Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Chad F Kenney
Case #: 2:24-cv-00387
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2024
Terminated:Jul 12, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 5:56 AM EDT
Defendant
MOUNT SAINT JOSEPH ACADEMY
Represented By
TRACY A. WALSH
Weber Gallagher Simpson Stapleton Fires & Newby LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JANET COLUMBRO
Represented By
SIDNEY L. GOLD
The Gold Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
JAMIE L. FORD
The Gold Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, July 12, 2024
15 15 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 07/12 4:49 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI. Settlement Conference held on 7/12/2024. (ahf)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Fri 07/12 2:20 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 7/12/2024. 7/12/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
13 13 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 06/10 12:12 PM
ORDER THAT A VIDEO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 7/12/24 AT 10:00 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 6/10/24. 6/10/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Scheduling Order Thu 05/23 9:11 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS HEREBY REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI FOR THE SCHEDULING OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 9/26/24. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTION SHALL BE FILED BY 10/17/24 AT 12:00 P.M.. MOTIONS IN LIMINE ARE DUE BY 12:00 P.M. ON 1/6/25. PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM ARE DUE BY 1/21/25. A DATE CERTAIN JURY TRIAL WILL COMMENCE ON 2/3/25 AT 9:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11 B; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 5/23/24. 5/23/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Thu 05/23 9:04 AM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS HEREBY REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI TO CONDUCT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 5/23/24. 5/23/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
10 10 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Wed 05/15 9:37 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEYRULE 16 Pretrial Conference held on 5/15/24. Court Reporter: ESR. (JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
9 9 5 pgs misc Report Of Fri 05/10 11:21 AM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by JANET COLUMBRO. (FORD, JAMIE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 04/23 9:42 AM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS HEREBY REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI TO CONDUCT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. AN IN PERSON INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 5/15/24 AT 9:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11B; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/23/24. 4/23/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
7 7 12 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/11 11:46 AM
ANSWER to Complaint together with and Affirmative Defenses by MOUNT SAINT JOSEPH ACADEMY.(WALSH, TRACY)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 02/16 4:34 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JANET COLUMBRO. MOUNT SAINT JOSEPH ACADEMY waiver sent on 2/14/2024, answer due 4/15/2024. (GOLD, SIDNEY)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/16 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by TRACY A. WALSH on behalf of MOUNT SAINT JOSEPH ACADEMY with Jury Demand Certificate of Service(WALSH, TRACY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/14 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JAMIE L. FORD on behalf of JANET COLUMBRO (FORD, JAMIE)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Mon 01/29 12:59 PM
ORDER THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FED.R.CIV.P. 12 (b)(6),(e), OR (f), SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR STRIKE CERTAIN MATTERS. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST 7 DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 1/29/24. 1/29/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 01/29 9:00 AM
Summons Issued as to MOUNT SAINT JOSEPH ACADEMY. Forwarded To: E-MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 1/29/24 (JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 01/26 2:33 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against MOUNT SAINT JOSEPH ACADEMY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17218526.), filed by JANET COLUMBRO.(GOLD, SIDNEY)
Related: [-]