Missouri Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-04008
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 26, 2024 1:50 AM CST
Defendant
Jerry Joseph Bruggeman, MD (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Lauren E. Kummerer
United States Attorney'S Office-Jcmo
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/26/2024 2:41 AM CST
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Jerry Joseph Bruggeman (1) count(s) 1-13. (Houston, Kiambu) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/24/2024) (Crocker, Susan).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet