Crosby et al v. Ingram et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-02826
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-02826
South Carolina Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Elisabetta Gm Gasparini |
Case #: | 2:24-ap-80016 |
Nature of Suit | 67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny 68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury 62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud |
Case Filed: | Feb 29, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Joshua Allen Ingram
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ashley Ingram
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicholas & Harmony Romo
1042 HARBORTOWNE RD
Charleston, SC 29412 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Gilbert
2816 Cavalcade Circle
Johns Island, SC 29455 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frances Lee
321 McKennas Place
Huger, SC 29450 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stuart Wren
1416 GEMSTONE BLVD
Hanahan, SC 29410 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Len Mallardi
32 Ann Street
Charleston, SC 29403 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Langley
5 PEARL ST
BLUFFTON, SC 29910 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Lew
770 GOODLET CIRCLE
Charleston, SC 29412 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Cuchelo
3816 MAIDSTONE DR
MOUNT PLEASANT, SC 29466 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelsie Davis
1416 TRIP LINE DR
MOUNT PLEASANT, SC 29466 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Losito
213 BASKETGRASS LANE
SUMMERVILLE, SC 29486 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dan Anessi
8032 New England Drive
North Charleston, SC 29420 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jackie & Frank Capogrosso
2937 RIVER VISTA WAY
Mount Pleasant, SC 29466 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nadine O'connor
162 Boots Brand Road
Summerville, SC 29485 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Barnes
622 Hatch Drive
Johns Island, SC 29455 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Miller
1161 Peacehaven St
Mt Pleasant, SC 29466 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gaylord Green
1322 Battalion Drive
Charleston, SC 29412 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Doug Lockard
9653 Wilhammer Ct
Ladson, SC 29456 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cori Bradt
161 Lakelyn Rd
Moncks Corner, SC 29461 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zoe Pauls
124 HAVERHILL ST
SUMMERVILLE, SC 29486 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Labelle
2207 Midden Drive
Mount Pleasant, SC 29466 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Larsen
1845 Bermuda Stone Road
Charleston, SC 29414 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristi O'Callahan
122 DARBY MEADOW LANE
RIDGEVILLE, SC 29472 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Krystle Paris
1927 Sweetfern Road
Hanahan, SC 29410 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wilson Baggett
1514 Sterling Oaks Drive
Moncks Corner, SC 29461 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laurie Skinner
4994 WYMANN BLVD
SUMMERVILLE, SC 29485 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristen Woody
2019 Brick Kiln Parkway
Mount Pleasant, SC 29466 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Henry
110 FIREBRICK WAY
SUMMERVILLE, SC 29483 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laurie Greco
33 YEMASSEE TRACE RD
BLUFFTON, SC 29909 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Sclafani
2817 CAVALCADE CIRCLE
JOHNS ISLAND, SC 29455 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julia Allen
1182 Leesville Street
North Charleston, SC 29405 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheri Johnson
125 LAKELYN RD
MONCKS CORNER, SC 29461 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marc Pittman
154 AYLESBURY RD
GOOSE CREEK, SC 29445 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kerri Chisolm
622 PAWLEY RD
MOUNT PLEASANT, SC 29464 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Allen
350 SANCTUARY PARK
SUMMERVILLE, SC 29486 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Petrucelli
4354 Hope Plantation Drive
Johns Island, SC 29455 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dean Johnson
4082 MAIDSTONE DR
MOUNT PLEASANT, SC 29466 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Schlegel
2618 HATCH DR.
JOHNS ISLAND, SC 29455 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Denise Sessler
2263 Scanawah Trail
Edisto Island, SC 29438 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Willing
77 Maple St
Charleston, SC 29403 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Helen Giotopoulos
2832 Cavalcade Circle
Johns Island, SC 29455 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellisa Poe
1914 Cypress Campground Road
Ridgeville, SC 29472 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Warner
105 Dirocco Lane
Summerville, SC 29485 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eileen Weller
108 Englewood Road
Goose Creek, SC 29445 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darcy Contois
254 Horseshoe Road
Moncks Corner, SC 29461 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danielle C. Findley
4821 Hortonrest Court
Summerville, SC 29485 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dan & Tammy Thelen
141 Donning Dr
Summerville, SC 29483 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian & Chelsea Rheault
412 Glenmore Dr
Moncks Corner, SC 29461 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Petrick
109 Sinclair Road
Summerville, SC 29483 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Jellison
312 Watergrass Street
Summerville, SC 29486 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Stallings
1848 Delacourt Av
Mt Pleasant, SC 29466 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandy Sutherland
193 Wickford Court
Summerville, SC 29485 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandy Fralix
180 Plantation Lane
Walterboro, SC 29488 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bob Shircliff
306 Ripple Park Drive
Summerville, SC 29486 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Athena Reidy
1030 Wellington Drive
Charleston, SC 29412 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Huthmacher
331 Beautyberry Road
Summerville, SC 29486 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andy Roberts
5406 Turning Tide
Charleston, SC 29420 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allison Gorlo
557 Dunswell Drive
Summerville, SC 29486 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aimee Crosby
157 Longleaf Drive
Walterboro, SC 29488 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Noelle Marchese
638 Hobcaw Bluff Drive
Mount Pleasant, SC 29464 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard & Tracy Turner
3093 SOUTH SHORE DRIVE
Charleston, SC 29407 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert & Tammy Hiott
4639 GLENN ST
NORTH CHARLESTON, SC 29405 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammi Reid
9713 CUTLEAF DR
LADSON, SC 29456 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steve Poulin
410 BRICK KILN DR.
SUMMERVILLE, SC 29483 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shannon French
3013 Riverwood Drive
Mount Pleasant, SC 29466 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sara McDonnell
1312 Garrison Street
Charleston, SC 29412 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Hirsch
3625 Colonel Vanderhorst Circle
Mt. Pleasant, SC 29466 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pedro & Vanessa Cruz
230 Narrowleaf Avenue
Summerville, SC 29485 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Baxter
1435 Coopers Hawk Drive
Hanahan, SC 29410 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrea Shrader
1030 Wellington Drive
Charleston, SC 29412 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miriam Sacco
1026 MOSSY OAK DR
SUMMERVILLE, SC 29485 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Yausm
5227 STONEWALL DR
SUMMERVILLE, SC 29485 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michell & Norman Violette
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Mercaldo
8176 Rosa Scott Road
Edisto Island, SC 29438 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kim Marshall
302 High Grove Road
Summerville, SC 29485 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathleen Jamieson
773 Hamlet Circle
Goose Creek, SC 29445 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joyceann Gray
122 County Road S-18-752
Summerville, SC 29483 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Zomer
1039 Dominion Drive
Hanahan, SC 29410 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Rath
2736 Oak Manor Drive
Mount Pleasant, SC 29466 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:10 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 08/08 11:15 AM
Adversary Case Closed. (Mays, E) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
![]() Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 07/25/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
![]() Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 07/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 07/23 11:47 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 24-80016 Default Judgement Complaint. (Mays, E) |
|
32 | 32
![]() Entry in Judgment Index relating to: Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment against Ashley Ingram and Joshua Allen Ingram . Document Served. (Mays, E) |
|
31 | 31
![]() Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment against Ashley Ingram and Joshua Allen Ingram . Document Served. (Mays, E) |
|
30 | 30
court
Hearing Held
Tue 07/23 11:09 AM
Hearing Held relating to: Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Lisa Barnes, et al. Order Setting Hearing and Deadlines. Motion granted. Court to enter Order. (Beaulieu, N) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
![]() THIS MATTER is before the Court on the Motion for Default Judgment filed by Paul Doolittle, on behalf of the Plaintiffs (ECF No. 24). To reduce costs and improve efficiency, this hearing will be conducted by videoconference from Columbia on July 23, 2024, at 10:30 AM. All other deadlines remain the same. Parties will be contacted by the courtroom deputy and provided with the information needed to participate. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by: Judge Elisabetta G.M. Gasparini, US Bankruptcy Court - District of South Carolina . (Beaulieu, N) |
|
28 | 28
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Joseph Allen, Julia Allen, Dan Anessi, Wilson Baggett, Lisa Barnes, Patricia Baxter, Cori Bradt, Jackie & Frank Capogrosso, Kerri Chisolm, Darcy Contois, Aimee Crosby, Pedro & Vanessa Cruz, Matthew Cuchelo, Kelsie Davis, Danielle C. Findley, Brandy Fralix, Shannon French, Christopher Gilbert, Helen Giotopoulos, Allison Gorlo, Joyceann Gray, Laurie Greco, Gaylord Green, Linda Henry, Robert & Tammy Hiott, Richard Hirsch, Anthony Huthmacher, Kathleen Jamieson, John Jellison, Dean Johnson, Sheri Johnson, Joseph Labelle, Matthew Langley, Joshua Larsen, Frances Lee, Matthew Lew, Doug Lockard, James Losito, Len Mallardi, Noelle Marchese, Kim Marshall, Sara McDonnell, Lisa Mercaldo, John Miller, Kristi O'Callahan, Nadine O'connor, Krystle Paris, Zoe Pauls, Bruce Petrick, James Petrucelli, Marc Pittman, Ellisa Poe, Steve Poulin, John Rath, Tammi Reid, Athena Reidy, Brian & Chelsea Rheault, Andy Roberts, Nicholas & Harmony Romo, Miriam Sacco, George Schlegel, Joseph Sclafani, Denise Sessler, Bob Shircliff, Andrea Shrader, Laurie Skinner, Brian Stallings, Brandy Sutherland, Dan & Tammy Thelen, Richard & Tracy Turner, Michell & Norman Violette, Elizabeth Warner, Eileen Weller, Brian Willing, Kristen Woody, Stuart Wren, Michelle Yausm, Joseph Zomer. (Little, Seth) |
|
Sunday, June 16, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 06/16/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, June 14, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 06/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
25 | 25
![]() Order and Notice of Hearing on Motion for Default Judgement. DATES TO FILE: Objections/Responses Due: 4:00 P.M. on 07/09/2024. Document Served . Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2024 at 10:30 AM at Charleston. The case judge is Elisabetta G.M. Gasparini. (Woods, D) |
|
Thursday, June 13, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Joseph Allen, Julia Allen, Dan Anessi, Wilson Baggett, Lisa Barnes, Patricia Baxter, Cori Bradt, Jackie & Frank Capogrosso, Kerri Chisolm, Darcy Contois, Aimee Crosby, Pedro & Vanessa Cruz, Matthew Cuchelo, Kelsie Davis, Danielle C. Findley, Brandy Fralix, Shannon French, Christopher Gilbert, Helen Giotopoulos, Allison Gorlo, Joyceann Gray, Laurie Greco, Gaylord Green, Linda Henry, Robert & Tammy Hiott, Richard Hirsch, Anthony Huthmacher, Kathleen Jamieson, John Jellison, Dean Johnson, Sheri Johnson, Joseph Labelle, Matthew Langley, Joshua Larsen, Frances Lee, Matthew Lew, Doug Lockard, James Losito, Len Mallardi, Noelle Marchese, Kim Marshall, Sara McDonnell, Lisa Mercaldo, John Miller, Kristi O'Callahan, Nadine O'connor, Krystle Paris, Zoe Pauls, Bruce Petrick, James Petrucelli, Marc Pittman, Ellisa Poe, Steve Poulin, John Rath, Tammi Reid, Athena Reidy, Brian & Chelsea Rheault, Andy Roberts, Nicholas & Harmony Romo, Miriam Sacco, George Schlegel, Joseph Sclafani, Denise Sessler, Bob Shircliff, Andrea Shrader, Laurie Skinner, Brian Stallings, Brandy Sutherland, Dan & Tammy Thelen, Richard & Tracy Turner, Michell & Norman Violette, Elizabeth Warner, Eileen Weller, Brian Willing, Kristen Woody, Stuart Wren, Michelle Yausm, Joseph Zomer . (Doolittle, Paul) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, June 12, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Clerk's Entry of Default as to Ashley Ingram , Joshua Allen Ingram . (Baker, P) |
|
22 | 22
![]() Certificate of Service RE: Affidavit of Default filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee, Plaintiff Lisa Barnes, Trustee Michelle L. Vieira, Plaintiff Cori Bradt, Plaintiff Patricia Baxter, Debtor Joshua Allen Ingram, Defendant Joshua Allen Ingram, Debtor Ashley Ingram, Defendant Ashley Ingram, Plaintiff Aimee Crosby, Plaintiff Darcy Contois, Plaintiff Allison Gorlo, Plaintiff Andy Roberts, Plaintiff Anthony Huthmacher, Plaintiff Bob Shircliff, Plaintiff Brandy Sutherland, Plaintiff Brian & Chelsea Rheault, Plaintiff Brian Stallings, Plaintiff Brian Willing, Plaintiff Dan & Tammy Thelen, Plaintiff Doug Lockard, Plaintiff Elizabeth Warner, Plaintiff Gaylord Green, Plaintiff Jackie & Frank Capogrosso, Plaintiff James Losito, Plaintiff John Miller, Plaintiff Kelsie Davis, Plaintiff Laurie Greco, Plaintiff Len Mallardi, Plaintiff Marc Pittman, Plaintiff Matthew Cuchelo, Plaintiff Matthew Langley, Plaintiff Matthew Lew, Plaintiff Michell & Norman Violette, Plaintiff Michelle Yausm, Plaintiff Miriam Sacco, Plaintiff Nicholas & Harmony Romo, Plaintiff Pedro & Vanessa Cruz, Plaintiff Richard & Tracy Turner, Plaintiff Robert & Tammy Hiott, Plaintiff Steve Poulin, Plaintiff Tammi Reid, Plaintiff Zoe Pauls, Plaintiff Andrea Shrader, Plaintiff Athena Reidy, Plaintiff Brandy Fralix, Plaintiff Bruce Petrick, Plaintiff Danielle C. Findley, Plaintiff Eileen Weller, Plaintiff Ellisa Poe, Plaintiff Helen Giotopoulos, Plaintiff John Jellison, Plaintiff John Rath, Plaintiff Joseph Zomer, Plaintiff Joyceann Gray, Plaintiff Kathleen Jamieson, Plaintiff Lisa Mercaldo, Plaintiff Kim Marshall, Plaintiff Noelle Marchese, Plaintiff Richard Hirsch, Plaintiff Sara McDonnell, Plaintiff Shannon French, Plaintiff Nadine O'connor, Plaintiff Stuart Wren, Plaintiff Frances Lee, Plaintiff Christopher Gilbert, Plaintiff Dan Anessi, Plaintiff Denise Sessler, Plaintiff George Schlegel, Plaintiff Dean Johnson, Plaintiff James Petrucelli, Plaintiff Joseph Allen, Plaintiff Kerri Chisolm, Plaintiff Sheri Johnson, Plaintiff Joseph Labelle, Plaintiff Joseph Sclafani, Plaintiff Linda Henry, Plaintiff Kristen Woody, Plaintiff Laurie Skinner, Plaintiff Wilson Baggett, Plaintiff Krystle Paris, Plaintiff Kristi O'Callahan, Plaintiff Joshua Larsen, Plaintiff Julia Allen. Filed by Joseph Allen, Julia Allen, Dan Anessi, Wilson Baggett, Lisa Barnes, Patricia Baxter, Cori Bradt, Jackie & Frank Capogrosso, Kerri Chisolm, Darcy Contois, Aimee Crosby, Pedro & Vanessa Cruz, Matthew Cuchelo, Kelsie Davis, Danielle C. Findley, Brandy Fralix, Shannon French, Christopher Gilbert, Helen Giotopoulos, Allison Gorlo, Joyceann Gray, Laurie Greco, Gaylord Green, Linda Henry, Robert & Tammy Hiott, Richard Hirsch, Anthony Huthmacher, Kathleen Jamieson, John Jellison, Dean Johnson, Sheri Johnson, Joseph Labelle, Matthew Langley, Joshua Larsen, Frances Lee, Matthew Lew, Doug Lockard, James Losito, Len Mallardi, Noelle Marchese, Kim Marshall, Sara McDonnell, Lisa Mercaldo, John Miller, Kristi O'Callahan, Nadine O'connor, Krystle Paris, Zoe Pauls, Bruce Petrick, James Petrucelli, Marc Pittman, Ellisa Poe, Steve Poulin, John Rath, Tammi Reid, Athena Reidy, Brian & Chelsea Rheault, Andy Roberts, Nicholas & Harmony Romo, Miriam Sacco, George Schlegel, Joseph Sclafani, Denise Sessler, Bob Shircliff, Andrea Shrader, Laurie Skinner, Brian Stallings, Brandy Sutherland, Dan & Tammy Thelen, Richard & Tracy Turner, Michell & Norman Violette, Elizabeth Warner, Eileen Weller, Brian Willing, Kristen Woody, Stuart Wren, Michelle Yausm, Joseph Zomer . (Doolittle, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Affidavit of Default Filed by Joseph Allen, Julia Allen, Dan Anessi, Wilson Baggett, Lisa Barnes, Patricia Baxter, Cori Bradt, Jackie & Frank Capogrosso, Kerri Chisolm, Darcy Contois, Aimee Crosby, Pedro & Vanessa Cruz, Matthew Cuchelo, Kelsie Davis, Danielle C. Findley, Brandy Fralix, Shannon French, Christopher Gilbert, Helen Giotopoulos, Allison Gorlo, Joyceann Gray, Laurie Greco, Gaylord Green, Linda Henry, Robert & Tammy Hiott, Richard Hirsch, Anthony Huthmacher, Ashley Ingram, Joshua Allen Ingram, Kathleen Jamieson, John Jellison, Dean Johnson, Sheri Johnson, Joseph Labelle, Matthew Langley, Joshua Larsen, Frances Lee, Matthew Lew, Doug Lockard, James Losito, Len Mallardi, Noelle Marchese, Kim Marshall, Sara McDonnell, Lisa Mercaldo, John Miller, Kristi O'Callahan, Nadine O'connor, Krystle Paris, Zoe Pauls, Bruce Petrick, James Petrucelli, Marc Pittman, Ellisa Poe, Steve Poulin, John Rath, Tammi Reid, Athena Reidy, Brian & Chelsea Rheault, Andy Roberts, Nicholas & Harmony Romo, Miriam Sacco, George Schlegel, Joseph Sclafani, Denise Sessler, Bob Shircliff, Andrea Shrader, Laurie Skinner, Brian Stallings, Brandy Sutherland, Dan & Tammy Thelen, Richard & Tracy Turner, US Trustee, Michelle L. Vieira, Michell & Norman Violette, Elizabeth Warner, Eileen Weller, Brian Willing, Kristen Woody, Stuart Wren, Michelle Yausm, Joseph Zomer. (Doolittle, Paul) |
|
20 | 20
![]() Notice of Insufficient Affidavit. Monitor deadline: 6/18/2024 (Baker, P). Related document(s)19 Affidavit of Default. Modified on 6/11/2024 to correct docket text (Baker, P) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Affidavit of Default Filed by Joseph Allen, Julia Allen, Dan Anessi, Wilson Baggett, Lisa Barnes, Patricia Baxter, Cori Bradt, Jackie & Frank Capogrosso, Kerri Chisolm, Darcy Contois, Aimee Crosby, Pedro & Vanessa Cruz, Matthew Cuchelo, Kelsie Davis, Danielle C. Findley, Brandy Fralix, Shannon French, Christopher Gilbert, Helen Giotopoulos, Allison Gorlo, Joyceann Gray, Laurie Greco, Gaylord Green, Linda Henry, Robert & Tammy Hiott, Richard Hirsch, Anthony Huthmacher, Ashley Ingram, Joshua Allen Ingram, Kathleen Jamieson, John Jellison, Dean Johnson, Sheri Johnson, Joseph Labelle, Matthew Langley, Joshua Larsen, Frances Lee, Matthew Lew, Doug Lockard, James Losito, Len Mallardi, Noelle Marchese, Kim Marshall, Sara McDonnell, Lisa Mercaldo, John Miller, Kristi O'Callahan, Nadine O'connor, Krystle Paris, Zoe Pauls, Bruce Petrick, James Petrucelli, Marc Pittman, Ellisa Poe, Steve Poulin, John Rath, Tammi Reid, Athena Reidy, Brian & Chelsea Rheault, Andy Roberts, Nicholas & Harmony Romo, Miriam Sacco, George Schlegel, Joseph Sclafani, Denise Sessler, Bob Shircliff, Andrea Shrader, Laurie Skinner, Brian Stallings, Brandy Sutherland, Dan & Tammy Thelen, Richard & Tracy Turner, US Trustee, Michelle L. Vieira, Michell & Norman Violette, Elizabeth Warner, Eileen Weller, Brian Willing, Kristen Woody, Stuart Wren, Michelle Yausm, Joseph Zomer. (Doolittle, Paul) |
|
Sunday, June 02, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 06/02/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 31, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Order. Document Served . (McAbee, B) Modified on 5/31/2024 to correct docket text. (Stalvey, N) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Returned mail processed for the week beginning 04/22/2024 through 04/28/2024. (Admin) |
|
Saturday, April 13, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 04/13/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Consent Order Granting Defendant An Extension Of Time Until May 24, 2024 To Respond To Complaint. Filed by Debtor(s). Document Served EG . (McAbee, B) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Proposed Order RE: Reissued Summons on Ashley Ingram Answer Due: 04.22.2024; Joshua Allen Ingram Answer Due: 04.22.2024 (except that the United States and its offices and agencies shall have 5 additional days). Consent Order for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint Filed by Michael Conrady of Campbell Law Firm, PA on behalf of Ashley Ingram, Joshua Allen Ingram. . (Conrady, Michael) |
|
Sunday, March 31, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 03/31/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
TO - Generic Order
Fri 03/29 9:30 AM
The Court issued an Order and Rule to Show Cause ("Order") directing the Plaintiffs, Aimee Crosby et al., to file proof that the summons and amended complaint were timely served on the Defendants, and to appear at a hearing on April 11, 2024 to show cause why this case should not be dismissed based upon Plaintiffs failure to timely serve the summons and amended complaint. The Order further provided that the Rule to Show Cause may be dissolved by the Court if proof of timely service was filed prior to the scheduled hearing. On March 21, 2024, the Clerks Office received a call from Plaintiffs counsels office requesting that the summons be reissued as it was not properly and timely served. While a formal request for a reissued summons was not submitted until March 26, 2024, the call from Plaintiffs counsels office acknowledged the failure to properly and timely serve the summons and requested the reissuance. The summons was reissued on March 21, 2024. On March 28, 2024, Plaintiffs filed an amended certificate of service (ECF No. 9) indicating that the reissued summons and amended complaint were timely served on March 22, 2024. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the Order and Rule to Show Cause issued on March 18, 2024 is dissolved and the hearing is removed from the Court's calendar. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by: Judge Elisabetta G.M. Gasparini, US Bankruptcy Court - District of South Carolina . (Fairweather, Diana) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Amended document(s) Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Lisa Barnes, Plaintiff Cori Bradt, Plaintiff Patricia Baxter, Plaintiff Aimee Crosby, Plaintiff Darcy Contois, Plaintiff Allison Gorlo, Plaintiff Andy Roberts, Plaintiff Anthony Huthmacher, Plaintiff Bob Shircliff, Plaintiff Brandy Sutherland, Plaintiff Brian & Chelsea Rheault, Plaintiff Brian Stallings, Plaintiff Brian Willing, Plaintiff Dan & Tammy Thelen, Plaintiff Doug Lockard, Plaintiff Elizabeth Warner, Plaintiff Gaylord Green, Plaintiff Jackie & Frank Capogrosso, Plaintiff James Losito, Plaintiff John Miller, Plaintiff Kelsie Davis, Plaintiff Laurie Greco, Plaintiff Len Mallardi, Plaintiff Marc Pittman, Plaintiff Matthew Cuchelo, Plaintiff Matthew Langley, Plaintiff Matthew Lew, Plaintiff Michell & Norman Violette, Plaintiff Michelle Yausm, Plaintiff Miriam Sacco, Plaintiff Nicholas & Harmony Romo, Plaintiff Pedro & Vanessa Cruz, Plaintiff Richard & Tracy Turner, Plaintiff Robert & Tammy Hiott, Plaintiff Steve Poulin, Plaintiff Tammi Reid, Plaintiff Zoe Pauls, Plaintiff Andrea Shrader, Plaintiff Athena Reidy, Plaintiff Brandy Fralix, Plaintiff Bruce Petrick, Plaintiff Danielle C. Findley, Plaintiff Eileen Weller, Plaintiff Ellisa Poe, Plaintiff Helen Giotopoulos, Plaintiff John Jellison, Plaintiff John Rath, Plaintiff Joseph Zomer, Plaintiff Joyceann Gray, Plaintiff Kathleen Jamieson, Plaintiff Lisa Mercaldo, Plaintiff Kim Marshall, Plaintiff Noelle Marchese, Plaintiff Richard Hirsch, Plaintiff Sara McDonnell, Plaintiff Shannon French, Plaintiff Nadine O'connor, Plaintiff Stuart Wren, Plaintiff Frances Lee, Plaintiff Christopher Gilbert, Plaintiff Dan Anessi, Plaintiff Denise Sessler, Plaintiff George Schlegel, Plaintiff Dean Johnson, Plaintiff James Petrucelli, Plaintiff Joseph Allen, Plaintiff Kerri Chisolm, Plaintiff Sheri Johnson, Plaintiff Joseph Labelle, Plaintiff Joseph Sclafani, Plaintiff Linda Henry, Plaintiff Kristen Woody, Plaintiff Laurie Skinner, Plaintiff Wilson Baggett, Plaintiff Krystle Paris, Plaintiff Kristi O'Callahan, Plaintiff Joshua Larsen, Plaintiff Julia Allen Filed by Paul Doolittle of Poulin, Willey, Anastopoulo, LLC on behalf of Joseph Allen, Julia Allen, Dan Anessi, Wilson Baggett, Lisa Barnes, Patricia Baxter, Cori Bradt, Jackie & Frank Capogrosso, Kerri Chisolm, Darcy Contois, Aimee Crosby, Pedro & Vanessa Cruz, Matthew Cuchelo, Kelsie Davis, Danielle C. Findley, Brandy Fralix, Shannon French, Christopher Gilbert, Helen Giotopoulos, Allison Gorlo, Joyceann Gray, Laurie Greco, Gaylord Green, Linda Henry, Robert & Tammy Hiott, Richard Hirsch, Anthony Huthmacher, Kathleen Jamieson, John Jellison, Dean Johnson, Sheri Johnson, Joseph Labelle, Matthew Langley, Joshua Larsen, Frances Lee, Matthew Lew, Doug Lockard, James Losito, Len Mallardi, Noelle Marchese, Kim Marshall, Sara McDonnell, Lisa Mercaldo, John Miller, Kristi O'Callahan, Nadine O'connor, Krystle Paris, Zoe Pauls, Bruce Petrick, James Petrucelli, Marc Pittman, Ellisa Poe, Steve Poulin, John Rath, Tammi Reid, Athena Reidy, Brian & Chelsea Rheault, Andy Roberts, Nicholas & Harmony Romo, Miriam Sacco, George Schlegel, Joseph Sclafani, Denise Sessler, Bob Shircliff, Andrea Shrader, Laurie Skinner, Brian Stallings, Brandy Sutherland, Dan & Tammy Thelen, Richard & Tracy Turner, Michell & Norman Violette, Elizabeth Warner, Eileen Weller, Brian Willing, Kristen Woody, Stuart Wren, Michelle Yausm, Joseph Zomer. . (Doolittle, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service RE: Complaint filed by Plaintiff Lisa Barnes, Plaintiff Cori Bradt, Plaintiff Patricia Baxter, Plaintiff Aimee Crosby, Plaintiff Darcy Contois, Plaintiff Allison Gorlo, Plaintiff Andy Roberts, Plaintiff Anthony Huthmacher, Plaintiff Bob Shircliff, Plaintiff Brandy Sutherland, Plaintiff Brian & Chelsea Rheault, Plaintiff Brian Stallings, Plaintiff Brian Willing, Plaintiff Dan & Tammy Thelen, Plaintiff Doug Lockard, Plaintiff Elizabeth Warner, Plaintiff Gaylord Green, Plaintiff Jackie & Frank Capogrosso, Plaintiff James Losito, Plaintiff John Miller, Plaintiff Kelsie Davis, Plaintiff Laurie Greco, Plaintiff Len Mallardi, Plaintiff Marc Pittman, Plaintiff Matthew Cuchelo, Plaintiff Matthew Langley, Plaintiff Matthew Lew, Plaintiff Michell & Norman Violette, Plaintiff Michelle Yausm, Plaintiff Miriam Sacco, Plaintiff Nicholas & Harmony Romo, Plaintiff Pedro & Vanessa Cruz, Plaintiff Richard & Tracy Turner, Plaintiff Robert & Tammy Hiott, Plaintiff Steve Poulin, Plaintiff Tammi Reid, Plaintiff Zoe Pauls, Plaintiff Andrea Shrader, Plaintiff Athena Reidy, Plaintiff Brandy Fralix, Plaintiff Bruce Petrick, Plaintiff Danielle C. Findley, Plaintiff Eileen Weller, Plaintiff Ellisa Poe, Plaintiff Helen Giotopoulos, Plaintiff John Jellison, Plaintiff John Rath, Plaintiff Joseph Zomer, Plaintiff Joyceann Gray, Plaintiff Kathleen Jamieson, Plaintiff Lisa Mercaldo, Plaintiff Kim Marshall, Plaintiff Noelle Marchese, Plaintiff Richard Hirsch, Plaintiff Sara McDonnell, Plaintiff Shannon French, Plaintiff Nadine O'connor, Plaintiff Stuart Wren, Plaintiff Frances Lee, Plaintiff Christopher Gilbert, Plaintiff Dan Anessi, Plaintiff Denise Sessler, Plaintiff George Schlegel, Plaintiff Dean Johnson, Plaintiff James Petrucelli, Plaintiff Joseph Allen, Plaintiff Kerri Chisolm, Plaintiff Sheri Johnson, Plaintiff Joseph Labelle, Plaintiff Joseph Sclafani, Plaintiff Linda Henry, Plaintiff Kristen Woody, Plaintiff Laurie Skinner, Plaintiff Wilson Baggett, Plaintiff Krystle Paris, Plaintiff Kristi O'Callahan, Plaintiff Joshua Larsen, Plaintiff Julia Allen, Summons Reissued. Filed by Joseph Allen, Julia Allen, Dan Anessi, Wilson Baggett, Lisa Barnes, Patricia Baxter, Cori Bradt, Jackie & Frank Capogrosso, Kerri Chisolm, Darcy Contois, Aimee Crosby, Pedro & Vanessa Cruz, Matthew Cuchelo, Kelsie Davis, Danielle C. Findley, Brandy Fralix, Shannon French, Christopher Gilbert, Helen Giotopoulos, Allison Gorlo, Joyceann Gray, Laurie Greco, Gaylord Green, Linda Henry, Robert & Tammy Hiott, Richard Hirsch, Anthony Huthmacher, Kathleen Jamieson, John Jellison, Dean Johnson, Sheri Johnson, Joseph Labelle, Matthew Langley, Joshua Larsen, Frances Lee, Matthew Lew, Doug Lockard, James Losito, Len Mallardi, Noelle Marchese, Kim Marshall, Sara McDonnell, Lisa Mercaldo, John Miller, Kristi O'Callahan, Nadine O'connor, Krystle Paris, Zoe Pauls, Bruce Petrick, James Petrucelli, Marc Pittman, Ellisa Poe, Steve Poulin, John Rath, Tammi Reid, Athena Reidy, Brian & Chelsea Rheault, Andy Roberts, Nicholas & Harmony Romo, Miriam Sacco, George Schlegel, Joseph Sclafani, Denise Sessler, Bob Shircliff, Andrea Shrader, Laurie Skinner, Brian Stallings, Brandy Sutherland, Dan & Tammy Thelen, Richard & Tracy Turner, Michell & Norman Violette, Elizabeth Warner, Eileen Weller, Brian Willing, Kristen Woody, Stuart Wren, Michelle Yausm, Joseph Zomer . (Doolittle, Paul) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Request for Reissued Summons Filed by Joseph Allen, Julia Allen, Dan Anessi, Wilson Baggett, Lisa Barnes, Patricia Baxter, Cori Bradt, Jackie & Frank Capogrosso, Kerri Chisolm, Darcy Contois, Aimee Crosby, Pedro & Vanessa Cruz, Matthew Cuchelo, Kelsie Davis, Danielle C. Findley, Brandy Fralix, Shannon French, Christopher Gilbert, Helen Giotopoulos, Allison Gorlo, Joyceann Gray, Laurie Greco, Gaylord Green, Linda Henry, Robert & Tammy Hiott, Richard Hirsch, Anthony Huthmacher, Kathleen Jamieson, John Jellison, Dean Johnson, Sheri Johnson, Joseph Labelle, Matthew Langley, Joshua Larsen, Frances Lee, Matthew Lew, Doug Lockard, James Losito, Len Mallardi, Noelle Marchese, Kim Marshall, Sara McDonnell, Lisa Mercaldo, John Miller, Kristi O'Callahan, Nadine O'connor, Krystle Paris, Zoe Pauls, Bruce Petrick, James Petrucelli, Marc Pittman, Ellisa Poe, Steve Poulin, John Rath, Tammi Reid, Athena Reidy, Brian & Chelsea Rheault, Andy Roberts, Nicholas & Harmony Romo, Miriam Sacco, George Schlegel, Joseph Sclafani, Denise Sessler, Bob Shircliff, Andrea Shrader, Laurie Skinner, Brian Stallings, Brandy Sutherland, Dan & Tammy Thelen, Richard & Tracy Turner, Michell & Norman Violette, Elizabeth Warner, Eileen Weller, Brian Willing, Kristen Woody, Stuart Wren, Michelle Yausm, Joseph Zomer (Doolittle, Paul) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Reissued Summons on Ashley Ingram Answer Due: 04.22.2024; Joshua Allen Ingram Answer Due: 04.22.2024 (except that the United States and its offices and agencies shall have 5 additional days). (McAbee, B) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 03/20/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order to Appear and Show Cause RE: The Plaintiffs filed a complaint against the Defendants / Debtors seeking an order establishing the indebtedness due and owing by Debtors to Plaintiffs and excepting such indebtedness, including interest, costs, and attorneys fees, from Debtors discharge. The Courts records reflect that Plaintiffs have not filed proof that they have served the summons and complaint as required by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7004. Party to Appear: Aimee Crosby, et al. (Plaintiffs), and Paul Doolittle. Document Served. Show Cause hearing to be held on 04/11/2024 at 10:30 AM in Charleston. The case judge is Elisabetta G.M. Gasparini. (McAbee, B) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on Ashley Ingram Answer Due: 04/03/2024; and Joshua Allen Ingram Answer Due: 04/03/2024 (except that the United States and its offices and agencies shall have 5 additional days). (McAbee, B) |
|
utility
Add Trustee
Mon 03/04 12:13 PM
Michelle L. Vieira added to case. (McAbee, B) |
||
Thursday, February 29, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 24-80016 Complaint by Aimee Crosby, Allison Gorlo, Andy Roberts, Anthony Huthmacher, Athena Reidy, Bob Shircliff, Brandy Fralix, Brandy Sutherland, Brian Stallings, Brian Willing, Bruce Petrick, Brian & Chelsea Rheault, Dan & Tammy Thelen, Danielle C. Findley, Darcy Contois, Eileen Weller, Elizabeth Warner, Ellisa Poe, Helen Giotopoulos, John Jellison, John Rath, Joseph Zomer, Joyceann Gray, Kathleen Jamieson, Kim Marshall, Lisa Mercaldo, Michell & Norman Violette, Michelle Yausm, Miriam Sacco, Noelle Marchese, Patricia Baxter, Pedro & Vanessa Cruz, Richard Hirsch, Sara McDonnell, Shannon French, Steve Poulin, Tammi Reid, Robert & Tammy Hiott, Richard & Tracy Turner, Zoe Pauls, Andrea Shrader, Cori Bradt, Doug Lockard, Gaylord Green, John Miller, Lisa Barnes, Nadine O'connor, Jackie & Frank Capogrosso, Nicholas & Harmony Romo, James Losito, Kelsie Davis, Matthew Cuchelo, Matthew Lew, Matthew Langley, Len Mallardi, Stuart Wren, Frances Lee, Christopher Gilbert, Dan Anessi, Denise Sessler, George Schlegel, Dean Johnson, James Petrucelli, Joseph Allen, Kerri Chisolm, Marc Pittman, Sheri Johnson, Joseph Labelle, Joseph Sclafani, Laurie Greco, Linda Henry, Kristen Woody, Laurie Skinner, Wilson Baggett, Krystle Paris, Kristi O'Callahan, Joshua Larsen, Julia Allen against Ashley Ingram, Joshua Allen Ingram Core Proceeding. Fee: 350.00. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud), 67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (Doolittle, Paul) |