District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00020
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 09, 2024 2:39 AM EST
Defendant
BILLY GOBER (1)
Represented By
Joseph J. Long
Joseph J. Long
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Katherine Elizabeth Boyles
Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/09/2024 3:45 AM EST
Thursday, August 17, 2023
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to BILLY GOBER (1). (zhsj) [1:23-mj-00209-MAU]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Facts
3 3 MOTION to Seal Affidavit in Support of Criminal Case by USA as to BILLY GOBER. (zhsj) Modified date filed on 8/27/2023 (zltp). [1:23-mj-00209-MAU]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Affidavit in Support of Criminal Case as to BILLY GOBER (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya on 8/1/7/2023. (zhsj) [1:23-mj-00209-MAU]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
Arrest of BILLY GOBER in Smithville, Texas. (zhsj) [1:23-mj-00209-MAU]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to BILLY GOBER. (zhsj) [1:23-mj-00209-MAU]
Related: [-]
MINUTE ORDER as to BILLY GOBER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant appear for an initial appearance on 9/26/2023 at 12:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya. The hearing will be conducted by video teleconference; call-in instructions will be provided to counsel prior to the hearing. Counsel for the United States is directed to ensure that counsel for Defendant has received this Order and will provide the information to Defendant. If Defendant does not have counsel, counsel for the United States is directed to contact the Office of the Federal Public Defender for the District of Columbia and provide their office with the information contained in this Order. If the parties have questions about this Order or the scheduled hearing, please contact the Courtroom Deputy at 202-354-3165. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 9/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 9/13/2023. (znjb) [1:23-mj-00209-MAU]
Related: [-]
5 5 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 9/13/2023 as to BILLY GOBER. (zhsj) [1:23-mj-00209-MAU]
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 17, 2023
6 6 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to BILLY GOBER.(Boyles, Katherine) [1:23-mj-00209-MAU]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, September 21, 2023
7 7 ORDER granting6 Motion for Protective Order Governing Discovery as to BILLY GOBER (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 9/21/2023. (znjb) [1:23-mj-00209-MAU]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
8 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Edward L. Tarpley, Jr. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10375523. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BILLY GOBER.(Tarpley, Edward) [1:23-mj-00209-MAU]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Declaration
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
ORAL MOTION for Speedy Trial by USA as to BILLY GOBER. (znjb) [1:23-mj-00209-MAU]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya: First Appearance in the District as to BILLY GOBER held on 9/26/2023. Defendant present by video. The Court advised the Government of its Due Process Obligations under Rule 5(f). Defendant has retained Counsel. Oral Motion by the Government for Speedy Trial as to BILLY GOBER; heard and granted. Speedy Trial Excluded between 9/26/2023 to 11/28/2023 in the Interest of Justice (XT). Defendant waives right to Preliminary Hearing. Status Hearing set for 11/28/2023 at 1:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant released on Personal Recognizance; Court Reporter: FTR- GOLD; FTR Time Frame: CRTM 5: [1:28:16-1:32:41]; Defense Attorney: Joseph Long; US Attorney: Frederick Yette for Katherine Boyles; Pretrial Officer: Katrina Stanford. (znjb) [1:23-mj-00209-MAU]
Related: [-]
MINUTE ORDER as to BILLY GOBER: As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya on 9/26/2023. (znjb) [1:23-mj-00209-MAU]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER granting8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCrR 44.5(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] as to BILLY GOBER (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya on 9/26/2023. (zcll) [1:23-mj-00209-MAU]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to BILLY GOBER (1) Personal Recognizance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya on 9/26/2023. (Attachment: #1 Appearance Bond) (znjb) [1:23-mj-00209-MAU]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
12 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph J. Long appearing for BILLY GOBER (zstd) [1:23-mj-00209-MAU]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
13 13 Joint MOTION to Continue November 28 Status Conference , Joint MOTION to Exclude Time under the Speedy Trial Act by USA as to BILLY GOBER.(Boyles, Katherine) [1:23-mj-00209-MAU]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
15 15 ORDER granting13 Motion to Continue Status Hearing and Exclude Time as to BILLY GOBER (1). Status hearing continued to 1/25/2024 at 1:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 11/21/2023. (zcll) [1:23-mj-00209-MAU]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
MINUTE ORDER: The hearing currently scheduled for 1/25/2024 before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya is hereby VACATED, as BILLY GOBER: has had an initial appearance in this jurisdiction and has been charged by Indictment. As such, there are no pending matters necessitating action by a magistrate judge. The parties are directed to contact the assigned District Judge to schedule a status hearing and arraignment, if one has not yet been set. The parties are instructed to address any requests to toll the Speedy Trial Act to the assigned District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 1/10/2024. (znjb)
Related: [-]
Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to BILLY GOBER: Status hearing continued to 1/25/2024 at 1:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya is hereby VACATED. (znjb)
Related: [-]
16 16 INDICTMENT as to BILLY GOBER (1) count(s) 1, 2-3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8. (zstd) (Main Document 16 replaced on 1/11/2024) (zltp).
Related: [-]