O'Brien v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00391 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:2674 Federal Tort Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Texas Western, 5:24-cv-00002 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 5:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
The United States of America
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
John 1-49 Doe Defendants
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 |
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemical Americas, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Brett O'Brien
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/09 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brett O'Brien of Partial Dismissal of Corporate Defendants Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-00391-RMG(Martines, Buffy) Modified to original date filed, to edit docket text for clarification on 9/10/2024 (sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 02/06 12:52 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants; Summons Issued as to The United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (sshe, ) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice Other
Fri 01/26 2:22 PM
NOTICE TO NEW COUNSEL : MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) is open as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. All counsel of record are directed to take the steps necessary to be registered as electronic filers in the District of South Carolina ( See CMO No. 3 pg. 17 Electronic Filing at 22. footnote 5 (ECF Multidistrict Litigation Attorney Registration Form - available at link at the end of this NOTICE). CMO Nos. 1 - 27, (including any supplemental CMO Nos. i.e., 2.A, etc.) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed in the Lead case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re new Case Management Orders and other new documents posted in the lead case. Please also read CLERKS NOTICE (s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 and QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE (s) filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Monthly Status Conference TBD. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at[LINK:MDL-2873] (sshe, ) (Entered: 01/26/2024) |
|
6 | 6
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 01/26 2:18 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western Texas (associated as of 1/25/2024), 5:24-cv-00002, O'Brien v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-00391-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 01/26 2:09 PM
Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 5:24-cv-00002. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 Conditional Transfer Order entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transferring case to District of South Carolina MDL #2873 Signed by Honorable Judge Richard M. Gergel. (mgr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/26/2024.] | |
Tuesday, January 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 Pro Hac Vice Letter mailed to Thomas W. Pirtle, Buffy K. Martines and Russ M. Brudner regarding admission in the Western District Court of Texas. (rqr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/26/2024.] | |
Tuesday, January 02, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18254895). No Summons requested at this time, filed by BRETT O'BRIEN.(Martines, Buffy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/26/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rqr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/26/2024.] | ||
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (rqr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/26/2024.] |