Hendershot et al v. 3M Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00958 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:24-cv-00138 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 5:49 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corp
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
L.N. Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
W L Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Whitmer Public Safety Group
|
|
Plaintiff
Gerald Alameda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lindell Algiere
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Stuart Alsbrooks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos G Aramayo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Baker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Barker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Bruce Barron
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danny Bashaw
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Bebout
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Beck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Bennett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Bennett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Bickford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dick Bombarda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John L Boswell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dale Budnick, SR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathaniel Burden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Richard Caravella
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Carson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Carstens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Chacon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Owen Champley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Collard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricky Collins, SR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Constantino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Cornelius, SR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Davenport
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Dean
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frederick Dee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Dilauro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Donnan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amos Russell Doom
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dan Dunaway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger Eck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Fink
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Fischer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Franks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wade Gariner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Goldbach
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Goodwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norman Griser
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frederick Guertin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Hansen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Denise Hayes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Veronica Maria Heck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert E Hendershot
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos B Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Hicks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd S Higgins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Highfill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Hill
250978 Allendale Correctional Institution PO Box 1151
Fairfax, SC 29827 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Huertas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Jenkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnny Wayne Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Karl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bryan Stuart Lenk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John W Lilley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Lloyd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rogelio Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Anthony Makowski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Ross Mayhall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mitchell McClarnon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas McConnell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerard J McFarland, JR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Warren Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Dean Monce
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Montoya
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teneaka Moreland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph T Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Mullenbrock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr. Donald Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Niedzwiecki
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ralph Norman, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvin Pea
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Peebles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danny Pesnell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven James Pethoud
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Phillips
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Scott Prather
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marlon Rash
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeff Redding
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvin M Reed
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Rhoades
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eugene Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arnold Rosal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jorge Sahagun
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Schiavone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danny L Seifert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Robert Semrad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Sevek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Slaydon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony J Smith
#0622 Greenville County Detention Center 20 McGee Street
Greenville, SC 29601 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leroy Sobieck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Stallard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel R Stone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Stratton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Streeter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Sullivan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debbie Tank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Thomas
329390 Broad River Correctional 4460 Broad River Road
Columbia, SC 29210 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Toohey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Billy Wayne Turner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Volgren
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory James Wallis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathan Walpole
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shane Walters
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel West
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lee S Whiting
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martin Whitley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George H Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew M Wirth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Henry William Witteman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Zwick
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Charles Joseph Koscinski
Terminated: 03/18/2024
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 11:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/02 9:24 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Raymond Mims, Ronald Spontak Et al., Frank Rivas, Robert J Zdenek Et al., Bryan Stuart Lenk, Dewayne Eddie Gamez, Karen Louise Montgomery, Joseph Michauskas Et al. William George Middleton as to Spontak, et al; John Leslie Moise as to Spontak, et al; Mark L. Morgan as to Spontak, et al; David Lee Morrison as to Spontak, et al; Daniel John Muder as to Spontak, et al; Robert Dean Murphy as to Spontak, et al; Alan Nelson as to Spontak, et al; Benedict Austin O'Bryan as to Spontak, et al; Ronald Scott Strickland as to Zdenek, et al; Eugene Dyson Taylor as to Zdenek, et al; Alphonso David Thomas as to Zdenek, et al; Jerry Joseph Trstensky, Jr. as to Zdenek, et al; Robert Dwayne Upshaw as to Zdenek, et al; Thurston Randolph Vann as to Zdenek, et al; Robert James Wall as to Zdenek, et al; Ralph Nathaniel Washington as to Zdenek, et al; Donald Weeks as to Zdenek, et al; Randy Welsh as to Zdenek, et al; Donald Carey Whatley as to Zdenek, et al; Roy Fletcher Whitfield as to Zdenek, et al; Jimmie Louis Williams as to Zdenek, et al; Michael Eugene Williams as to Zdenek, et al; Gerald Lamont Wilson as to Zdenek, et al; Alfred Edwin Wollenburg as to Zdenek, et al; James Cecil Young, Jr. as to Zdenek, et al; Ross Zahara as to Zdenek, et al; Richard Allen as to Michauskas, et al; Doye Amerson as to Michauskas, et al; Richard S. Ashford as to Michauskas, et al; Vernard Beddingfield as to Michauskas, et al; John Berg as to Michauskas, et al; William H. Blanchard, Jr. as to Michauskas, et al; Larry Marvin Boelte as to Michauskas, et al; Terry James Bonds as to Michauskas, et al; Bobby Bowden as to Michauskas, et al; Leo John Brand as to Michauskas, et al; Michael Brown as to Michauskas, et al; Jeffrey Brum as to Michauskas, et al; Thomas Burleson as to Michauskas, et al; Henry Junior Cade as to Michauskas, et al; Paul Carney as to Michauskas, et al; Douglas Gordon Corbett as to Michauskas, et al; Edwin Charles Crosby as to Michauskas, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Declaration
Wed 04/03 4:32 PM
DECLARATION by Scott Slaydonre(9 in 2:24-cv-00958-RMG) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL . Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-00958-RMG(Lanciotti, Patrick) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 04/03 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Scott Slaydon Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-00958-RMG(Lanciotti, Patrick) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 03/18 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Charles Joseph Koscinski WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-00958-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 02/26 5:20 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 2/26/2024), 2:24-cv-00138, Hendershot et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-00958-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 02/26 5:16 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:24-cv-00138. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 02/26 12:43 PM
ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL No. 2873; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk electronically sent to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 02/26/2024. (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/26/2024.] |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2024 | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4522035 (ALND receipt# 9913). related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2023-904646, filed by 3M Company.(CLD). (Radney, W) Modified on 2/7/2024 (AKD). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/26/2024.] | ||
Tuesday, February 06, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company (CLD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/26/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2023-904646, filed by 3M Company.(CLD) (CLD, ). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/26/2024.] | |
Att: 1 (2/7/2024) Exhibit A |