43
|
|
43
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 08/01 2:42 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against CAREMARK RX, LLC, CAREMARK, LLC, CAREMARKPCS HEALTH, LLC, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY, INC., ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC., EVERNORTH HEALTH, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS, LLC, EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION, MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC., NOVO NORDISK INC., OPTUM, INC., OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., OPTUMRX HOLDINGS LLC, OPTUMRX INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC., filed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK.(SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
42
|
|
42
misc
Statement 7.1.1 Third Party Funding
Fri 06/21 5:42 PM
Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
41
|
|
41
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 03/18 5:04 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 2/20/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
40
|
|
40
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 03/18 5:03 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. OPTUMRX INC. waiver sent on 2/20/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
39
|
|
39
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 03/18 4:59 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. OPTUMRX HOLDINGS LLC waiver sent on 2/20/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
38
|
|
38
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 03/18 4:57 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. OPTUMINSIGHT, INC. waiver sent on 2/20/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
37
|
|
37
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 03/18 4:55 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. OPTUM, INC. waiver sent on 2/20/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
36
|
|
36
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 03/07 9:44 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC waiver sent on 2/20/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
35
|
|
35
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/01 11:01 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. OPTUMRX INC. served on 2/22/2024, answer due 3/14/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
34
|
|
34
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 03/01 7:49 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY waiver sent on 2/20/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
33
|
|
33
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 02/29 3:23 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. CVS PHARMACY, INC. waiver sent on 2/20/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
32
|
|
32
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 02/29 3:22 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. CVS HEALTH CORPORATION waiver sent on 2/20/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
31
|
|
31
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 02/29 3:20 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. CAREMARKPCS HEALTH, LLC waiver sent on 2/20/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
30
|
|
30
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 02/29 3:15 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. CAREMARK RX, LLC waiver sent on 2/20/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
29
|
|
29
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 02/29 3:12 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. CAREMARK, LLC waiver sent on 2/20/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
28
|
|
28
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 02/27 4:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC. served on 2/16/2024, answer due 3/8/2024; EVERNORTH HEALTH, INC. served on 2/16/2024, answer due 3/8/2024; EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS, LLC served on 2/16/2024, answer due 3/8/2024; EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY, INC. served on 2/16/2024, answer due 3/8/2024; EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC. served on 2/16/2024, answer due 3/8/2024; MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 2/16/2024, answer due 3/8/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
27
|
|
27
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 10:26 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. OPTUMRX HOLDINGS LLC served on 2/13/2024, answer due 3/5/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
26
|
|
26
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 10:24 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. CVS HEALTH CORPORATION served on 2/15/2024, answer due 3/7/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
25
|
|
25
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 10:22 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC served on 2/12/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
24
|
|
24
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 10:21 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. OPTUM, INC. served on 2/13/2024, answer due 3/7/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
23
|
|
23
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 10:19 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. OPTUM, INC. served on 2/15/2024, answer due 3/7/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
22
|
|
22
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 10:14 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 2/15/2024, answer due 3/7/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
21
|
|
21
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 10:12 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY, INC. served on 2/15/2024, answer due 3/7/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
20
|
|
20
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 10:11 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS, LLC served on 2/15/2024, answer due 3/7/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 10:09 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 10:05 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. CVS PHARMACY, INC. served on 2/15/2024, answer due 3/7/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 10:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 10:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. CAREMARKPCS HEALTH, LLC served on 2/15/2024, answer due 3/7/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 10:03 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 10:02 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. CAREMARK, LLC served on 2/15/2024, answer due 3/7/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 10:00 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC. served on 2/13/2024, answer due 3/5/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 9:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 9:57 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. OPTUMINSIGHT, INC. served on 2/15/2024, answer due 3/7/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 9:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. OPTUMRX INC. served on 2/15/2024, answer due 3/7/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 9:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. NOVO NORDISK INC. served on 2/15/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 9:50 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. NOVO NORDISK INC. served on 2/14/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 9:48 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC. served on 2/15/2024, answer due 3/7/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 9:46 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC. served on 2/15/2024, answer due 3/7/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 9:45 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY served on 2/15/2024, answer due 3/7/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 9:44 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. CAREMARK RX, LLC served on 2/15/2024, answer due 3/7/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 02/21 8:16 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK. NOVO NORDISK INC. waiver sent on 2/20/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 02/02 4:26 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CAREMARK RX, LLC, CAREMARK, LLC, CAREMARKPCS HEALTH, LLC, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY, INC., ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC., EVERNORTH HEALTH, INC. (F/K/A EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY), EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS, LLC, EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC., NOVO NORDISK INC., OPTUM, INC., OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., OPTUMRX HOLDINGS LLC, OPTUMRX INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (krg, )
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
139
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/02 3:54 PM
COMPLAINT against CAREMARK RX, LLC, CAREMARK, LLC, CAREMARKPCS HEALTH, LLC, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY, INC., ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC., EVERNORTH HEALTH, INC. (F/K/A EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY), EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS, LLC, EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC., NOVO NORDISK INC., OPTUM, INC., OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., OPTUMRX HOLDINGS LLC, OPTUMRX INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15061371) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ONONDAGA COUNTY, NEW YORK.(SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|
|
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 02/02 4:25 PM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (krg)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
order
Case Management Order
Fri 02/02 4:27 PM
This case is part of MDL 3080. Parties are expected to review and abide by all prior orders entered in this MDL, which can be found[LINK:here] . (krg, )
Related: [-]
|
|
|
mdl
MDL Direct File
Fri 02/02 4:28 PM
Member Case Direct File on 2/2/2024, for MDL 3080 INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION. (krg, )
Related: [-]
|