Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Jonathan D Greenberg
Case #: 1:24-cv-00232
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
order Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney Mon 04/28 2:43 PM
Order [non-document] The Court is in receipt of attorney Walters' and attorney Dooley's Motions to Withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. (Doc. Nos.49 and51 .) Additional attorneys have appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. (Doc. No.50 .) The Motions (Doc. Nos.49 and51 ) are GRANTED. Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 4/28/25.(D,Ky)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 27, 2025
51 51 motion Withdraw as Attorney Sun 04/27 11:44 PM
Motion by Matthew A. Dooley to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff Adam Joshua Boey.(Dooley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew A. Dooley
Friday, April 25, 2025
50 50 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Fri 04/25 1:37 PM
Attorney Appearance by Peter G. Pattakos , Gregory Gipson, and Zoran Balac filed by on behalf of Adam Joshua Boey. (Pattakos, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
minutes Status Conference Tue 04/22 1:28 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. The Court held a Zoom status conference on April 22, 2025. Present for Plaintiff were Douglas G. Walters and Matthew A. Dooley. Present for Defendant Brunswick Hills Township were Gregory A. Beck and Melvin L. Lute, Jr. Present for Defendants Piekut and Makrinos was Thomas N. Spyker. The Court sets this matter for an in-person attorneys only status conference on May 22, 2025, at 1:30 p.m., in Chambers 10B. Clients shall be available by telephone for the duration of the status conference. Time: 15 minutes (D,Ky)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
49 49 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 04/21 12:11 PM
Motion by Douglas G. Walters to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff Adam Joshua Boey.(Walters, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Douglas G. Walters
order Order Mon 04/21 12:31 PM
Order [non-document] Attorney Only Zoom Status Conference set for 4/22/2025 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. Zoom information will be emailed to counsel. Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 4/21/25. (D,Ky)
Related: [-]