New York Southern District Court
Judge:Edgardo Ramos
Case #: 1:24-cv-01643
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1446nr Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2024
Case in other court:New Jersey, 2:23-cv-22613
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Chanel Inc
Represented By
ANTHONY M. RAINONE
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
Aladekemi Omoregie
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
ARNOLD GEWAN SOOKLALL
contact info
Anthony Michael Rainone
Brach Eichler, L.L.C.
contact info
Defendant
LISA GASPERINI
Defendant
John Doe's One through Ten
Defendant
CARL POULTER
Plaintiff
COURTNEY PORETSKIN
Represented By
MARK A. MULICK
Mark Mulick, Esq., P.A.
contact info
Julie Salwen
contact info
David Harrison
Harrisson, Harrison & Associates, Ltd
contact info


Docket last updated: 72 minutes ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/14 10:37 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 25 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal,, was reviewed and referred to Judge Edgardo Ramos for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal in a Stayed case. (nd)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
25 25 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/11 10:53 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Chanel Inc, LISA GASPERINI, CARL POULTER and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by COURTNEY PORETSKIN. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Harrison, David)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/11 8:57 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney David Harrison. RE-FILE Document No. 24 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
24 24 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 04/10 3:44 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by COURTNEY PORETSKIN. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Harrison, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
23 23 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/22 12:49 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julie Salwen on behalf of COURTNEY PORETSKIN..(Salwen, Julie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
22 22 2 pgs order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Case Stayed Wed 04/03 4:14 PM
STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER STAYING THE PROCEEDING IT IS on this 3rd day of April, 2024 ORDERED that: 1. This matter is hereby stayed pending the outcome of the arbitration proceedings. 2. A copy of this Order shall be provided to all parties within three (3) days of the entry of this Order. 3. The parties are directed to submit a status update to the Court as to the disposition of the arbitration proceedings within 48 hours thereof. Case stayed. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/3/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
21 21 2 pgs misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Wed 04/03 2:23 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Chanel Inc..(Rainone, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/28 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aladekemi Omoregie on behalf of Chanel Inc..(Omoregie, Aladekemi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/12 6:39 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Harrison on behalf of COURTNEY PORETSKIN..(Harrison, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/06 2:30 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Michael Rainone on behalf of Chanel Inc..(Rainone, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
17 17 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Mon 03/04 4:33 PM
CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New Jersey; Case Number: 2:23-cv-22613. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice - Transfer Case Mon 03/04 4:34 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vba)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 03/04 4:35 PM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vba)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 03/04 4:36 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vba)
Related: [-]
misc Note to Out of State Attorneys Mon 03/04 4:37 PM
NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
16 16 ORDER adopting15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; denying8 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; denying without prejudice11 Defendant Chanel, Inc.'s Cross Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration; granting Defendant Chanel, Inc.'s request to transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 2/21/2024. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to16 Order Adopting R&R (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
15 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re8 MOTION to Remand filed by COURTNEY PORETSKIN Objections, if any, to R&R due by 2/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/29/2024. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
14 14 TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Scheduling Conference on 1/29/2024 is adjourned to 2/27/2024 at 2:00 p.m. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. The parties shall file a joint discovery plan by 2/23/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/24/2024. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
13 13 TEXT ORDER: The parties shall electronically file the joint discovery plan by 1/25/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/23/2024. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
12 12 BRIEF in Opposition filed by COURTNEY PORETSKIN re8 MOTION to Remand ,11 Cross MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively to Transfer to the Southern District of New York (MULICK, MARK) Modified on 1/9/2024 (dam). [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibits A-D
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
11 11 Cross MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively to Transfer to the Southern District of New York by CHANEL, INC. (RAINONE, ANTHONY) Modified on 1/2/2024 (dam). [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Chanel, Inc.'s Cross-Motion to Dismiss Complaint,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Declaration of Arnold G. Sooklall, Esq.,
Att: 4 2 pgs Declaration of Tyler Beauchea,
Att: 5 33 pgs Declaration of Michelle Rhee,
Att: 6 Declaration of James Galli
Set Deadlines as to11 Cross MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively to Transfer to the Southern District of New York. Cross Motion set for 1/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
Reset Deadlines as to8 MOTION to Remand. Motion reset for 1/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
10 10 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re8 MOTION to Remand . (SOOKLALL, ARNOLD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
9 9 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2024 at 12:30 p.m. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. The parties shall file a joint discovery plan by 1/25/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/7/2023. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
8 MOTION to Remand REFERRED to Michael A. Hammer. (cds) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
Set Deadlines as to8 MOTION to Remand. Motion set for 1/2/2024 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
8 8 MOTION to Remand by COURTNEY PORETSKIN. (MULICK, MARK) Modified on 12/5/2023 (dam). [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion,
Att: 2 Letter Brief,
Att: 3 Certification Mark Mulick,
Att: 4 Exhibits A-E
Friday, December 01, 2023
7 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK A. MULICK on behalf of COURTNEY PORETSKIN (MULICK, MARK) Modified on 12/4/2023 (dam). [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
6 6 Diversity Disclosure Statement by COURTNEY PORETSKIN. (MULICK, MARK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
5 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHANEL, INC.. (SOOKLALL, ARNOLD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Diversity Disclosure Statement by CHANEL, INC.. (SOOKLALL, ARNOLD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHANEL, INC.. (SOOKLALL, ARNOLD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by ARNOLD GEWAN SOOKLALL on behalf of CHANEL, INC. (SOOKLALL, ARNOLD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The2 Notice of Appearance submitted by Arnold Sooklall on 11/27/2023 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov and the Manage My Account section of PACER for information and instructions on maintaining your account. Please be advised that the primary e-mail address for Counsel has been modified for this case to reflect the information found in the2 Notice of Appearance. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 26, 2023
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:www.njd.uscourts.gov] for a form and filing instructions. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The State Court Complaint at ECF No.1 -1 - Exhibit 1 submitted on 11/22/2023 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case as to Mark Mulick, Esq., Counsel for Plaintiff. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov and the Manage My Account section of PACER for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHANEL, INC. from Superior Court of Middlesex County, case number MID-L-005639-23. (Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14892238), filed by CHANEL, INC. (RAINONE, ANTHONY) Modified on 11/26/2023 (dam). [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet
Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/4/2024.]
Related: [-]