State of Florida et al v. Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William F Jung |
Referred: | Amanda Arnold Sansone |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00317 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:0702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 01, 2024 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 30, 2024 4:24 AM EDT |
Defendant
Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Department of Health and Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Xavier Becerra
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chiquita Brooks-LaSure
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Florida Agency for Health Care Administration
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Florida
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
appeal
Transcript Information Form
Tue 07/23 3:32 PM
TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Florida Agency for Health Care Administration, State of Florida re34 Notice of Appeal. USCA number: 24-12217 No transcript(s) requested. (Kelson, Jared) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
appeal
Transmittal of initial appeal package
Tue 07/09 2:38 PM
TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re34 Notice of Appeal. (MCB) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 07/08 5:13 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to32 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Florida Agency for Health Care Administration, State of Florida. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number AFLMDC-22271850. (Kelson, Jared) |
|
Friday, May 31, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 05/31 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS) |
|
32 | 32
16
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Fri 05/31 8:28 AM
ORDER denying 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. This case is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending deadlines and close this case. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 5/31/2024. (LG) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/14 5:47 PM
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Department of Health and Human Services.(McMahon, Madeline) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Transcript
Tue 04/30 5:09 PM
TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING held on 4/18/24 before Judge WILLIAM F. JUNG. Court Reporter/Transcriber: TRACEY AURELIO. Email address: tracey_aurelio@flmd.uscourts.gov. Telephone number: 8133015448. NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely available to the public without redaction after ninety (90) calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 5/21/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2024. (TVA) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order
Tue 04/23 11:38 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: When the parties submit their draft, competing orders do not file them on this docket. Rather, copy each other and copy chambers email with pdf and MSWord versions of same. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 4/23/2024. (Jung, William) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
minutes
Minute entry
Thu 04/18 11:08 AM
Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge William F. Jung: on 4/18/2024. Court Reporter: Tracey Aurelio (JCG) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 04/01 3:45 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting in part unopposed 26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' response to the complaint due May 17, 2024. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 4/1/2024. (CCB) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Mon 04/01 3:03 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by All Defendants. (McMahon, Madeline) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Mon 03/25 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Hearing (in person) on2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2024 at 09:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. (Two hours reserved.)(CCB) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/05 6:11 PM
NOTICE by Florida Agency for Health Care Administration, State of Florida re2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction REQUEST FOR HEARING (McCotter, R.) |
|
23 | 23
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 03/05 6:09 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Florida Agency for Health Care Administration, State of Florida. (McCotter, R.) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 02/20 8:31 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Department of Health and Human Services. (McMahon, Madeline) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion to File Excess Pages
Tue 02/20 8:59 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 20 Joint Motion to File Excess Pages. Defendants may file a response of no more than 30 pages. Plaintiffs may file a reply of up to and including 15 pages. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 2/20/2024. (CCB) |
|
Monday, February 19, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
motion
File Excess Pages
Mon 02/19 6:23 PM
Consent MOTION to File Excess Pages by All Defendants. (McMahon, Madeline) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 02/08 2:28 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 18 Joint Motion to Establish Briefing Schedule. Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction is due February 20, 2024. Plaintiffs' reply is due March 5, 2024. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 2/8/2024. (CCB) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 02/08 11:56 AM
Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Establish Briefing Schedule by All Defendants. (McMahon, Madeline) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of appearance
Thu 02/08 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline McMahon on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Department of Health and Human Services (McMahon, Madeline) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/06 1:30 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Jared M. Kelson, R. Trent McCotter, and Laura B. Ruppalt may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel submit their Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration (see https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers) within seven days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 2/6/2024. (BEE) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/06 12:04 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Laura B. Ruppalt to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21738648 for $150 by Florida Agency for Health Care Administration. (McCotter, R.) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/06 12:02 PM
Unopposed MOTION for R. Trent McCotter to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21738639 for $150 by Florida Agency for Health Care Administration. (McCotter, R.) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/06 12:01 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Jared M. Kelson to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21738616 for $150 by Florida Agency for Health Care Administration. (McCotter, R.) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 02/05 10:54 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by State of Florida. (Christmas, Natalie) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Mon 02/05 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Natalie Christmas on behalf of State of Florida. Lead Counsel: Natalie Christmas. (Christmas, Natalie) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Proof of service
Fri 02/02 3:10 PM
PROOF of service by Florida Agency for Health Care Administration, State of Florida (McCotter, R.) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons issued as to USA
Fri 02/02 1:58 PM
SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JOS) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 02/02 8:51 AM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 02/02 8:50 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 02/01 4:52 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL R. Trent McCotter, Jared M. Kelson, Laura B. Ruppalt of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JG) |
|
5 | 5
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 02/01 4:45 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:24-cv-00317-WFJ-AAS. Motion(s) REFERRED:2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. (JG) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 02/01 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by R. Trent McCotter on behalf of Florida Agency for Health Care Administration. Lead Counsel: R. Trent McCotter. (McCotter, R.) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 02/01 3:03 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Florida Agency for Health Care Administration, State of Florida. (McCotter, R.) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Thu 02/01 3:00 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs.(McCotter, R.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Noll Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit FL CHIP State Plan, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit CMS SHO Letter, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit CMS FAQs, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 1995 Evaluation Report, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Becerra Letter | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/01 2:53 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21724119) filed by All Plaintiffs.(McCotter, R.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Summons |