Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust v. Alphabet (GB) Limited
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David S Jones |
Case #: | 1:24-ap-01027 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 29, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Alphabet (GB) Limited
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 14, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Wed 02/14 11:30 AM
Foreign Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Alphabet (GB) Limited . (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Wed 02/14 10:42 AM
Request for a First Summons filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (McGrath, Brigette) |
||
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Tue 01/30 5:23 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-01027 dsj] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16497557. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Monday, January 29, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Mon 01/29 11:20 AM
Adversary case 24-01027 Complaint against Alphabet (GB) Limited (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |