Kentucky Eastern District Court
Case #: 0:24-cr-00001
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 09, 2024 2:17 AM EST
Defendant
Andrew Zaheri (1)
Represented By
Jarrod James Beck
Law Office Of Jarrod J. Beck, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Erin Roth, AUSA
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Edky
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/09/2024 3:10 AM EST
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
Conflict Check run. (KSS)
Related: [-]
*** FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS OF Bunning to review: re1 NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE INFORMATION and MOTION for ARRAIGNMENT by USA filed as to Andrew Zaheri (KSS)
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION for Arraignment by USA as to Andrew Zaheri.Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (KSS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 19, 2024
3 3 ORDER:granting1 Motion for Arraignment as to Andrew Zaheri (1). Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/19/24. ARRAIGNMENT set for 2/12/2024 at 09:00 AM in ASHLAND before Judge David L. Bunning. (JLS)cc: COR,USM,USP
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
4 4 IT IS ORDERED that the Arraignment in this matter scheduled for Monday,February 12, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. in Ashland, is hereby rescheduled for Wednesday,February 7, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. in Covington . Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/26/24. (KSS)cc: COR,USM,USP, Cov Diary
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
5 5 INFORMATION as to Andrew Zaheri (1) count(s) 1. (KSS)
Related: [-]
6 6 MINUTE ENTRY for ARRAIGNMENT & REARRAIGNMENT on Information as to Andrew Zaheri held on 2/7/24 before Judge David L. Bunning:Jarrod J. Beck appeared as RETAINED counsel of record.Oral motion to unseal case is GRANTED. Waiver of Indictment filed; Information filed; Dft states true name; Copy of Information given to Dft; Dft formally arraigned; Information read; Sufficient factual basis for guilty plea; Dft Pleads Guilty to Information; Plea Agreement to be filed in record; original returned to the USA; Court orders PSR; Dft remanded to custody of USMS pending sentencing; Case continued for SENTENCING set for Tuesday, May 14, 2024 at 09:30 AM in ASHLAND before Judge David L. Bunning subject to intervening orders of the Court. (Court Reporter Lisa Wiesman) (KSS)cc: COR,USM,USP
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT as to Andrew Zaheri (KSS)
Related: [-]
8 8 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Andrew Zaheri. Plea agreement returned to USA. cc: COR,USP (KSS)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER in accordance with the Sentencing Reform Act as to Andrew Zaheri. Sentencing scheduled for Tuesday, May 14, 2024, in Ashland, Kentucky, at 9:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 2/7/24. (KSS)cc: COR,USM,USP
Related: [-]