. Donegan Date Issued 1/25/2024, Answer Due 2/26/2024 . Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/27/2024 at 10:00 AM by videoconference or teleconference. For hearing access information see www.mdb.uscourts.gov/hearings or call 410-962-2688. (Horning, Kelly) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Case Opening)
Fri 01/19 3:30 PM
Adversary case 24-00020 (31 (Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - 363(h))) Complaint by Jeffrey M. Orenstein on behalf of Janet Nesse against Mirza Donegan. The filing fee is DEFERRED - Plaintiff is the Trustee in the Bankruptcy case and will pay the fee to the extent that there is an estate. (Orenstein, Jeffrey) |