Kentucky Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00011
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 08, 2024 2:19 AM EST
Defendant
Corey Ferguson (1)
Represented By
Patrick J. Renn
Smith & Helman
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joshua Ryan Porter
U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/07/2025 4:12 PM EST
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
Arrest of Corey Ferguson (HMC) [3:24-mj-00072-CHL]
Related: [-]
Initial Appearance as to Corey Ferguson held on 1/30/2024. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (HMC) [3:24-mj-00072-CHL]
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay as to Corey Ferguson (1). (HMC) [3:24-mj-00072-CHL]
Related: [-]
2 2 Sealed Document (HMC) [3:24-mj-00072-CHL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Patrick J. Renn appearing for Corey Ferguson Related [+] [3:24-mj-00072-CHL]
Related: [-] nn, Patrick
Thursday, February 01, 2024
4 4 ORDER ON INITIAL APPEARANCE by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. On January 30, 2024, United States Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, held an initial appearance on this matter via video conference. Assistant United States Attorney Emily Lantz appeared on behalf of the United States. The defendant was present from Oldham County Detention Center. Pat Renn, retained counsel, appeared on behalf of the defendant. The proceeding was digitally recorded and interpreted by Jean Bellego, Spanish Interpreter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a preliminary and detention hearing is scheduled for January 31, 2024, at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom before United States Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. The defendant is remanded to the custody of the United States Marshals Service pending further order of the Court. cc: Counsel (HMC) [3:24-mj-00072-CHL]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Pursuant to Due Process Protections Act by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 01/31/2024 as to Corey Ferguson. cc: Counsel (HMC) [3:24-mj-00072-CHL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
Schedules: Arraignment set for 2/12/2024 at 2:00 PM in Louisville Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. (JM)
Related: [-]
6 6 5 pgs INDICTMENT as to Corey Ferguson (1) count(s) 1, 2. (JM)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (JM)
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Joshua Ryan Porter appearing for USA. (JM)
Related: [-]
9 9 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT re6 Indictment (JM)
Related: [-]
10 10 Sealed Document (JM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Redacted Indictment
11 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 2/5/2024 as to Corey Ferguson. Arraignment set for 2/12/2024 at 2:00 PM in Louisville Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. (*This order was entered in the companion MJ action (3:24mj-72) after the case had been merged.) cc: counsel (JM)
Related: [-]