Cottongim et al v. 3M Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00401 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:23-cv-01714 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 5:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 |
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corp
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
L.N. Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
W L Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kyle Allen Cadwallader
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Calhoun
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sylvia Lina Calhoun
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Callas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Duane Canon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheila Cantrel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Carlson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodolfo Carreon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Charles Castor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harvey Caywood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norman Chadwick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Chadwick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Chaiser
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Craig Scott Chait
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kirk Chamberlain
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvin Champine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JB Chandler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ray Channell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor Chauca
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Chere
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Chick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Childress
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ollie Choice , Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary A Christian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darwin Neill Clark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tommy Wayne Clark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Clarke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Larry Cleary, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne P Clemente
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Haywood E Cliett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Clim
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eldred Cobb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Coble
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronnie Coleman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Coles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnny C Combs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronnie Combs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis Compton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Conboy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David J Conner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Cook
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Cookston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chryssa Cooper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Quentin Maurice Cooper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lowell Cordial
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rory Glen Cornblith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Armond Corona
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jesus M Corralejo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Cortemeglia, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Cothron
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Franklin Cottongim
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Allen Coulter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Ray Cox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Cox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Crane
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodney Earl Crawford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Earnest Crenshaw, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Creveling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvin R Crockett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Crump
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert W Crutchfield
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edwin Cunnea
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Cunningham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Curry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary E Curtis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Louis Cutrer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KENNETH DUNN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adrea Dailey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dan Michael Daly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Garin Daniel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eddie James Daniels, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walton Daugherty , Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roderick Robert Davidson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Davila
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carl Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Davis, II
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rhesa Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Warren Joseph Deemer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cyrus Gene Dees , Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark A Deger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Degruccio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steve Deisenroth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Deitz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Floro Delacruz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick John Delaney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Delaney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Dellarciprete
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Demly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Renell Denton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Richard Desjardins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Destasio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Devine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Franklin Dhom
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mervin C Dimatulac
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jon Barry Dinola
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael A Diotte
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Salvatore Diprima
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Dixon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Burton Dodge, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Francis Dolan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thedore Dorenkamp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Dorman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David C Doughty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Douglas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marquise Douglas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Dowis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bob Daniel Druin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin H Dugan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edgar Duke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Dunn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Dunning
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Dupre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Carroll Dyer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dylan Earnhart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Easterly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Eugene Eckelberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul David Edgar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis K Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Thomas Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marion Hinnant Edwards, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Scott Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Vernon Eggleston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Elkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rickey L Ellis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Zepeda
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Richard Edwards
Terminated: 02/02/2024
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/09 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kenneth Charles Shaw Et al., Edwin Gomez, Sr, Ronald Spontak Et al., Brian James Rizner Et al., Terri Smith, Robert Turley, Christopher Burris Et al., John Dunn, Kathy Battle, David C Bolt, Paul A Brady, Raegan Dowdell, Tommie Reese, Sharon Sizer, Joseph Michauskas Et al., Gary Hanna Et al., John Belton Et al., Craig Tully, Abel Perez, Allen Kairis, Andrew Plumlee, RUSSELL LEE LORD, Teresa Harrell, Nina Jones, John Perez, Benjamin Smith, Jr, Dwight Taylor, Steve Dubosky, Larry Beemer Et al., Keith Alan Bluestein, James Ouzts Et al. Carl Sarvey as to Hanna, et al; Robert Raymond Bonomini as to Shaw, et al; Ellis Nakamura as to Shaw, et al; Melvin Alex Garcia as to Beemer, et al; Kevin Hinzo as to Burris, et al; Randall Jones, Jr., as to Ouzts, et al; Alonzo E. Lagle as to Ouzts, et al; Mitchell Feller as to Belton, et al; Robert C. Powell, Sr. as to Rizner, et al; Joey Rios, III as to Rizner, et al; Chris Ban Noy as to Spontak, et al; Will A. Peden, Jr. as to Spontak, et al; James Desmond Bocek as to Michauskas, et al; Raymond Chenevert as to Michauskas, et al; Eric Cordy as to Michauskas, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/03 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Billy Pearce, Ronald Spontak Et al., Dennis W Pinner, Brian James Rizner Et al., William Callas, Mary Childress, Robert Clarke, Thomas Cortemeglia, Jr, Floro Delacruz, Robert Easterly, Robert J Zdenek Et al., Jermaine Odom, Brien Ott, John Owsiany, Wayne Redding, Randy Renfo, Joseph Michauskas Et al., John Belton Et al., ERNEST FLETCHER, ARTHUR FORMAN, Ray Taylor, John Walker, Richard Jimenez, Michael Tevere, Jr, Lee C Bethune, Henry L Book, Kenneth Shockley, Forrest Wayne Stewart, James Ouzts Et al., Larry Garner, Dennis Godwin, Steven E Hamburg, George Handrahan Ellis Bernard Hendricks as to Outzs, et al; George Anthony Jackson as to Ouzts, et al; Alfred Kithcart as to Ouzts, et al; Christopher Edward Landrum as to Ouzts, et al; Avery Matt Dalton as to Belton, et al; Eric Neal Greer as to Belton, et al; James Daniel Grumbles as to Belton, et al; Andre Jude Petit as to Rizner, et al; Gilbert Stewart Reilly as to Rizner, et al; Rickey David Reker as to Rizner, et al; Matthew Jackson Sapp, III as to Rizner, et al; Warren Ray Schatz as to Rizner, et al; Dean Stephen Silcott, Jr. as to Rizner, et al; Darrell Gene Smith as to Rizner, et al; Colin Harry Matte as to Spontak, et al; Richard Allen McDaniel as to Spontak, et al; Anthony Mercer as to Spontak, et al; John Lee Moulton as to Spontak, et al; Rex Wayne Nelson as to Spontak, et al; Skylar Matthew Wintemberg as to Zdenek, et al; David Coy as to Michauskas, et al; Of Particular Personal Injury Claims WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 11:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/16 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Roy Prince, Aaron Philip Warnick, William Carlson, Stephen Chick, Michael A Diotte, Jerel Butler, George Culbreth, David Curtis Gorman, Joshua Hamman, Christopher Hulliger, John Belton Et al., Kelly A Martinez, Shanneal Ocular, Richard J. Timmerman, Michelle West, Amanda Young, Shyla Johnson, Vernon Johnson, Christopher Kirschke, April Bijak, Jazemine Adams, Shanti Koko, Ray Leete, Shallen Yazett McKiness, Felix Lang Auguster, Robert Becker, Darryl C Hair, Joseph Heinley, Michael Humphrey, Donald Martin, Richard Parler, Kenneth R Plain, Tracy Dewayne Richards, Daniel W Wilborn, III, Larkin Batten, Jr, Nathaniel Brazell, Glenn Brian, James H Roberts, Dennis Shock Ronald Gayle as to Belton, et al; Lennox Garvin Glft as to Belton, et al; Roy Gilbert as to Belton, et al; Jeffery Milton Gissendanner as to Belton, et al; Everett Grant as to Belton, et al; Jerome James Grasso as to Belton, et al; Donald David Gray as to Belton, et al; Clayton Allen Hall as to Belton, et al; Martin Hall as to Belton, et al; David Allan Hamman as to Belton, et al; James Hanlon as to Belton, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Wednesday, May 22, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/22 9:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by August J Matteis, Jr on behalf of Johnny C Combs, Earnest Crenshaw, Jr, Michael A Diotte(Matteis, August) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Madison Claire Killen on behalf of Witmer Public Safety Group Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Killen, Madison) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Robert Gottschall on behalf of Witmer Public Safety Group Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Gottschall, Brandon) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark V Gende on behalf of Witmer Public Safety Group Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Gende, Mark) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Mon 02/05 2:17 PM
STATUS REPORT by Witmer Public Safety Group. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Gende, Mark) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 02/02 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard Edwards WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-00401-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 01/26 4:20 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 1/25/2024), 2:23-cv-01714, Cottongim et al v. 3M Company, as DSC case 2:24-cv-00401-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 01/26 4:18 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:23-cv-01714. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
Friday, January 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/5/24. (SAC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
Thursday, December 21, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant 3M Company's2 unopposed motion for an extension of the time to file a responsive pleading until either the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") transfers this action or until twenty-eight days after the JPML declines to transfer the action. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 12/21/2023. (RMM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
Wednesday, December 20, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal by 3M Company. (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4492872/ALND receipt B-9164. related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-cv-2023-904147, filed by 3M Company.(RMM) (RMM). (Radney, W) Modified on 12/20/2023 (RMM). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | ||
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company (RMM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-cv-2023-904147, filed by 3M Company.(RMM) (RMM, ). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 1/26/2024.] | |
Att: 1 (12/19/2023) Exhibit A |