New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Sanket J Bulsara
Referred: James M Wicks
Case #: 2:24-cv-00467
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) - Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 20, 2024 5:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Bullion Shark, LLC
Represented By
Kyle Francis Oakes Monaghan
Milman Labuda Law Group PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Ekaterina Ovodova
Represented By
Alan Smikun
Smikun Law, PLLC
contact info
Mediator
Erica Garay
Garay ADR Services 157 Altessa Blvd.
Melville, NY 11747
Plaintiff
Bullion Exchange LLC
Represented By
Stephen Eric Turman
Turman Legal Solutions PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
67 67 misc Transcript Tue 04/29 1:37 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 25, 2025, before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Transcriber Transcriptions Plus II, Inc., Telephone number 917-817-2825. Email address: RL.Transcriptions2@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/20/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025. (DC)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
66 66 minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 04/25 3:26 PM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks: CIVIL CAUSE FOR MOTION HEARING: Counsel for Plaintiff: Eugene Bondar. Counsel for Defendant (Bullion Shark, LLC): Kyle Francis Oakes Monaghan. Counsel for Defendant (Ekaterina Ovodova): Alan Smikun. Motion Hearing/Oral Argument held on 4/25/2025 at 12:00 PM regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Amend (ECF No.58 ). Parties arguments were heard. The decision was reserved. The Court will issue a written decision. The parties are directed to file supplemental letter briefs as discussed on the record on or before May 2, 2025 . The undersigned is available for a Settlement Conference if the parties so desire. In the event the parties would like a Settlement Conference, the parties are directed to contact the undersigned's Courtroom Deputy at (631) 712-5625 with mutually convenient dates that the parties are available. The Status Conference scheduled for May 19, 2025 at 10:00 AM is hereby adjourned sine die . The end date of Fact Discovery shall be on or before August 29, 2025 . The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report on or before August 22, 2025 . THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. (FTR Log #12:00-12:58 and 1:00-1:04 (FTR).) (DF)
Related: [-]