Gordon et al v. 3M Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00399 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:23-cv-01717 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 5:17 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corp
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
L.N. Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc.
|
|
Defendant
StedFast USA, Inc.
800 Mountain View Dr.
Piney Flats, TN 37686 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
WI Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Lawrence Pierson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eliot Gordon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Eugene Mokher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Mongillo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles P Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clayton Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Braden Moran
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Morel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edmund G Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lenro Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lindel Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John P Morin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brice Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael D Morrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy L Morrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William L Morrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cora Morrow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Haroutoun Mourachian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynwood K Mueller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Muffuletto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Troy Mulhollen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas P Murray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor Myers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Myrick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Napravasr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clayton K Nash
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Naylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phillip Bud Nazarenus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Neal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vincent Anthony Negri
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Travis Shane Neill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Nelmes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Nelson
1129942 Al Cannon Detention Center 3841 Leeds Ave
North Charleston, SC 29405 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kris Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Denis Nerney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul M Nesbit
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Freddie Nettles, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Neumeyer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zachary Michael Nichols
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald W Nicklow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Mark Niemann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sieglindenix Nix
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glen Nobles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Noblett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Noe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry W Norton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Nunn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Nunn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glen Nygren, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daren O'Brian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John O'Bryan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Patrick O'Donnell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carl O'neal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Gregory Obrist
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth T Oiler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brett Olehy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marco Joseph Oliveri
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Olsson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Ortega
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jorge Ortiz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dan Ospina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Ott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Paul Owen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Allen Paddock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Glenn Padgett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ismael David Padilla, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Parker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tyler Partridge
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Quinn Pate
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Albert Patenaude
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Patrick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darryl Patterson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hamp Patterson, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gordon Patty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Paulin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Forrest John Payne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Billy Pearce
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fredrick Pecora
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dean J Pelletier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Louis Peltier, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Pemberton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dion Pendergast, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teddy K Pennington, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randon Earl Peoples
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frederick Eugene Perkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Farar Perky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Perry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Perry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Milton Peters, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martin Peters
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Peterson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karagene Florence Petroskey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brent Phelps
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judge Tommy Phillips
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Piferitti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Craig Pike
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Piller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Earl Pinckney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carl Daniel Pittman, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth R Plain
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Plaskon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Poglitsch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Latisha Polk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andre B Porcher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andre Porter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clemons Porter, IV
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Porter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Porter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kyle Porterfield
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sven Vonkeith Poullard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Powell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Preston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Price
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy Prince
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Buster Lyn Prine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Pritzkau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Proulx
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theodore Proveaux
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Rahn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Ramirez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Ramos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Randall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Keith Rands
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Ransome
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Michael J Owens
Terminated: 03/20/2024
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/03 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Billy Pearce, Ronald Spontak Et al., Dennis W Pinner, Brian James Rizner Et al., William Callas, Mary Childress, Robert Clarke, Thomas Cortemeglia, Jr, Floro Delacruz, Robert Easterly, Robert J Zdenek Et al., Jermaine Odom, Brien Ott, John Owsiany, Wayne Redding, Randy Renfo, Joseph Michauskas Et al., John Belton Et al., ERNEST FLETCHER, ARTHUR FORMAN, Ray Taylor, John Walker, Richard Jimenez, Michael Tevere, Jr, Lee C Bethune, Henry L Book, Kenneth Shockley, Forrest Wayne Stewart, James Ouzts Et al., Larry Garner, Dennis Godwin, Steven E Hamburg, George Handrahan Ellis Bernard Hendricks as to Outzs, et al; George Anthony Jackson as to Ouzts, et al; Alfred Kithcart as to Ouzts, et al; Christopher Edward Landrum as to Ouzts, et al; Avery Matt Dalton as to Belton, et al; Eric Neal Greer as to Belton, et al; James Daniel Grumbles as to Belton, et al; Andre Jude Petit as to Rizner, et al; Gilbert Stewart Reilly as to Rizner, et al; Rickey David Reker as to Rizner, et al; Matthew Jackson Sapp, III as to Rizner, et al; Warren Ray Schatz as to Rizner, et al; Dean Stephen Silcott, Jr. as to Rizner, et al; Darrell Gene Smith as to Rizner, et al; Colin Harry Matte as to Spontak, et al; Richard Allen McDaniel as to Spontak, et al; Anthony Mercer as to Spontak, et al; John Lee Moulton as to Spontak, et al; Rex Wayne Nelson as to Spontak, et al; Skylar Matthew Wintemberg as to Zdenek, et al; David Coy as to Michauskas, et al; Of Particular Personal Injury Claims WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 11:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/16 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Roy Prince, Aaron Philip Warnick, William Carlson, Stephen Chick, Michael A Diotte, Jerel Butler, George Culbreth, David Curtis Gorman, Joshua Hamman, Christopher Hulliger, John Belton Et al., Kelly A Martinez, Shanneal Ocular, Richard J. Timmerman, Michelle West, Amanda Young, Shyla Johnson, Vernon Johnson, Christopher Kirschke, April Bijak, Jazemine Adams, Shanti Koko, Ray Leete, Shallen Yazett McKiness, Felix Lang Auguster, Robert Becker, Darryl C Hair, Joseph Heinley, Michael Humphrey, Donald Martin, Richard Parler, Kenneth R Plain, Tracy Dewayne Richards, Daniel W Wilborn, III, Larkin Batten, Jr, Nathaniel Brazell, Glenn Brian, James H Roberts, Dennis Shock Ronald Gayle as to Belton, et al; Lennox Garvin Glft as to Belton, et al; Roy Gilbert as to Belton, et al; Jeffery Milton Gissendanner as to Belton, et al; Everett Grant as to Belton, et al; Jerome James Grasso as to Belton, et al; Donald David Gray as to Belton, et al; Clayton Allen Hall as to Belton, et al; Martin Hall as to Belton, et al; David Allan Hamman as to Belton, et al; James Hanlon as to Belton, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Wednesday, May 22, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/22 9:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by August J Matteis, Jr on behalf of James Milton Peters, Jr (Matteis, August) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 03/20 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael J Owens Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-00399-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Madison Claire Killen on behalf of Witmer Public Safety Group Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Killen, Madison) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Robert Gottschall on behalf of Witmer Public Safety Group Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Gottschall, Brandon) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark V Gende on behalf of Witmer Public Safety Group Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Gende, Mark) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Status Report
Mon 02/05 2:17 PM
STATUS REPORT by Witmer Public Safety Group. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Gende, Mark) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 01/26 4:09 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 1/25/2024), 2:23-cv-01717, Gordon et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-00399-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 01/26 4:06 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:23-cv-01717. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
Wednesday, December 20, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 TEXT ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answers are due 28 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation declines to transfer this action to MDL No. 2873. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 12/20/2023. (CDG) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
4 | 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal Motion is RIPE 12/20/2023 . Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. Filed by 3M Company. (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
State Court Complaint deemed filed in Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL on 11/16/2023. (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4493828 (ALND receipt# B-9189). related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-CV-2023-904176.00., filed by 3M Company.(AKD). (Radney, W) Modified on 12/20/2023 (AKD). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | ||
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-CV-2023-904176.00., filed by 3M Company.(AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A |