California Northern District Court
Judge:Sallie Kim
Case #: 3:24-cv-00604
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 30, 2024 1:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Ryan Connolly
Represented By
Christopher Easton Brumfiel
Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP
contact info
Defendant
Robinderpal Hayer
Represented By
Jasper Hall
Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP
contact info
Gregory B. Thomas
Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP
contact info
Christopher Easton Brumfiel
Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ruth Jones
Represented By
Jasper Hall
Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP
contact info
Gregory B. Thomas
Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP
contact info
Christopher Easton Brumfiel
Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP
contact info
Defendant
Collin Lenahan
Represented By
Jasper Hall
Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP
contact info
Gregory B. Thomas
Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP
contact info
Christopher Easton Brumfiel
Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Simon
Represented By
Jasper Hall
Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP
contact info
Gregory B. Thomas
Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP
contact info
Christopher Easton Brumfiel
Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP
contact info
Defendant
Officer Robert Connelly
Represented By
Jasper Hall
Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP
contact info
Gregory B. Thomas
Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP
contact info
Christopher Easton Brumfiel
Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Malia Ashad
Represented By
Angel Alexander
Pointer & Buelna LLP
contact info
Adante Pointer
Pointer & Buelna, LLP
contact info
Treva Renita Stewart
Pointer & Buelna, Llp Lawyers For The People
contact info
Patrick Matthew Buelna
Pointer & Buelna, LLP
contact info
Marlon Lateef Monroe
Pointer & Buelna, Llp.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, December 30, 2024
29 29 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 12/30 2:44 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 27 Stipulation of Dismissal.(sklc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Case Management Statement Mon 12/30 12:11 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Malia Ashad. (Buelna, Patrick)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 12/30 12:06 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL filed by Malia Ashad. (Buelna, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 11/13 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Change in Counsel: Attorney Jasper L. Hall no longer representing Robert Connelly, Collin Lenahan, Robinderpal Hayer, Matthew Simon, Ruth Jones in this case (Thomas, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
25 25 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 09/20 10:16 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING POST SETTLEMENT TELEPHONE CALL: The post Settlement Call scheduled for 9/24/2024 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson is VACATED. Counsel has confirmed the case has settled. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
24 24 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Telephonic Hearing (AT&T) Thu 09/19 5:07 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Scheduling Pre-Settlement Conference Telephone Call: This case has been referred for Pre-Settlement Conference to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. A Pre-Settlement Conference Telephone Call is scheduled for: 9/24/2024 at 3:00 P.M. Counsel shall be prepared to speak about the status of this case and to talk about a Settlement Conference and schedule a date for Settlement Conference. Counsel shall call the following conference call number: 1-888-684-8852/Access Code: 2925506 If counsel have any questions please contact the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher, by email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.gov (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/28 2:25 PM
ORDER CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 9/9/2024 is continued to 1/6/2025 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/28/2024. (bxl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
22 22 minutes Settlement Conference Wed 08/21 3:18 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Settlement Conference held on 8/21/2024 at 10:00 AM by Zoom Video Conference. Digital Recording Time: Not Recorded/Start time: 10:15 am/End time: 2:45 pm. Plaintiff: Malia Ashad Plaintiff's counsel: Adante Pointer, Treva Stewart, Angel Alexander, Marlon Monroe Defendant's representative: Benjamin Oram Defendants' counsel: Christopher Brumfiel Proceedings: Case settled in principle, subject to Board approval. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/21/2024)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
21 21 4 pgs order Order Setting Settlement Conference Tue 06/18 1:22 PM
Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge: Settlement Conference set for 8/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Zoom Video Conference Only.(order attached) Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 6/18/2024. (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
20 20 minutes Telephone Conference Wed 06/12 3:33 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Telephone Conference re scheduling a Settlement Conference held on 6/12/2024 at 3:00 PM. Digital Recording Time: Not Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Angel Alexander/Treva Stewart. Defendant Attorney: Christopher E. Brumiel. Proceedings: Telephone conference held on 6/12/2024 to schedule a date for Settlement Conference. Proposed Settlement Conference dates: 8/20/2024 or 8/21/2024 at 10:00 a.m., by Zoom Video Conference. Counsel shall check with their clients/representatives re which dates or date is available for the Settlement Conference. By COB on 6/13/2024, counsel shall email the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher and let her know if both dates or which single date, 8/20/2024 or 8/21/2024, is available to schedule the Settlement Conference. Courtroom Deputy email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.gov (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/12/2024)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
19 19 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Telephonic Hearing (AT&T) Fri 06/07 4:02 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Scheduling Pre-Settlement Conference Telephone Call: This case has been referred for Pre-Settlement Conference to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. A Pre-Settlement Conference Telephone Call is scheduled for: 6/12/2024 at 3:00 P.M. Counsel shall be prepared to speak about the status of this case and to talk about a Settlement Conference and schedule a date for Settlement Conference. Counsel shall call the following conference call number: 1-888-684-8852/Access Code: 2925506 If counsel have any questions please contact the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher, by email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.gov Related [+] (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (s) [Settlement Referral]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
17 17 13 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 05/08 10:34 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 15 Stipulation Model Protective Order. Signed on 5/8/2024. (sklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
15 15 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 05/07 4:16 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER MODEL STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Malia Ashad. (Buelna, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
18 18 utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Wed 06/05 3:37 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Expert Disclosures due by 3/28/2025. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 4/25/2025. Jury Selection set for 10/28/2025 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge for Settlement to be completed by 9/3/2024. (bxl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Case Management Conference - Further ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/07 5:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held by Zoom before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/6/2024. Trial date and schedule set. The Court will issue a Case Management Order. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2024 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2024. Case referred to a Magistrate Judge for settlement to be completed by 9/3/2024. Zoom Recording Time: 1:38-1:40. Attorney for Plaintiff: Angel Alexander. Attorney for Defendants: Christopher Brumfiel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/6/2024)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 05/06 2:43 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Further Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Jury Trial set for 10/28/2025 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2025 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Close of Fact Discovery due by 3/14/2025. Close of Expert Discovery due by 5/16/2025. Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2024. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on 5/6/2024. (sklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Fri 05/03 9:44 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Setting Zoom Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2024 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/sk] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
12 12 misc Joint Case Management Statement Mon 04/29 5:17 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Malia Ashad. (Pointer, Adante)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
11 11 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 04/12 4:25 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ryan Connolly, Robinderpal Hayer, Ruth Jones, Collin Lenahan, Matthew Simon.. (Brumfiel, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 03/29 3:50 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Collin Lenahan, Robinderpal Hayer, Matthew Simon, Ruth Jones and Robert Connelly shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/12/2024 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/28 4:12 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Robinderpal Hayer, Ruth Jones, Collin Lenahan, Matthew Simon, Robert Connelly. (Brumfiel, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 03/06 2:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Ryan Connolly, Robinderpal Hayer, Ruth Jones, Collin Lenahan, Matthew Simon. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
7 7 misc Proposed Summons Tue 03/05 4:34 PM
Proposed Summons. (Buelna, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 02/16 2:43 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Malia Ashad.. (Pointer, Adante)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Fri 02/16 2:35 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Pointer, Adante)
Related: [-]
4 4 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 02/16 2:17 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/1/2024 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 02/01 12:38 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 02/01 9:57 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/15/2024. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/01 7:43 AM
COMPLAINT against Ryan Connolly, Robinderpal Hayer, Ruth Jones, Collin Lenahan, Matthew Simon ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19082213.). Filed by Malia Ashad.(Pointer, Adante)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet