West Virginia Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:B Mckay Mignault
Case #: 6:24-bk-60017
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2024
Dismissed:May 17, 2024
Terminated:Jun 11, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Kronos Advanced Technologies WV, LLC
2501 Garfield Ave
Parkersburg, WV 26101-1916
Represented By
Joe M. Supple
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
2025 Robert C. Byrd U.S. Courthouse 300 Virginia Street, East
Charleston, WV 25301
Represented By
Gary O. Kinder
U.S. Trustee'S Office
contact info
Elizabeth Kavitz
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 12:03 PM EDT
Thursday, June 27, 2024
court Debtor(s) or Defendant(s) Returned Mail Fri 06/28 6:30 AM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 06/13/2024 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form pdf001 to: Kronos Advanced Technologies, Inc. 4768 Park Granada Suite 200 B Calabasas, CA 91302-3349. (admin adi)
Related: [-]