Killings et al v. 3M Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00398 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:23-cv-01718 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 5:17 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Amercas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clairant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 |
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corp
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
LN Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc.
|
|
Defendant
StedFast USA, Inc.
800 Mountain View Dr.
Piney Flats, TN 37686 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
WI Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DWAYNE HELFER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TERRY HOFFER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Harper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Harrell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Harrell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Jason Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Delmarious Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wade Martin Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glenn William Harvey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Harvey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Joseph Hasara
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Lamont Hawkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brad Eugene Hawthorne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerald Hayes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Lynn Haynes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Clare Hazelton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Franklin Louis Henderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Hensley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jon M Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcus Hernandez
|
|
Plaintiff
Nicholas James Herrmann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Wayne Hett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elwood Heuyard, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Horace Hiett, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheriff Bryan Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reginald Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adrick Hills
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David John Hinkley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dale Arthur Hoffman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodney Hollis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Craig Holroyd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Don Edward Holsapple
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Honney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bryon Hopper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Gale Hopson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harry Horace, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theodore Horsman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Junior Horton, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Hotal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert E Howard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Howard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Dwayne Howe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norman Howell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Hoye
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy C Hubbel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David John Hubeny
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Corey Hudgins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Clement Hughes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leonard Gary Hughes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sean Ramon Hughes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan D Hulsey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Humphrey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Humphries
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles E Hunter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael J Huschart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Huslinger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael C Hux
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Igeneri
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melvin Inman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roceaser Ivy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allen J Jablonski, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Harold Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pliny Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Jacobs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Jahns
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jon Andre Jaillite
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jimmie Allen Jaimes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Jamison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan Jankewicz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luis Jauregui
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lorian Jeffrey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronnie Jeffreys
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ace Jenks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Jenks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lardweanor Jennings
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Jensen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Jimenez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Johnson
236176 Evans Correctional Institution 610 Highway 9 West
Bennettsville, SC 29512 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Johnson
243842 FCI 610 Highway 9 West
Bennettsville, SC 29512 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clarence Johnson
#05987-007 Edgefield FCI PO Box 725
Edgefield, SC 29824 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clarence Earl Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Charles Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janetha Denise Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Johnson
088559 Ridgeland Correctional Institution PO Box 2039
Ridgeland, SC 29936 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph R Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Johnson
Charleston County Detention Center 3841 Leeds Avenue
Charleston, SC 29405 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Johnson
Rt 2 Box 71
Chesterfield, SC 29709 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shyla Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vernon Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ralph Johnston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Carroll Joice
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alton C Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deena Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fredrick Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Jones
259166 Evans Correctional Institution 610 Highway 9 West
Bennettsville, SC 29512 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nina Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor Lamont Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Jordan
232 NE 12th Avenue
Boynton Beach, FL 33435 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Anthony Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael A Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy Jordan, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Joshway, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Kamp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven E Keene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brant Richard Keizer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clifford Alan Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristopher Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jimmy Scott Key
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lemuel Killings, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kalvin King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leo King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dale M Kingrey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Kingsley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mike Kirk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Kirschke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Michael Knerr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Knight
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kurtis Knight
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott D Knops
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sean Lafornaro
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/09 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kenneth Charles Shaw Et al., Edwin Gomez, Sr, Ronald Spontak Et al., Brian James Rizner Et al., Terri Smith, Robert Turley, Christopher Burris Et al., John Dunn, Kathy Battle, David C Bolt, Paul A Brady, Raegan Dowdell, Tommie Reese, Sharon Sizer, Joseph Michauskas Et al., Gary Hanna Et al., John Belton Et al., Craig Tully, Abel Perez, Allen Kairis, Andrew Plumlee, RUSSELL LEE LORD, Teresa Harrell, Nina Jones, John Perez, Benjamin Smith, Jr, Dwight Taylor, Steve Dubosky, Larry Beemer Et al., Keith Alan Bluestein, James Ouzts Et al. Carl Sarvey as to Hanna, et al; Robert Raymond Bonomini as to Shaw, et al; Ellis Nakamura as to Shaw, et al; Melvin Alex Garcia as to Beemer, et al; Kevin Hinzo as to Burris, et al; Randall Jones, Jr., as to Ouzts, et al; Alonzo E. Lagle as to Ouzts, et al; Mitchell Feller as to Belton, et al; Robert C. Powell, Sr. as to Rizner, et al; Joey Rios, III as to Rizner, et al; Chris Ban Noy as to Spontak, et al; Will A. Peden, Jr. as to Spontak, et al; James Desmond Bocek as to Michauskas, et al; Raymond Chenevert as to Michauskas, et al; Eric Cordy as to Michauskas, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/03 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Billy Pearce, Ronald Spontak Et al., Dennis W Pinner, Brian James Rizner Et al., William Callas, Mary Childress, Robert Clarke, Thomas Cortemeglia, Jr, Floro Delacruz, Robert Easterly, Robert J Zdenek Et al., Jermaine Odom, Brien Ott, John Owsiany, Wayne Redding, Randy Renfo, Joseph Michauskas Et al., John Belton Et al., ERNEST FLETCHER, ARTHUR FORMAN, Ray Taylor, John Walker, Richard Jimenez, Michael Tevere, Jr, Lee C Bethune, Henry L Book, Kenneth Shockley, Forrest Wayne Stewart, James Ouzts Et al., Larry Garner, Dennis Godwin, Steven E Hamburg, George Handrahan Ellis Bernard Hendricks as to Outzs, et al; George Anthony Jackson as to Ouzts, et al; Alfred Kithcart as to Ouzts, et al; Christopher Edward Landrum as to Ouzts, et al; Avery Matt Dalton as to Belton, et al; Eric Neal Greer as to Belton, et al; James Daniel Grumbles as to Belton, et al; Andre Jude Petit as to Rizner, et al; Gilbert Stewart Reilly as to Rizner, et al; Rickey David Reker as to Rizner, et al; Matthew Jackson Sapp, III as to Rizner, et al; Warren Ray Schatz as to Rizner, et al; Dean Stephen Silcott, Jr. as to Rizner, et al; Darrell Gene Smith as to Rizner, et al; Colin Harry Matte as to Spontak, et al; Richard Allen McDaniel as to Spontak, et al; Anthony Mercer as to Spontak, et al; John Lee Moulton as to Spontak, et al; Rex Wayne Nelson as to Spontak, et al; Skylar Matthew Wintemberg as to Zdenek, et al; David Coy as to Michauskas, et al; Of Particular Personal Injury Claims WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 11:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/16 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Roy Prince, Aaron Philip Warnick, William Carlson, Stephen Chick, Michael A Diotte, Jerel Butler, George Culbreth, David Curtis Gorman, Joshua Hamman, Christopher Hulliger, John Belton Et al., Kelly A Martinez, Shanneal Ocular, Richard J. Timmerman, Michelle West, Amanda Young, Shyla Johnson, Vernon Johnson, Christopher Kirschke, April Bijak, Jazemine Adams, Shanti Koko, Ray Leete, Shallen Yazett McKiness, Felix Lang Auguster, Robert Becker, Darryl C Hair, Joseph Heinley, Michael Humphrey, Donald Martin, Richard Parler, Kenneth R Plain, Tracy Dewayne Richards, Daniel W Wilborn, III, Larkin Batten, Jr, Nathaniel Brazell, Glenn Brian, James H Roberts, Dennis Shock Ronald Gayle as to Belton, et al; Lennox Garvin Glft as to Belton, et al; Roy Gilbert as to Belton, et al; Jeffery Milton Gissendanner as to Belton, et al; Everett Grant as to Belton, et al; Jerome James Grasso as to Belton, et al; Donald David Gray as to Belton, et al; Clayton Allen Hall as to Belton, et al; Martin Hall as to Belton, et al; David Allan Hamman as to Belton, et al; James Hanlon as to Belton, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Madison Claire Killen on behalf of Witmer Public Safety Group Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Killen, Madison) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Robert Gottschall on behalf of Witmer Public Safety Group Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Gottschall, Brandon) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark V Gende on behalf of Witmer Public Safety Group Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Gende, Mark) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Status Report
Mon 02/05 2:17 PM
STATUS REPORT by Witmer Public Safety Group. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Gende, Mark) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 01/26 4:04 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 1/25/2024), 2:23-cv-01718, Killings et al v. 3M Company, as DSC case 2:24-cv-00398-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 01/26 4:02 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:23-cv-01718. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
Wednesday, December 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ORDER:The consent motion for an extension of time to file an answer,3 , is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 12/20/2023. (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
3 | 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal by 3M Company. (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
State Court Complaint deemed filed in Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL on 11/17/2023. (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4493434(ALND receipt# B-9172). related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-CV-2023-904186.00., filed by 3M Company.(AKD). (Radney, W) Modified on 12/20/2023 (AKD). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | ||
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-CV-2023-904186.00., filed by 3M Company.(AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A |