Delaware District Court
Judge:Maryellen Noreika
Case #: 1:24-cv-00216
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2024
Terminated:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 11:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Protego Financial Corporation
Plaintiff
Optiv Security Inc.
Represented By
Stephen J. Kraftschik
Polsinelli PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Protego Trust Company
Terminated: 04/29/2024

GPO Nov 12 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- re 14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Protego Financial Corporation. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (3) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (3) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 11/26/2024. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/12/2024. (lih)
GPO Dec 18 2024
ORDER ADOPTING 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION GRANTING 14 Plaintiff's Request for Clerk to Enter Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/18/2024. (dlw)

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, December 26, 2024
21 21 misc Declaration Thu 12/26 3:29 PM
DECLARATION re19 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion for Default Judgment, Order on Report and Recommendations,20 Default Judgment /Declaration of Mailing by Optiv Security Inc..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
20 20 order Judgment - Default Wed 12/18 12:56 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Optiv Security Inc. against Protego Financial Corporation (CASE CLOSED) Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/18/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Report and Recommendations Wed 12/18 12:54 PM
ORDER ADOPTING18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION GRANTING14 Plaintiff's Request for Clerk to Enter Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/18/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
18 18 motion Report and Recommendations Tue 11/12 10:42 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- re14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Protego Financial Corporation. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (3) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (3) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 11/26/2024. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/12/2024. (lih)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
17 17 order Order Referring Motion Fri 09/27 4:06 PM
ORAL ORDER REFERRING14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Protego Financial Corporation - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this motion is referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/27/2024. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(dlw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
16 16 misc Declaration Tue 09/17 11:35 AM
DECLARATION re15 Declaration,14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Protego Financial Corporation by Optiv Security Inc..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A-B
Friday, August 23, 2024
15 15 misc Declaration Fri 08/23 5:30 PM
DECLARATION re14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Protego Financial Corporation by Optiv Security Inc..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
14 14 motion Default Judgment Fri 08/23 5:27 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Protego Financial Corporation - filed by Optiv Security Inc.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
13 13 misc Declaration Mon 07/15 12:55 PM
DECLARATION of mailing re12 Clerk's Entry of Default by Optiv Security Inc.(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 7/15/2024 (dlw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A-B
Monday, June 24, 2024
12 12 order Default Entered by the Clerk Mon 06/24 10:56 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Protego Financial Corporation - Re:9 Request for Default. (as)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
11 11 service Affidavit of Service Fri 06/07 12:34 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Request for Entry of Default and Affidavit in Support served on Protego Financial Corporation Registered Agent and Principal Place of Business on May 31, 2024, filed by Optiv Security Inc..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A-B
Friday, May 24, 2024
10 10 misc Affidavit Fri 05/24 3:34 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Stephen J. Kraftschik re9 REQUEST for Default as to Protego Financial Corporation filed by Optiv Security Inc..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits 1-5
9 9 motion Default (Request for Clerk's Entry of Default) Fri 05/24 3:30 PM
REQUEST for Default as to Protego Financial Corporation - filed by Optiv Security Inc.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/02 12:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Optiv Security Inc..Protego Financial Corporation served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
7 7 service Summons Reissued - Alias Summons Mon 04/29 11:54 AM
Alias Summons issued as to Protego Financial Corporation. (apk)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
6 6 cmp Complaint - Amended Fri 04/19 5:00 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Protego Financial Corporation- filed by Optiv Security Inc..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A-B,
Att: 2 Summons Forms - Unsigned Alias Summons - Protego Financial Corporation
Thursday, February 22, 2024
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Thu 02/22 11:05 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Related papers served on A. Gaitan of Protego Trust Company on February 21, 2024, filed by Optiv Security Inc.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/21 11:44 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued - Electronic Service Tue 02/20 10:09 AM
Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mrr)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Tue 02/20 10:00 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Optive Parent Inc. for Optiv Security Inc. - filed by Optiv Security Inc. (mrr)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Tue 02/20 9:52 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mrr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/20 9:48 AM
COMPLAINT filed against Protego Trust Company (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4341414.) - filed by Optiv Security Inc.(mrr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet