Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust v. MC Plasticos de Mexico SA de CV
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David S Jones |
Case #: | 1:24-ap-01295 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
MC Plasticos de Mexico SA de CV
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Motion, Appoint
Tue 07/30 2:58 PM
Order Signed on 7/30/2024 Granting the Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Appoint a Special Process Server to Serve an Entity in a Foreign Country. (Calderon, Lynda) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Motion, Appoint
Mon 07/29 2:59 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Appoint A SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER TO SERVE AN ENTITY IN A FOREIGN COUNTRY filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 14, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Wed 02/14 11:17 AM
Foreign Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against MC Plasticos de Mexico SA de CV. (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Tue 01/30 4:34 PM
Adversary case 24-01295 Complaint against MC Plasticos de Mexico SA de CV (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |