Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:23-bk-02904

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Catherine Peek Mcewen
Case #: 8:24-ap-00056
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Tampa Bay Plumbers, LLC
6205 Johns Road, Suite 12
Tampa, FL 33634
Represented By
Tampa Bay Plumbers, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Fox Capital Group, Inc.
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP 1001 Water Street, Suite 1000
Tampa, FL 33602
Represented By
Lauren G Raines
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Shanna M Kaminski
Kaminski Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, November 04, 2024
10 10 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 11/05 11:09 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: APPEARANCES via zoom: Jonathan Semach RULING: Continued Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Contains negative notice. Filed by Jonathan A Semach on behalf of Defendant Tampa Bay Plumbers, LLC Related [+]. (Semach, Jonathan) Doc #3 ...Continued in open court to 5/5/2025 at 10:00 a.m. - no further notice will be given... All parties may attend the hearing in person. Parties are directed to review Judge McEwens Procedures Governing Court Appearances (available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/judges/mcewen) for her policies and procedures for remote attendance at hearings by video or telephone via Zoom. ... - Response to Motion to Dismiss Complaint Filed by Lauren G Raines on behalf of Plaintiff Fox Capital Group, Inc.. (Raines, Lauren) Doc #5. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-] 1 3
Monday, May 06, 2024
9 9 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 05/07 11:23 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: APPEARANCES via zoom: Jonathan Semach, Michael Markham RULING: Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Contains negative notice. Filed by Jonathan A Semach on behalf of Defendant Tampa Bay Plumbers, LLC Related [+]. (Semach, Jonathan) Doc #3 ...Continued in open court to 11/4/2024 at 10:00 a.m. - no further notice will be given... For remote appearances, please refer to Judge McEwen's webpage at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/judges/tampa/mcewen/Judge_McEwen_Hearing_Procedures.pdf ... - Response to Motion to Dismiss Complaint Filed by Lauren G Raines on behalf of Plaintiff Fox Capital Group, Inc.. (Raines, Lauren) Doc #5. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-] 1 3
Sunday, April 28, 2024
court Hearing Set Sun 04/28 2:53 PM
Hearing Set 5/6/2024 at 10:00 a.m. in re: Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. For remote appearances, please refer to Judge McEwen's webpage at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/judges/tampa/mcewen/Judge_McEwen_Hearing_Procedures.pdf Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2024 at 10:00 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . (Pamella)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
court Wed 03/20 1:12 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 05/06/2024 10:00 AM Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Contains negative notice. Doc3 . This entry will serve as the official notification of hearing from the court. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 3
Monday, March 18, 2024
8 8 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 03/18 2:32 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Lauren G Raines on behalf of Plaintiff Fox Capital Group, Inc.. (Raines, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 17, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Mon 03/18 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 03/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Friday, March 15, 2024
6 6 court Notice of Deficient Filing (AP) Fri 03/15 3:28 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Statement of Corporate Ownership not filed by Plaintiff. Compliance required no later than 4/1/2024. (Deborah K.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
5 5 answer Response - Other than Motions Thu 03/14 7:06 PM
Response to Motion to Dismiss Complaint Filed by Lauren G Raines on behalf of Plaintiff Fox Capital Group, Inc. Related [+]. (Raines, Lauren)
Related: [-] 3
Friday, March 01, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Attorney Address Correction Fri 03/01 3:15 PM
Notice of Attorney Address Correction Filed by Lauren G Raines on behalf of Plaintiff Fox Capital Group, Inc.. (Raines, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
3 3 motion Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 02/29 4:26 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Contains negative notice. Filed by Jonathan A Semach on behalf of Defendant Tampa Bay Plumbers, LLC Related [+]. (Semach, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Thu 02/29 8:56 AM
Summons issued along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 04/01/2024. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
court Attorney Address Discrepancy General Item 1.1 - Address Thu 02/29 8:37 AM
Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Firm or Address for Attorney on PDF Image does not Match the Address in the CM/ECF System. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO FILE A NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY WITHIN TWO BUSINESS DAYS IN ACCORDANCE WITH Local Rule 2091-2 and submit a request to update their address through PACER:[LINK:https://pacer.uscourts.gov/] Related [+] (Kimberely)
Related: [-] [1 ]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Thu 02/22 5:34 PM
Complaint by Fox Capital Group, Inc. against Tampa Bay Plumbers, LLC. (Fee Paid.) Nature of Suit: [62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)],[65 (Dischargeability - other)]. (Raines, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3