Georgia Northern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00001
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 26, 2024 2:27 AM EST
Defendant
Bryan Isaac Ozuna (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Calvin Artie Leipold - GOV, III
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/26/2024 3:10 AM EST
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Bryan Isaac Ozuna (1) for count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4 with forfeiture provision. (jpa) Modified on 1/24/2024 to correct file date (jpa).
Related: [-]
2 2 Defendant Information Sheet as to Bryan Isaac Ozuna. (jpa)
Related: [-]
3 3 Request for Arraignment as to Bryan Isaac Ozuna. (jpa)
Related: [-]