Sabrosa Cafe & Gallery, Inc
Wisconsin Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Katherine M Perhach |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-20858 |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2024 |
Dismissed: | Jun 17, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 12, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Sabrosa Cafe & Gallery, Inc
3216 S Howell Ave
Milwaukee, WI 53207-2742 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U. S. Trustee
517 East Wisconsin Ave. Room 430
Milwaukee, WI 53202 |
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 12:03 PM CDT |
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
93 | 93
court
Close/Terminate Bankruptcy Case
Thu 09/12 1:25 PM
Bankruptcy Case Terminated. (cs, Deputy Clerk) |