Erika Geraghty v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fred W Slaughter |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00382 |
Nature of Suit | 310 Torts - Personal Injury - Airplane |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Feb 23, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 13, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Orange County Superior Court, 30-02023-01366405-CU- |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 21, 2024 2:13 AM PDT |
Defendant
Delta Air Lines, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Hon Patricia Yim Cowett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erika Geraghty
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 09/13 9:57 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by PLAINTIFF Erika Geraghty.(Escalante, Ruben) |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
order
Protective Order
Thu 06/06 9:53 AM
DISCOVERY MATTER: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick re Stipulation for Protective Order22 . (see document for details). (et) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
stip
Protective Order
Tue 06/04 3:24 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc..(Zokaeim, Dana) |
|
Monday, June 03, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form
Mon 06/03 11:26 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Patricia Yim Cowett has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst) |
|
Friday, May 31, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
adr
Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)
Fri 05/31 3:54 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Hon. Patricia Yim Cowett may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Erika Geraghty(Escalante, Ruben) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Thu 04/18 11:19 AM
ORDER ON PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES (CIVIL CASES) by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 04/18 10:19 AM
MINUTES SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, having reviewed the pleadings and the parties' submissions pursuant to FRCP 26(f), VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2024, and sets the following schedule: Jury Trial set for 5/2/2025 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 4/24/2025 at 8:30 AM. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties: 10/17/2024. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 10/24/2024. Last Date to Hear Motions: 1/30/2025. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 2/13/2025. Motions in Limine with Proposed Orders: 4/3/2025. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 4/10/2025. (See document for further information). (jp) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Report
Thu 04/11 1:02 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT REGARDING CONFERENCE OF PARTIES COUNSEL REPORT filed by Plaintiff Erika Geraghty. (Escalante, Ruben) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 03/25 3:04 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The court's Order to Show Cause issued on March 19, 2024, is hereby DISCHCARGED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/25 1:47 PM
Notice RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION filed by Plaintiff Erika Geraghty. (Escalante, Ruben) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 03/21 3:01 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2024 at 9:00 a.m. *See Order for details.* (mku) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 03/19 2:36 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than 3/26/2024, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. See document for further information. (jp) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Fri 03/08 4:07 PM
DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Erika Geraghty (Escalante, Ruben) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Mon 03/04 4:47 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court10 was docketed under this action in error. The document will be re-docketed to the correct case number: 2:24-cv-00382 RGK (ASx). Please disregard document no. 10. (jp) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Receipt
Mon 03/04 4:27 PM
[NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO.11 ] - Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court. (jp). Modified on 3/4/2024 (jp) |
|
Thursday, February 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 02/29 10:07 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 02/27 5:01 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 02/27 5:00 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 02/27 5:00 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 02/23 12:59 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 served on 02/23/2024. (Lazenby, Richard) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 02/23 12:56 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc., identifying No corporate parent and interested parties: The Vanguard Group, Inc. and various underwriters in the aviation insurance market. (Lazenby, Richard) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 02/23 12:50 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. identifying No parent corporation as Corporate Parent. (Lazenby, Richard) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 02/23 12:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Lazenby, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 02/23 12:45 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2023 01366405-CU-CR-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-36966868 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attorney Richard A. Lazenby added to party Delta Air Lines, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lazenby, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Answer, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Delta Req for Stmt of Damages, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Stmt of Damages | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 02/27 4:48 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Erika Geraghty in Orange County Superior Court on 12/5/2024, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) |
||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 02/27 4:55 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Delta Air Lines, Inc. in Orange County Superior Court on 1/11/2024, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Wed 03/20 10:15 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. in Orange County Superior Court on 1/11/2024, attached as Exhibit B.(jtil) |