Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joseph F Leeson, Jr
Case #: 5:24-cv-00990
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2024
Terminated:Sep 24, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 03, 2024 4:26 AM EDT
Defendant
KELE INC.
3300 Brother Boulevard
Memphis, TN 38133
Represented By
Daniel M. Lieberman
Devine Law Offices LLC
contact info
JOSEPH D. SHELBY
Cipriani & Werner PC
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL MOZEKO
3041 Elm Drive
Allentown, PA 18103
Represented By
ERIKA A. FARKAS
Broughal & Devito LLP
contact info
JOHN S. HARRISON
Broughal & Devito, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Tue 09/24 2:03 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. ON SEPTEMBER 24, 2024. 9/24/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dja)
Related: [-]
17 17 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 09/24 11:26 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR., in Courtroom 3C-ALLENTOWN. An On The Record Settlement Conference was held on 9/23/24. Court Reporter: ESR. (dt)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 09/24 8:41 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. An In-Person Settlement Conference was held on September 23, 2024, Not on the Record. (DT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 08/01 8:45 AM
ORDER THAT THE IN-PERSON SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IN THIS CASE SCHEDULED FOR MONDAY, OCTOBER 7, 2024, AT 4:00 P.M. HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO MONDAY, SEPTEMBER 23, 2024, AT 4:00 P.M., BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR., UNITED STATES DISTRICT JUDGE, AT THE EDWARD N. CAHN COURTHOUSE AND FEDERAL BUILDING, COURTROOM C, THIRD FLOOR, 504 WEST HAMILTON STREET, ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA 18101. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/31/24. 8/1/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (er)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
14 14 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 07/10 5:48 PM
ORDER THAT AN IN PERSON SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/7/2024 04:00 PM IN Cahn 3C BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON JR.; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/10/24. 7/10/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
13 13 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 07/10 5:39 PM
ORDER THAT FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/6/2025 04:00 PM IN Cahn 3C BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON JR.; DISCOVERY DUE BY 7/16/2024; MOTIONS DUE BY 10/7/2024; TRIAL DATE SET FOR 1/13/2025 09:00 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON JR.; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/10/24. 7/10/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
12 12 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Wed 07/10 9:58 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. Pretrial Conference held on 7/9/24. (mas)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/31 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ERIKA A. FARKAS on behalf of MICHAEL MOZEKO (FARKAS, ERIKA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 05/29 4:33 PM
NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, JULY 9, 2024, AT 3:00 P.M. BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. VIA TELEPHONE. SEE NOTICE FOR CALL-IN INFORMATION.(dja)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
9 9 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Fri 05/24 11:09 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including The Stephens Group, LLC with Certificate of Service by KELE INC..(SHELBY, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/22 1:37 PM
ORDER OF 5/22/24 THAT THE DEFENDANT IS HEREBY ORDERED TO FILE IT'S DISCLOSURE STATEMENT WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR., ON 5/22/24. 5/22/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/20 8:58 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by KELE INC..(SHELBY, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/10 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Lieberman on behalf of KELE INC. with Certificate of Service, Jury Demand(Lieberman, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/10 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH D. SHELBY on behalf of KELE INC. with Certificate of Service, Jury Demand(SHELBY, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 04/10 9:42 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MICHAEL MOZEKO. KELE INC. waiver sent on 3/20/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (HARRISON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
3 3 3 pgs order Order Tue 03/12 8:54 AM
INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR, ON 3/12/24. 3/12/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 03/07 2:54 PM
Summons Issued as to KELE INC.. Forwarded To: Counsel on 3/7/24 (dt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Thu 03/07 1:22 PM
COMPLAINT against KELE INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17313156.), filed by MICHAEL MOZEKO.(HARRISON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Designation Form Case Management Track Designation Form