Mazza v. 3M Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00844 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Nevada, 3:24-cv-00040 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 11:59 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Mazza
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 02/21 12:39 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Nevada (associated as of 2/16/2024), 3:24-cv-00040, Mazza v. 3M Company, as DSC case 2:24-cv-00844-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
9 | 9
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 02/21 12:35 PM
Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 3:24-cv-00040. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
8 | 8 TRANSMITTAL of case to the District of South Carolina. Case and docket sheet transferred electronically. (Pursuant to CTO-173 for MDL No. 2873.) (no image attached) (CJS) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/21/2024.] | |
Thursday, February 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 CERTIFIED MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-173 for MDL No. 2873) transferring case to the District of South Carolina. Signed by MDL Panel on 2/14/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/21/2024.] | |
Wednesday, February 14, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 UNCERTIFIED MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-173 for MDL No. 2873) transferring case to the District of South Carolina. Signed by MDL Panel on 2/14/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/21/2024.] | |
Att: 1 MDL Minute Order | ||
Wednesday, February 07, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant 3M Company.. (Fears, Chad) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/21/2024.] | |
Thursday, January 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Charles Mazza. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Bus, Steven) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/21/2024.] | |
Wednesday, January 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 1/24/2024. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/8/2024. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/23/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/21/2024.] | |
2 | 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by 3M Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Fears, Chad) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/21/2024.] | |
1 | 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Case Number CV24-00076, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7564246) by 3M Company. Proof of service due by 4/10/2024. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/3/2024. (Fears, Chad) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from Nevada on 2/21/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (DRM) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/21/2024.] |