State of Utah et al v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Rukhsanah L Singh |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00536 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Utah, 2:24-cv-00027 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 28, 2024 6:54 AM EDT |
Defendant
EVERNORTH HEALTH INC.
|
|
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Defendant
Optumrx Inc.
|
|
Defendant
OptumInsight Inc.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
|
Defendant
MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
1 Express Way
St. Louis, MO 63121 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Administrators, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICE INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
CVS PHARMACY INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CAREMARKPCS HEALTH LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CAREMARK RX L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CAREMARK L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Utah Division of Consumer Protection
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Utah, The
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/08 4:29 PM
NOTICE by State of Utah, The, Utah Division of Consumer Protection of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (ELLIS, TANYA) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 02/06 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM LISTON, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LISTON, WILLIAM) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 02/06 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW C MCDONALD on behalf of All Plaintiffs (MCDONALD, MATTHEW) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 5:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM LAWRENCE DEAS on behalf of All Defendants (DEAS, WILLIAM) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 11:05 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by WALTER GARNER WATKINS, III on behalf of State of Utah, The, Utah Division of Consumer Protection (WATKINS, WALTER) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/02 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by TANYA DEARMAN ELLIS on behalf of State of Utah, The, Utah Division of Consumer Protection (ELLIS, TANYA) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
mdl
MDL Notice to Counsel
Tue 01/30 1:37 PM
Clerk's Notice to Counsel: Pursuant to CTO Number 10 entered in MDL No. 3080, District of Utah case number 2:24-cv-27 has been transferred to the District of New Jersey and assigned civil action number: 24-cv-536. In Re: Insulin Pricing Litigation, MDL 3080. (krg, ) |
|
29 | 29
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Court Transfer
Tue 01/30 10:59 AM
Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Utah; Case Number 2:24-cv-00027. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 01/30 11:14 AM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (krg, ) |
||
utility
Create Case Association
Tue 01/30 11:15 AM
Cases associated to 2:23-md-03080-BRM-RLS. (krg, ) |
||
Monday, January 29, 2024 | ||
28 | 28 CLERKS ORDER of Conditional Transfer re In Re: Insulin Pricing Litigation MDL 3080 signed by Tiffaney D. Pete, Clerk of the Panel. (jwt) | |
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
Wednesday, January 24, 2024 | ||
27 | 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Utah Division of Consumer Protection. Summons served on Caremark Rx, LLC on 1/17/2024. (Holliday, Mark) | |
26 | 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Utah Division of Consumer Protection. Summons served on UnitedHealth Group, Inc on 1/17/2024. (Holliday, Mark) | |
25 | 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Utah Division of Consumer Protection. Summons served on Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC on 1/22/2024. (Holliday, Mark) | |
24 | 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Utah Division of Consumer Protection. Summons served on OptumRX, Inc on 1/19/2024. (Holliday, Mark) | |
23 | 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Utah Division of Consumer Protection. Summons served on Optuminsight, Inc on 1/19/2024. (Holliday, Mark) | |
22 | 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Utah Division of Consumer Protection. Summons served on Novo Nordisk Inc on 1/17/2024. (Holliday, Mark) | |
21 | 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Utah Division of Consumer Protection. Summons served on Medco Health Solutions, Inc on 1/19/2024. (Holliday, Mark) | |
20 | 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Utah Division of Consumer Protection. Summons served on Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc on 1/19/2024. (Holliday, Mark) | |
19 | 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Utah Division of Consumer Protection. Summons served on Express Scripts, Inc on 1/22/2024. (Holliday, Mark) | |
18 | 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Utah Division of Consumer Protection. Summons served on Express Scripts Administrators LLC on 1/19/2024. (Holliday, Mark) | |
17 | 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Utah Division of Consumer Protection. Summons served on Evernorth Health, Inc on 1/17/2024. (Holliday, Mark) | |
16 | 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Utah Division of Consumer Protection. Summons served on ESI Mail Pharmacy Service. Inc on 1/19/2024. (Holliday, Mark) | |
15 | 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Utah Division of Consumer Protection. Summons served on Eli Lilly and Company on 1/19/2024. (Holliday, Mark) | |
14 | 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Utah Division of Consumer Protection. Summons served on CVS Pharmacy, Inc on 1/19/2024. (Holliday, Mark) | |
13 | 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Utah Division of Consumer Protection. Summons served on CVS Health Corporation on 1/17/2024. (Holliday, Mark) | |
12 | 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Utah Division of Consumer Protection. Summons served on CarmarkPCS Health, LLC on 1/19/2024. (Holliday, Mark) | |
11 | 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Utah Division of Consumer Protection. Summons served on Eli Lilly and Company, et al. on 01/19/2024. (Holliday, Mark) | |
Tuesday, January 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 01/16/2024. (sg) | |
Friday, January 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action by CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. (Porter, Karra) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Caremark Rx, LLC, Caremark, LLC, CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Plaintiffs State of Utah, The, Utah Division of Consumer Protection. (sg) | |
7 | 7 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance Pro Hac Vice mailed to attorney Enu Mainigi, Craig Singer, R. Kennon Poteat III, A. Joshua Podoll, Daniel Dockery for CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. (sg) | |
Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead added. Case number will now read 2:24-cv-00027-DBP. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (sg) | ||
Thursday, January 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Caremark Rx, LLC, Caremark, LLC, CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. identifying CVS Health Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Porter, Karra) | |
5 | 5 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 230908750, against State of Utah, The, Utah Division of Consumer Protection. filed by CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.. (Porter, Karra) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Federal Employees Health Benefits Program | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Karra J. Porter on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Caremark Rx, LLC, Caremark, LLC, CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. (Porter, Karra) | |
3 | 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendants ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Haynie, Laurie) | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurie A. Haynie on behalf of ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc. (Haynie, Laurie) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third Judicial District Court, case number 230908750,, (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-4934203) filed by Express Scripts, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Haynie, Laurie) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-TRICARE Contract, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C-State Summaries, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D-TRICARE Manuals, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E-State Court Record, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F-State Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |