Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-02826

South Carolina Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Elisabetta Gm Gasparini
Case #: 2:24-ap-80015
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2024
Terminated:Jun 04, 2024

Debtor
Joshua Allen Ingram
1016 Mt. Whitney Drive
Summerville, SC 29483
Represented By
Michael Conrady
Campbell Law Firm, PA
contact info
Debtor
Ashley Ingram
1016 Mt. Whitney Drive
Summerville, SC 29483
Represented By
Michael Conrady
Campbell Law Firm, PA
contact info
Last checked: never
Defendant
Joshua Allen Ingram
1016 Mt. Whitney Drive
Summerville, SC 29483
Represented By
Joshua Allen Ingram
contact info
Defendant
Ashley Allen Ingram
1016 Mt. Whitney Drive
Summerville, SC 29483
Represented By
Ashley Allen Ingram
contact info
Defendant
Nautilus Insurance Company
Represented By
Nautilus Insurance Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Terence Bennett
Represented By
Jennifer S. Ivey
Walker Gressette & Linton, LLC
contact info
Trustee
Michelle L. Vieira
Michelle L. Vieira PO Box 70399
Myrtle Beach, SC 29572
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Strom Thurmond Federal Bldg 1835 Assembly Street Suite 953
Columbia, SC 29201
Represented By
Linda Barr
Office Of United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Friday, June 07, 2024
24 24 utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 06/07 2:53 PM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 24-80015 eg Voluntary Dismissal Complaint. (Dillard, S)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
23 23 court Close Adversary Case Tue 06/04 12:46 PM
Adversary Case Closed. (McAbee, B)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 05/31 12:34 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Terence Bennett. (Ivey, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
21 21 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Sat 05/18 12:22 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 05/17/2024. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
20 20 order Consent Order Wed 05/15 8:42 AM
Consent Order Granting Defendants Joshua Allen Ingram And Ashley Ingram An Extension Of Time Until MAY 31, 2024 To Respond To The Amended Complaint. Filed by Michael Conrady for the Defendants. Document Served EG Related [+]. (McAbee, B)
Related: [-] 13 ,19 ,11
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
19 19 misc Proposed Order Tue 05/14 4:10 PM
Proposed Order RE: Consent Order Granting Defendants an Extension of Time Until May 31, 2024 to Respond to Complaint. Document Served EG Related [+]. Filed by Jennifer S. Ivey of Walker Gressette & Linton, LLC on behalf of Terence Bennett.. (Ivey, Jennifer) Modified on 5/14/2024 to clarify in docket text the date the extension was requested through. (McAbee, B)
Related: [-] ,11 13
Thursday, May 02, 2024
17 17 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Fri 05/03 12:24 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 05/02/2024. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
16 16 order Consent Order Tue 04/30 1:35 PM
Consent Order Granting Defendant Nautilus Insurance Company An Extension Of Time Until MAY 31, 2024. To provide additional time for Nautilus to file and serve a response to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint for Determination of Dischargeability, Objecting to Discharge, and for Declaratory and Other Relief. Filed by Defendant: Nautilus Insurance Company. Document Served EG Related [+]. (McAbee, B)
Related: [-] 15 ,2
Monday, April 29, 2024
15 15 misc Proposed Order Mon 04/29 3:59 PM
Proposed Order RE: Consent Order Granting Defendant Nautilus Insurance Company An Extension Of Time Until May 31, 2024 Filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Kennedy, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
14 14 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Fri 03/29 12:22 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 03/28/2024. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
13 13 order Consent Order Tue 03/26 1:27 PM
Consent Order Granting Defendants an Extension of Time Until May 1, 2024 to Respond to Complaint. Document Served EG Related [+]. (Woods, D)
Related: [-] ,11
utility Reset Answer Deadline Tue 03/26 1:30 PM
Ashley Allen Ingram Answer Deadline Reset for 5/1/2024; Joshua Allen Ingram Answer Deadline Reset for 5/1/2024. (Woods, D)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
12 12 order Consent Order Mon 03/25 1:51 PM
Consent Order For Defendant Nautilus Insurance Company to Answer, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Document Served EG Related [+]. (Woods, D)
Related: [-] 10
11 11 misc Proposed Order Mon 03/25 11:36 AM
Proposed Order RE: Summons Issued on Ashley Allen Ingram Answer Due: 04/01/2024; Joshua Allen Ingram Answer Due: 04/01/2024; and Nautilus Insurance Company Answer Due: 04/01/2024. (except that the United States and its offices and agencies shall have 5 additional days). Extension of Time to Respond or File Answer to Complaint Filed by Ashley Allen Ingram, Joshua Allen Ingram Related [+]. (Conrady, Michael)
Related: [-] 3
utility Reset Answer Deadline Mon 03/25 1:55 PM
Nautilus Insurance Company Answer Deadline Reset for 4/30/2024. (Woods, D)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
10 10 misc Proposed Order Fri 03/22 4:29 PM
Proposed Order RE: [corrected] Consent Extension Of Time To Answer, Plead, Or Otherwise Respond To The Complaint Filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Kennedy, Robert)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Proposed Order Fri 03/22 10:13 AM
Proposed Order RE: Consent For Extension Of Time To Answer, Plead, Or Otherwise Respond To The Complaint Filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Kennedy, Robert)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 17, 2024
8 8 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Mon 03/18 12:18 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 03/17/2024. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, March 15, 2024
7 7 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Sat 03/16 12:19 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 03/15/2024. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4
6 6 order TO - Generic Order Fri 03/15 10:13 AM
The Court issued an Order and Rule to Show Cause ("Order") directing the Plaintiff, Terence Bennett, to file proof that he served the summons and amended complaint on the defendants by March 7, 2024, and to appear at a hearing on April 17, 2024 to show cause why this case should not be dismissed based upon his failure to timely serve the summons and amended complaint. The Order further provided that the Rule to Show Cause may be dissolved by the Court if proof of timely service was filed prior to the scheduled hearing. On March 14, 2024, Plaintiff filed a certificate of service (ECF No. 5) indicating that the summons and amended complaint were timely served. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the Rule to Show Cause issued on March 13, 2024 is dissolved and the hearing is removed from the Court's calendar. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by: Judge Elisabetta G.M. Gasparini, US Bankruptcy Court - District of South Carolina Related [+]. (Kistler, S)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, March 14, 2024
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/14 10:13 AM
Certificate of Service RE: Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Terence Bennett, Summons Issued. Filed by Jennifer S. Ivey of Walker Gressette & Linton, LLC on behalf of Terence Bennett. Related [+]. (Ivey, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 3 ,2
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
4 4 order Show Cause Order w/pdf image Wed 03/13 4:42 PM
Order to Appear and Show Cause RE: The Courts records reflect that Plaintiff has not filed proof that he has served the summons and complaint as required by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7004. Party to Appear: Terence Bennett (Plaintiff) and Jennifer S. Ivey (Counsel). Document Served. Show Cause hearing to be held on 04/17/2024 at 10:30 AM in Charleston. The case judge is Elisabetta G.M. Gasparini. (McAbee, B)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Thu 02/29 12:28 PM
Summons Issued on Ashley Allen Ingram Answer Due: 04/01/2024; Joshua Allen Ingram Answer Due: 04/01/2024; and Nautilus Insurance Company Answer Due: 04/01/2024. (except that the United States and its offices and agencies shall have 5 additional days). (McAbee, B)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/29 10:01 AM
Amended Complaint Related [+]. (Ivey, Jennifer)
Related: [-] lated to: Complaint filed by Plaintiff Terence Bennett1
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/28 5:39 PM
Adversary case 24-80015 Complaint by Terence Bennett against Joshua Allen Ingram, Ashley Allen Ingram, Nautilus Insurance Company Core Proceeding. Fee: 350.00. (91 (Declaratory judgment), 72 (Injunctive relief - other)) (Ivey, Jennifer)
Related: [-]