California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:24-bk-20455
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Mar 06, 2024
Dismissed:Feb 26, 2024
Terminated:Mar 15, 2024

Debtor
2106 West Apartments LLC
2027 Grand Canal Blvd Ste 20
Stockton, CA 95207-6650
Represented By
Dana M. Douglas
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Geoffrey Richards
PO Box 579
Orinda, CA 94563
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
Robert T Matsui United States Courthouse 501 I Street, Room 7-500
Sacramento, CA 95814


Docket last updated: 02/06/2024 12:01 AM PST
Monday, February 05, 2024
misc EFILED RECEIPT - Voluntary Petition Fee Paid (7) [ADI] Mon 02/05 10:54 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (Filing Fee Paid: $338.00, Receipt Number: 387679, eFilingID: 7311274) (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition 7 - Case Upload Mon 02/05 10:39 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $338.00) (Dana M. Douglas) (eFilingID: 7311274)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility First Meeting - 7 Business Mon 02/05 10:43 PM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 3/6/2024 at 10:30 AM. See our website for location. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Master Address List Mon 02/05 10:44 PM
Master Address List (auto)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice DO NOT USE Appointment of Interim Trustee - Including Amended Appointment (Produces Form) Mon 02/05 10:50 PM
Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Geoffrey Richards (auto)
Related: [-]