Tennessee Middle District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00022
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 01, 2024 1:35 AM CST
Defendant
Eustacio Medrano, Jr. (1)
Represented By
Dumaka Shabazz
Federal Public Defender'S Office (mdtn)
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Robert E. McGuire
U.S. Attorney'S Office (nashville)
contact info

GPO Jan 09 2025
JUDGMENT on sentencing held on 1/9/2025 as to Eustacio Medrano, Jr.: Plea of guilty to Count 1 of the Information. Imprisonment as time served. Three years supervised release, with conditions. $100 special assessment. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/9/2025. (dt)

Docket last updated: 02/01/2024 2:27 AM CST
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
1 1 MOTION to Seal Criminal Complaint by USA as to Eustacio Medrano, Jr. (dt) [3:23-mj-01001]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER as to Eustacio Medrano Jr.: Motion to Seal Criminal Complaint1 is Granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/3/23. (dt) [3:23-mj-01001]
Related: [-]
3 3 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Eustacio Medrano, Jr. (Attachment: #1 Criminal Cover Sheet) (dt) [3:23-mj-01001]
Related: [-]
4 4 Warrant Issued as to Eustacio Medrano, Jr. (dt) [3:23-mj-01001]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
Arrest of Eustacio Medrano, Jr in the Southern District of Texas, on 1/5/2023. Defendant detained to appear in the Middle District of Tennessee. (dt) [3:23-mj-01001]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
5 5 MOTION to Unseal Complaint by USA as to Eustacio Medrano, Jr. (dt) [3:23-mj-01001]
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION for Detention Hearing by USA as to Eustacio Medrano, Jr. (dt) [3:23-mj-01001]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
Arrest of Eustacio Medrano, Jr. (jm) [3:23-mj-01001]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER as to Eustacio Medrano Jr.: Motion to Unseal Case5 is Granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/27/2023. (dt) [3:23-mj-01001]
Related: [-]
8 8 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Rule 5(c)(3) Documents retrieved from the Southern District of Texas, via PACER as to Eustacio Medrano, Jr. Defendant arrested in the Southern District of Texas, on 1/5/2023.(dt) [3:23-mj-01001]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 DE No. 1 - Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received,
Att: 2 DE No. 2 - Order Appointing Counsel,
Att: 3 DE No. 3 - Order of Temporary Detention,
Att: 4 DE No. 6 - Waiver of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings,
Att: 5 DE No. 7 - Order of Detention,
Att: 6 DE No. 8 - Commitment to Another District,
Att: 7 DE No. 9 - Rule 5 Papers
9 9 Warrant Returned Executed on 1/30/2023 as to Eustacio Medrano, Jr. (jm) [3:23-mj-01001]
Related: [-]
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Initial Appearance as to Eustacio Medrano, Jr held on 1/30/2023. Defendant appeared with appointed counsel Dumaka Shabazz. Detention hearing waived, rights reserved. Defendant to remain in Federal custody. (jm) [3:23-mj-01001]
Related: [-]
11 11 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Eustacio Medrano, Jr. (jm) [3:23-mj-01001]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Eustacio Medrano, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/30/2023. (jm) [3:23-mj-01001]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER re Brady Materials as to Eustacio Medrano, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/30/2023. (jm) [3:23-mj-01001]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Eustacio Medrano, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/30/2023. (jm) [3:23-mj-01001]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
15 15 INFORMATION as to Eustacio Medrano, Jr. (Attachment: #1 Criminal Cover Sheet) (dt)
Related: [-]