Simpson v. 3M Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00396 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:23-cv-01720 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 5:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 |
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corp
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
L N Curtis & Sons Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
W L Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Alan Read
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lakeshia Reaggins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James John Rector
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Francis Reda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lemuel Redmond
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Reeves
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Landon H Renfro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Revolinsky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Reynolds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis Reynolds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Ricci
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deandre Rice
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bryan Richards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Richards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Dewayne Richards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anitra Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Wayne Richardson, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dave Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tavarez Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danny Riley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Risher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark L Riskin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank G Ritter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julian B Rivera , Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James H Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Everett Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Logan Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Valarie Lynn Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Rodgers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Rogers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Rohn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Anthony Rojcewicz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Antonio Romo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Howard Rose
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ira Daryl Rosenberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Max Ross
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katrina Rothwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danny Leroy Royse
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Derrick Rucker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Rudolph
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerold Ruiter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Russell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danny Ray Ryals, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Rychwalski, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Omar Sabree
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Sager
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chahee Sampson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald James Sandor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Somchai Sanphasiri
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hiram Santonisr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard David Schaffer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Schenk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Schilling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Schindler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Schlieman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Richard Schmidt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawn Schmitt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Alan Schoenen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Russell Schoff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawn Brook Schoppe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Jacob Schroeder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lewis Schuerkamp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Schultz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Schutter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Schwartz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
lanny Joseph Schwartz, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnna Schweitzer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Doug Scott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Scott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Seagraves
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis J Seavert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Henry Seay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Secrest
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kinley Sellers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Sellman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthias Daniel Serrano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harold Sexton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Claude Shadrick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laurence Shaffer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Shakliks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leemon Shankle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angelieka Shaw
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael E Shea
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Latoya Shelton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tim Sheppard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary R Sherrow, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wilma Shines
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Shirley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Shock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Shockley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Merrilyn Shorter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Shouse
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Showalter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Wayne Sides
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roderick Simpson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Smith
264482 Broad River Correctional Institution 4460 Broad River Road
Columbia, SC 29210 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Joseph Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles James Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jay Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Marie Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael D Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Troy Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Smothers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danny Snellenberger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Snodgrass
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dudley Snow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Boyd Snowden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher F Snyder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William George Snyder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Solis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bobby St. Pierre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Starks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeff Steen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Stegman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kirby Lee Stehle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Stein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Stephens, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricky Stephens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Sterling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dean Grimm Steven, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Derek Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Forrest Wayne Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/10 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ricky Stephens, James Milton Hester WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-01748-RMG, 2:24-cv-00396-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/03 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Billy Pearce, Ronald Spontak Et al., Dennis W Pinner, Brian James Rizner Et al., William Callas, Mary Childress, Robert Clarke, Thomas Cortemeglia, Jr, Floro Delacruz, Robert Easterly, Robert J Zdenek Et al., Jermaine Odom, Brien Ott, John Owsiany, Wayne Redding, Randy Renfo, Joseph Michauskas Et al., John Belton Et al., ERNEST FLETCHER, ARTHUR FORMAN, Ray Taylor, John Walker, Richard Jimenez, Michael Tevere, Jr, Lee C Bethune, Henry L Book, Kenneth Shockley, Forrest Wayne Stewart, James Ouzts Et al., Larry Garner, Dennis Godwin, Steven E Hamburg, George Handrahan Ellis Bernard Hendricks as to Outzs, et al; George Anthony Jackson as to Ouzts, et al; Alfred Kithcart as to Ouzts, et al; Christopher Edward Landrum as to Ouzts, et al; Avery Matt Dalton as to Belton, et al; Eric Neal Greer as to Belton, et al; James Daniel Grumbles as to Belton, et al; Andre Jude Petit as to Rizner, et al; Gilbert Stewart Reilly as to Rizner, et al; Rickey David Reker as to Rizner, et al; Matthew Jackson Sapp, III as to Rizner, et al; Warren Ray Schatz as to Rizner, et al; Dean Stephen Silcott, Jr. as to Rizner, et al; Darrell Gene Smith as to Rizner, et al; Colin Harry Matte as to Spontak, et al; Richard Allen McDaniel as to Spontak, et al; Anthony Mercer as to Spontak, et al; John Lee Moulton as to Spontak, et al; Rex Wayne Nelson as to Spontak, et al; Skylar Matthew Wintemberg as to Zdenek, et al; David Coy as to Michauskas, et al; Of Particular Personal Injury Claims WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 11:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/16 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Roy Prince, Aaron Philip Warnick, William Carlson, Stephen Chick, Michael A Diotte, Jerel Butler, George Culbreth, David Curtis Gorman, Joshua Hamman, Christopher Hulliger, John Belton Et al., Kelly A Martinez, Shanneal Ocular, Richard J. Timmerman, Michelle West, Amanda Young, Shyla Johnson, Vernon Johnson, Christopher Kirschke, April Bijak, Jazemine Adams, Shanti Koko, Ray Leete, Shallen Yazett McKiness, Felix Lang Auguster, Robert Becker, Darryl C Hair, Joseph Heinley, Michael Humphrey, Donald Martin, Richard Parler, Kenneth R Plain, Tracy Dewayne Richards, Daniel W Wilborn, III, Larkin Batten, Jr, Nathaniel Brazell, Glenn Brian, James H Roberts, Dennis Shock Ronald Gayle as to Belton, et al; Lennox Garvin Glft as to Belton, et al; Roy Gilbert as to Belton, et al; Jeffery Milton Gissendanner as to Belton, et al; Everett Grant as to Belton, et al; Jerome James Grasso as to Belton, et al; Donald David Gray as to Belton, et al; Clayton Allen Hall as to Belton, et al; Martin Hall as to Belton, et al; David Allan Hamman as to Belton, et al; James Hanlon as to Belton, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Wednesday, May 22, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/22 8:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by August J Matteis, Jr on behalf of Derek Stewart (Matteis, August) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Madison Claire Killen on behalf of Witmer Public Safety Group Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Killen, Madison) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Robert Gottschall on behalf of Witmer Public Safety Group Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Gottschall, Brandon) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark V Gende on behalf of Witmer Public Safety Group Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Gende, Mark) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Status Report
Mon 02/05 2:17 PM
STATUS REPORT by Witmer Public Safety Group. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Gende, Mark) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 01/26 3:08 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 1/25/2024), 2:23-cv-01720, Simpson et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-00396-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 01/26 3:05 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:23-cv-01720. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
Wednesday, January 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/10/24. (SAC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
Thursday, December 21, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant 3M Company's3 unopposed motion for an extension of the time to file a responsive pleading until either the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") transfers this action or until twenty-eight days after the JPML declines to transfer the action. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 12/21/2023. (RMM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
Wednesday, December 20, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal by 3M Company. (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4493514/ALND receipt B-9175. related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-cv-2023-904191, filed by 3M Company(RMM). (Radney, W) Modified on 12/20/2023 (RMM). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | ||
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company (RMM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-cv-2023-904191, filed by 3M Company(RMM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A |