Derek Jones v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00101 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | May 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 06, 2024 4:52 AM EDT |
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Nation Ford Chemical Company 2300 Banks Street
Fort Mill, SC 29715 |
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
as successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Derek Jones
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, May 14, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 05/14 8:49 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Derek Jones Derek Jones Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-00101-RMG(Sulpizio, Gabrielle) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 02/08 2:44 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 1/8/2024), Derek Jones v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-00101-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern Illinois (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/07 11:22 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cper, ) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/07 11:19 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11514678.), filed by Derek Jones. Service due by 4/8/2024(cper, ) |