New York Southern District Court
Judge:Denise L Cote
Case #: 1:24-cv-01646
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:33 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Papaya Gaming, Inc.
Represented By
Margaret E. Krawiec
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
David B. Leland
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Jordan Adam Feirman
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Papaya Gaming, Ltd
Represented By
Michael A. McIntosh
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Margaret E. Krawiec
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
David B. Leland
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Jordan Adam Feirman
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Papaya Gaming, Ltd.
Represented By
Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
DNR Game Studio
Counter Defendant
GameNexa Studios Private Limited
Counter Defendant
Golden Wood Company, Ltd.
Counter Defendant
Luckyo Limited
Counter Defendant
Skillz Platform Inc.
Counter Defendant
Tether Studios LLC
Represented By
Ethan Michael Thomas
Fenwick & West LLP
contact info
Eric James Ball
Fenwick & West LLP
contact info
Kimberly Culp
Fenwick & West LLP
contact info
Defendant
Papaya Gaming, Inc.
Represented By
Michael A. McIntosh
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Margaret E. Krawiec
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
David B. Leland
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Jordan Adam Feirman
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Defendant
Papaya Gaming, Ltd
Represented By
Margaret E. Krawiec
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
David B. Leland
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Jordan Adam Feirman
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Skillz Platform Inc.
Represented By
Craig Carpenito
King & Spalding
contact info
Michael Anthony Lombardo
King & Spalding
contact info
Amy Katherine Nemetz
contact info
Lazar Pol Raynal
King & Spalding
contact info
Jessica C. Benvenisty
King & Spalding LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
369 369 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Fri 04/25 2:50 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part354 Letter Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part358 Letter Motion to Seal: ORDERED that there will be a presumption that letters filed with the Court will not be redacted, and as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/25/2025) (jwh)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
368 368 1 pgs order Memo Endorsement Fri 04/18 11:10 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:367 Letter,, filed by Papaya Gaming, Ltd., Skillz Platform Inc., Papaya Gaming, Inc., Papaya Gaming, Ltd. ENDORSEMENT: The request to redact is denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/18/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]