Dohrman et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00608 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Feb 06, 2024 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:24-cv-00360 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 04, 2024 5:43 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
James Phelps
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Mallon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James R. Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raul Perev
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Orvis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sue Oakley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Duncan Nobinger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger Wood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andre Knight
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
C/O David Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rick Meadows
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Herbert Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Olabisi Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jarrett McMillan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joanne McMahon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald McCain
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Shawley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Wittlieff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy Whiteeagle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eva Walton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Trichenor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joni Stringer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Slusher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Simmons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Pierrie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol Ann Russell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mario Rodgers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronnie Roberson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Rios
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bill Riley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Proctor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bobby Poisso
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Duane Dohrman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Diggs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Connell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Colyher Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Cawthon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Carroll
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodrigo Camarao
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tahnya Dorsey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lloyd Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Xavier Brooks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Breze
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Bishop
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stevon Billingsley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lori Arndt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joel Headlee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth P. Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Jones
216471 Evans Correctional Institution 610 Highway 9 West
Bennettsville, SC 29512 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Easter Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Jones
309208 Lieber Correctional Institution PO Box 205
Ridgeville, SC 29472 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Manolito Jaldon Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Hyatt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Hroszowy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Kastner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Moriah Hawley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Green
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dinah Goodman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Goocher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Glover
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Frandsen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert A. Elliott
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Gilbert A Davis
Terminated: 06/12/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Cole
Terminated: 03/15/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Brand
Terminated: 04/08/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Bentley
Terminated: 03/21/2024
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/10 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Wade, Robert Candiano, Michael Perone, Ernest Pickett, Felix Espinoza, John Farley, Deahn Connor, David Farrier, John Benchoff, Jacqueline Arcos, Richard Comer, Paula Edge, Oliver Dillard Jr, John Utt, Jr, Cecil Blain, Kevin Wittlieff, Adam Poirier, Kevin Gombert, Lynn Gore, Georgia Harris NOTICE OF DISMISSAL BY LISTED PLAINTIFFS ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) & SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/03 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Susan Harris, Patricia Minietta, Juan Hernandez, Michael Blau, Joseph Anthony Lupica, Ken Coles, Lisa Yoder, James Mariott, Janie Vega-Nichols, James Connell, Angela Green, Donald McCain, Raul Gil, Erika Rexrode, Robert Velazquez, James Bice, Keith Jones, Paul Mussatto, Larry Newman, Billy Ashley, Brian Lauterbach, Steuart Pond NOTICE OF DISMISSAL BY LISTED PLAINTIFFS ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) & SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/23 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Allen Bieber, Gregory Goodrich, Eugene Quillia, Thomas Reyna, Tracy Sherrod-Bryce, Felix StanKiewicz, Barbara Bowens, Cornell Galloway, Kevin McKoy, Eddie Webb, Carlos Ramos, Beverly Thoman, Ronald Hale, Rita Brown, Tommy Dennard, Gregory Douglas, Kenneth Duchateau, Asuncion Fisher, Kenneth Ivey, Ramon Luciano, Jr, George Mitchell, David Wade, Aaron Bell, Emalynn Bell, Lacey Bell, Alivia Bell, Alexis Carroll, Andrea Carroll, Lorenzo Barnett, Robert Brown, Aldrich Cherry, Donald Cohen, Jacques Corvoisier, Milton Hammon, Sean Scaggs, Rodney Wayne Halstead, James Fragale, Vinson Reynoso, Edward Proctor, Lawrence Ahlin, Chad Brown, Chester Jones, Benjamin Romero, Troy Adams, Monte Allred, Bruce Brown, Bernice Gadson, Ernest Stringer Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Personal Injury Claims OnlyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Lanciotti, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/14 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Robert Ogletree, Maryanne Sanders, Gloria Sparks, Todd Foland, Mary Freeman, Roderick Green, Roy Harris, Gary Lachney, Tim Tilley, Bobby Wiggins, Fredrick Bulter, Kim Delong, Scott Gage, Michael Laudati, Raymond Mays, William McComb, Michael Miller, Albert North, Andrew Robert, Darrell Tamayo, Ralph Wilson, Karen Barnett, Lamont Gardner, Carolyn Glover, Mitchell Glover, Theodore Green, Reinherd Grenz, Dennis Kane, Robin Kindell, Adrain Loomis, III, Mack Travis, Steve Yannoni, Lupe Lopez, Benjamin Walton, Stevon Billingsley, Xavier Brooks, Richard Brown, John Carroll, Robert Colyher Sr, Kevin Diggs, Kenneth P. Jordan, Rick Meadows, Sue Oakley, Bobby Poisso, Eva Walton, Ronald Twist, Greg Wallace Without prejudice, as to listed plaintiffsAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, June 12, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 06/12 6:29 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gilbert A Davis Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-00608-RMG(Lanciotti, Patrick) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 04/08 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gary Brand Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-00608-RMG(Lanciotti, Patrick) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 03/21 3:48 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gary Bentley Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-00608-RMG(Lanciotti, Patrick) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 03/15 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Cole Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-00608-RMG(Lanciotti, Patrick) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Mon 02/12 12:57 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
7 | 7
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 02/12 11:07 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 2/6/2024), 1:24-cv-00360, Dohrman et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-00608-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 02/12 10:40 AM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:24-cv-00360. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 1/31/2024) (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/12/2024.] | |
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/12/2024.] | ||
Thursday, January 18, 2024 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/12/2024.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/12/2024.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/12/2024.] | ||
Wednesday, January 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co)..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/12/2024.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/12/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 161039/2023. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28822888).Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co)..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/12/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial |