Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Leslie Abrams Gardner
Referred: Alfreda L Sheppard
Case #: 1:24-cv-00012
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2024
Terminated:Oct 30, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 90 minutes ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/14 8:04 AM
Case REASSIGNED to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALFREDA L SHEPPARD. Retired Mag Jdg JRS Thomas Q Langstaff no longer assigned to the case. (bcl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
21 21 misc Letter Fri 04/11 1:25 PM
Letter regarding outcome of Rule 59(E) Motion filed on November 16, 2024(mdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
20 20 order Judgment Wed 10/30 10:12 AM
JUDGMENT of dismissal. (bcl)
Related: [-]
19 19 6 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Wed 10/30 9:53 AM
ORDER adopting6 Report and Recommendations ; adopting12 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 10/30/2024. (bcl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/31 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Filing Summons by MARIO ROMOAN SULLIVAN(bcl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
17 17 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 07/17 11:51 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by MARIO ROMOAN SULLIVAN.. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(bcl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Tue 07/16 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Filing Summons by MARIO ROMOAN SULLIVAN(bcl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, June 21, 2024
15 15 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Fri 06/21 10:58 AM
OBJECTION to12 Report and Recommendations filed by MARIO ROMOAN SULLIVAN(bcl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, June 17, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 06/17 1:10 PM
ORDER granting13 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File OBJECTION to12 Report & Recommendation. Plaintiff's Objection is due by 7/5/2024. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 6/17/2024 (TQL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection Tue 06/11 1:58 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File OBJECTION as to12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Complaint, Filed by MARIO ROMOAN SULLIVAN.. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(bcl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
12 12 motion Report and Recommendation Tue 05/14 2:37 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re amended Complaint, filed by MARIO ROMOAN SULLIVAN. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 5/14/2024. (asb)
Related: [-]
11 11 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 05/14 2:24 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to File OBJECTION, which has already been filed. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 5/14/2024. (asb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
10 10 misc Letter Mon 05/13 11:51 AM
Letter from Plaintiff regarding article on Legionnaires Disease re9 Objection to Report and Recommendations.(bcl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
9 9 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Tue 04/09 12:56 PM
OBJECTION to6 Report and Recommendations filed by MARIO ROMOAN SULLIVAN.(bcl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection Tue 04/09 12:55 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File OBJECTION as to6 Report and Recommendation, Order, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Filed by MARIO ROMOAN SULLIVAN.. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(bcl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, April 05, 2024
7 7 motion Amend/Correct Fri 04/05 1:19 PM
MOTION to Amend1 Complaint, Filed by MARIO ROMOAN SULLIVAN.. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(bcl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, March 07, 2024
6 6 motion Report and Recommendation Order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Thu 03/07 11:10 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Complaint, filed by MARIO ROMOAN SULLIVAN; ORDER denying as moot2 Motion ; denying as moot3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying as moot5 Motion. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 3/7/2024. (asb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
5 5 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/12 2:37 PM
MOTION for Substitution Filed by MARIO ROMOAN SULLIVAN.. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(bcl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, January 22, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 01/22 3:42 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (bcl)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appoint Counsel Mon 01/22 3:41 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel Filed by MARIO ROMOAN SULLIVAN.. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(bcl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 01/22 3:40 PM
MOTION to Add Plaintiff Parties as Class Action Suit Filed by MARIO ROMOAN SULLIVAN.. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(bcl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 misc Complaint Mon 01/22 3:39 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by MARIO ROMOAN SULLIVAN(bcl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Declaration of Plaintiff,
Att: 4 Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Medical & Water Info,
Att: 6 Envelope