Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:24-cv-00509
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2024
Case in other court:Missouri Eastern, 4:24-cv-00020
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 2:53 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Shook Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Deborah Cooper-Heimann
Represented By
Randi Kassan
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman
contact info
Randi A. Kassan
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 81 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
9 9 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 05/28 6:34 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Deborah Cooper-Heimann] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 05/28 6:33 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Deborah Cooper-Heimann] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/28 6:31 AM
Defendant Monsanto Company ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Deborah Cooper-Heimann] by Monsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 04/01 5:17 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Deborah Cooper-Heimann. Service waived by Monsanto Company waiver sent on 3/26/2024, answer due 5/28/2024. (Kassan, Randi)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
5 5 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Mon 01/29 11:42 AM
Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:24-cv-00020. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Mon 01/29 11:45 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 2741, Eastern District of Missouri, 4:24-cv-00020 SRW, Cooper-Heimann v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 24-cv-00509-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 436 cc: JPMDL (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
4 4 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete on 1/17/24. (JWD)
Related: [-]
3 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-436) regarding MDL 2741 by Clerk of the Panel. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete on 1/17/24. (JWD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
2 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
Related: [-]
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Welby. 1 Waiver(s) of Service issued. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JWD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-10356643, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Deborah Cooper-Heimann.(Kassan, Randi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Original Filing Form,
Att: 3 Waiver of Service