HALES v. PRESTON et al
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Allen C Winsor |
Referred: | Zachary C Bolitho |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00045 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander |
Case Filed: | Mar 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
JOHN M COOK
PO BOX 27
OTTER CREEK, FL 32683 |
|
Defendant
LYNETTE MICHELLE LACY ALEXIS PRESTON
PO BOX 27
OTTER CREEK, FL 32683 |
|
Plaintiff
JEREMY B HALES
2436 West Streetsboro Rd.
Peninsula, OH 44264 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/22/2024 10:05 AM EDT |
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
13 | 13 3 pgs ORDER. Defendants' Motions for Appointment of Counsel (Docs. 11 , 12 ) are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 04/04/2024. (alb) | |
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
12 | 12 6 pgs MOTION Requesting Appointment of Counsel by JOHN M COOK. (kdm) | |
11 | 11 6 pgs MOTION Requesting Appointment of Counsel by LYNETTE MICHELLE LACY ALEXIS PRESTON. (kdm) | |
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re:11 ,12 MOTION Requesting Appointment of Counsel. Referred to ZACHARY C BOLITHO. (kdm) | ||
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re:10 Defendant's Lynette Preston's and John Cook's CORRECTION of Citation re5 ,6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (kdm) | ||
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
10 | 10 4 pgs Defendant's Lynette Preston's and John Cook's CORRECTION of Citation re5 ,6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by JOHN M COOK, LYNETTE MICHELLE LACY ALEXIS PRESTON. (kdm) | |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re:8 ,9 Memorandum in Opposition to5 ,6 MOTION to Dismiss. (kdm) | ||
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9 12 pgs MEMORANDUM in Opposition re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JEREMY B HALES. (SHOCHET, RANDALL) | |
Att: 1 Affidavit of Jeremy Hales, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Affidavit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Affidavit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Affidavit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Affidavit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Affidavit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Affidavit | ||
8 | 8 12 pgs MEMORANDUM in Opposition re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JEREMY B HALES. (SHOCHET, RANDALL) | |
Att: 1 7 pgs Affidavit of Jeremy Hales, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Exhibit 1 to Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Exhibit 2 to Affidavit, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit Exhibit 3 to Affidavit, | ||
Att: 5 Affidavit Exhibit 4 to Affidavit, | ||
Att: 6 Affidavit Exhibit 5 to Affidavit, | ||
Att: 7 Affidavit Exhibit 6 to Affidavit, | ||
Att: 8 Affidavit Exhibit 7 to Affidavit | ||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 3 pgs Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by JEREMY B HALES. (SHOCHET, RANDALL) | |
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re:5 ,6 MOTIONs to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to FRCP 12((b)(1) and Supporting Memo. Referred to ZACHARY C BOLITHO. (kdm) (Entered: 03/20/2024) | ||
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 6 pgs Defendant Lynette Preston's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and Supporting Memo by LYNETTE MICHELLE LACY ALEXIS PRESTON. (kdm) | |
5 | 5 6 pgs Defendant's John Cook's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to FRCP 12((b)(1) and Supporting Memo by JOHN M COOK. (kdm) (Entered: 03/20/2024) | |
Tuesday, March 05, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 4 pgs Summons Issued as to JOHN M COOK, LYNETTE MICHELLE LACY ALEXIS PRESTON. (kdm) | |
3 | 3 4 pgs NOTICE SUMMONS (2) TO BE ISSUED by JEREMY B HALES re1 Complaint (SHOCHET, RANDALL) | |
2 | 2 1 pgs CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SHOCHET, RANDALL) | |
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 16 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-8662422.), filed by JEREMY B HALES. (SHOCHET, RANDALL) |