Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Jack Zouhary
Case #: 3:24-cv-00263
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 5:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Norplas Industries, Inc.
Represented By
Allan S. Rubin
Jackson Lewis - Southfield
contact info
Richard L. Hilbrich
Jackson Lewis
contact info
Plaintiff
Angelica Balderas
Represented By
Kevin M. McDermott, II
Scott & Winters
contact info
Joseph F. Scott
Scott & Winters
contact info
Ryan A. Winters
Scott & Winters
contact info
Daniel I. Bryant
Bryant Legal
contact info
Esther E. Bryant
Bryant Legal
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
42 42 minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Minute Order _ Status Conference Tue 02/11 1:35 PM
ORDER . Zoom Status Conference held on February 10, 2025. This Court reviewed with counsel the status of this case. Counsel will continue to exchange necessary documents and information in preparation for their June 4 Mediation. Counsel shall promptly notify this Court the results of the Mediation. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/11/2025. (20 mins) (V,S)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Fri 01/31 10:34 AM
NOTICE [non-document]. Due a conflict in this Court's schedule, a Zoom Status Conference set for 2/7/2025 is vacated and reset for Monday, February 10, 2025 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. A Zoom invitation was previously sent to counsel by email. (V,S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order Wed 01/29 3:51 PM
ORDER [non-document]. Zoom Status Conference set for 1/30/2025 is vacated and reset for Friday, February 7, 2025 at 10:45 AM . A Zoom invitation was previously sent to counsel by email. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/29/2025. (V,S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
41 41 order Minute Order _ Telephone Conference Wed 12/18 1:00 PM
ORDER . Zoom Status Conference held on December 18, 2024. The Motion for leave to file for partial summary judgment39 is denied without prejudice. A further Zoom Status Conference is scheduled for Thursday, January 30, 2025 at 3:00 PM. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/18/2024. (30 mins) (V,S)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Tue 12/10 9:14 AM
NOTICE [non-document] of Zoom Status Conference set for Wednesday, December 18, 2024 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. Zoom invitation will be sent to counsel by email. (V,S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
order Order on Motion to extend deadlines Wed 12/04 12:37 PM
ORDER [non-document] granting40 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery Deadlines in Discovery Order34 extended to February 1, 2025 . Further Joint Status Report due by February 1, 2025 . Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/4/2024. (V,S)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
40 40 motion Extension (of deadlines) Tue 12/03 8:00 PM
Joint Motion for extension of November 27, 2024 Discovery Order Deadline until February 1, 2025 filed by Plaintiff Angelica Balderas. Related document(s)34 . (Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
39 39 5 pgs motion Order Wed 11/27 2:55 PM
Motion to file an early partial Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 Motion and Response of Plaintiff as well as Plaintiff's Request to file a Motion for FLSA Notice and Tolling filed by Defendant Norplas Industries, Inc.. (Hilbrich, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
38 38 notice Notice (atty event) Thu 11/14 10:06 PM
Notice of Filing Consent to Join filed by Angelica Balderas.(Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join
Thursday, October 31, 2024
37 37 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motions Protective Order Thu 10/31 11:53 AM
Protective Order approving35 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order regarding confidential documents. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/31/2024. (V,S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
36 36 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 10/30 10:06 AM
Notice of Change of Address filed by Angelica Balderas. (Scott, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
35 35 motion Protective Order Tue 10/29 8:21 AM
Stipulated Motion for protective order filed by Defendant Norplas Industries, Inc.. (Hilbrich, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
34 34 minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Minute Order _ Status Conference Thu 10/17 3:49 PM
DISCOVERY ORDER . In-Person Status Conference held on October 17, 2024. This Court reviewed with counsel the recently filed Joint Status Report33 detailing several ongoing discovery issues. After discussion with counsel, this case shall proceed as follows, with the following tasks to be completed no later than November 27, 2024 . See Order for details. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/17/2024. (1 hour) (V,S)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
minutes ~Util - Set Hearings Order Fri 10/11 3:21 PM
ORDER [non-document]. An In-Person Status Conference is set for Thursday, October 17, 2024 at 10 AM in Chambers 485 regarding pending discovery issues. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/11/2024. (D,L)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
33 33 notice Status Report (atty event) Thu 10/10 10:55 PM
Joint Status Report filed by Angelica Balderas. Related document(s)32 .(Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
32 32 minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Minute Order _ Telephone Conference Thu 08/22 2:46 PM
ORDER . Zoom Status Conference held on August 20, 2024. Counsel report they are working on agreed discovery (see Docs.28 -29 ). Counsel shall file a Brief Joint Status Report by October 10, 2024 outlining next steps. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/20/2024. (15 mins) (V,S)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
31 31 notice Status Report (atty event) Mon 08/19 12:49 PM
Joint Status Report Regarding Production of Payroll and Time Records, Tolling, and Request to Convert In-Person Hearing to a Zoom Status Conference filed by Angelica Balderas. Related document(s)30 .(Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
30 30 minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Minute Order _ Telephone Conference Thu 08/15 4:08 PM
ORDER . Zoom Status Conference held on August 15, 2024. This Court reviewed the recently filed Status reports (28 -29 ). The parties set forth two discovery issues: scope of document production and tolling of the statute of limitations. To properly address these issues, this Court scheduled an In-person Hearing for Tuesday, August 20, 2024 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 209. Only one lawyer per side need attend in-person; others interested may attend by Zoom. Counsel may file a memorandum (2-page limit) addressing the two issues by Monday, August 19, 2024 at 1 PM . And at that time as well, counsel shall notify chambers who is attending the hearing in-person and by Zoom. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/15/2024. (V,S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
29 29 notice Status Report (atty event) Wed 08/14 9:55 PM
Status Report of Defendant, Norplas Industries, Inc., filed by Norplas Industries, Inc.. (Hilbrich, Richard)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Status Report (atty event) Wed 08/14 6:42 PM
Status Report filed by Angelica Balderas. Related document(s)23 ,27 .(Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
27 27 minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Minute Order _ Telephone Conference Wed 07/10 9:59 AM
ORDER . Telephone Status Conference held on July 8, 2024. This Court reviewed letters from counsel for both sides dated June 27, July 3, and July 5 setting forth disagreements over the scope of discovery at this stage of the case. The deadline to complete these initial depositions is extended to July 30, 2024 . The Zoom Status Conference previously scheduled for July 18 is vacated, and rescheduled for Thursday, August 15, 2024 at 9:30 AM . A Zoom invitation will be sent to counsel by email. See Order for additional details. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/10/2024. (30 mins) (V,S)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Mon 07/08 10:58 AM
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Telephone Status Conference set for Today, July 8, 2024 at 2:30 PM (EST) before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line (provided by email). (V,S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
26 26 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 07/03 2:56 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by Angelica Balderas.(Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join
Friday, May 17, 2024
25 25 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 05/17 3:30 PM
Answer to24 Amended complaint filed by Norplas Industries, Inc.. (Hilbrich, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
24 24 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/03 6:18 PM
First Amended complaint against Norplas Industries, Inc.. Filed by Angelica Balderas. (Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
23 23 minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Minute Order _ Telephone Conference Fri 05/03 2:48 PM
INITIAL CASE SCHEDULE . Zoom Status Conference held on May 2, 2024. After consulting with counsel, the following interim case schedule was agreed upon: Responses to Defendant's recently filed discovery requests are stayed pending further discussion between counsel or Court assistance. (See Docs.21 -22 ). Plaintiff granted leave to file an Amended Complaint by 5/3/2024 . Answer to the Amended Complaint due 5/17/2024 . Counsel shall file a brief Joint Status Report on tasks accomplished and best next steps prior to a Zoom Status Conference on July 18, 2024 at 9 AM . See Order for additional deadlines and details. Judge Jack Zouhary on 5/3/2024. (20 mins) (V,S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
22 22 notice Status Report (atty event) Wed 05/01 6:17 PM
Status Report as to Plaintiff's Proposed Preliminary Case Schedule filed by Angelica Balderas. Related document(s)19 .(Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Wed 05/01 5:15 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Norplas Industries, Inc.. (Hilbrich, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
20 20 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 04/10 4:13 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by Angelica Balderas.(Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Form
19 19 order Minute Order _ Telephone Conference Wed 04/10 3:58 PM
ORDER . Telephone Conference held on April 10, 2024. Counsel shall submit by May 1, 2024 a Case Schedule for the next six months with jointly-agreed deadlines (or competing requests) for completion of Rule 26(a) disclosures and any other items to move this case forward. Counsel shall include a date for filing a brief Joint Status Report. Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/10/2024. (15 mins) (V,S)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
18 18 notice Notice (atty event) Tue 04/09 5:04 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by Angelica Balderas.(Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Form
Thursday, April 04, 2024
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/04 5:05 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, filed by Norplas Industries, Inc.. (Hilbrich, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
16 16 notice Notice (atty event) Mon 04/01 2:18 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Angelica Balderas.(Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Forms
Monday, March 25, 2024
15 15 5 pgs order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Mon 03/25 10:16 AM
Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Allan S. Rubin for Norplas Industries, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/25/2024. (V,S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ACTL Code of Conduct
Friday, March 22, 2024
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/22 10:44 AM
Motion for attorney Allan S. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12471119, filed by Defendant Norplas Industries, Inc..(Hilbrich, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 03/20 2:04 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by Angelica Balderas.(Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Form
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Tue 03/19 10:06 AM
NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Telephone Conference set for Wednesday, April 10, 2024 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line (to be provided by email). No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Telephone Conference. (V,S)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
12 12 notice Notice (atty event) Fri 03/15 3:57 PM
Notice of Filing Consent to Join filed by Angelica Balderas.(Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Form
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
11 11 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 03/13 3:02 PM
Notice of Filing Consent to Join filed by Angelica Balderas.(Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Form
Monday, March 11, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (atty event) Mon 03/11 2:53 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Angelica Balderas.(Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Forms
Thursday, March 07, 2024
9 9 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Thu 03/07 4:41 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Magna International, Inc. for Norplas Industries, Inc. filed by Norplas Industries, Inc.. (Hilbrich, Richard)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension (answer complaint) Thu 03/07 10:28 AM
Stipulated Motion for extension of time until April 4, 2024 to answer , move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Norplas Industries, Inc.. Related document(s)1 . (Hilbrich, Richard)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Thu 03/07 10:33 AM
ORDER [non-document] granting8 Stipulated Motion of the Parties for a Pleading Extension for Defendant, Norplas Industries, Inc. Defendant's Answer is now due April 4, 2024 . Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/7/2024. (V,S)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
7 7 notice Notice (atty event) Fri 03/01 10:47 AM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Angelica Balderas.(Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Forms
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 02/28 5:38 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Angelica Balderas.(Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Forms
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
5 5 notice Notice (atty event) Tue 02/27 6:00 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by Angelica Balderas.(Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Wed 02/21 11:39 AM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Norplas Industries, Inc. on 2/16/2024, filed on behalf of Angelica Balderas Related document(s)1 ,2 ,. (Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
3 3 order Initial Order - Judge Zouhary Wed 02/14 9:02 AM
Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/14/24. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice re Prompt Service - JZ Wed 02/14 9:01 AM
Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant. Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Mon 02/12 3:50 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Norplas Industries, Inc.. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
1 1 32 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 02/12 3:04 PM
Collective and Class Action Complaint with jury demand against Norplas Industries, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12403665.. Filed by Angelica Balderas. (Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent to be Named Plaintiff,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 02/12 3:43 PM
Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 02/12 3:44 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (K,AR)
Related: [-]