Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00495
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2024
Last checked: Friday Mar 08, 2024 1:43 AM CST
Defendant
Orvin Morales-Garcia (1)
Represented By
Minerva Torres
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Holly Diane Pavlinski
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/08/2024 5:05 AM CST
Friday, February 09, 2024
Arrest of Orvin Morales-Garcia (drda) [2:24-mj-00367-JAC]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
Warrant Returned Executed as to Orvin Morales-Garcia. (drda) [2:24-mj-00367-JAC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Orvin Morales-Garcia. (drda) [2:24-mj-00367-JAC]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Orvin Morales-Garcia. (drda) [2:24-mj-00367-JAC]
Related: [-]
3 3 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Orvin Morales-Garcia. (drda) [2:24-mj-00367-JAC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Orvin Morales-Garcia. (drda) [2:24-mj-00367-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Orvin Morales-Garcia (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Orvin Morales-Garcia (1).By Judge Joseph A Cordova. (drda) [2:24-mj-00367-JAC]
Related: [-]
4 4 Proceedings held before Judge Joseph A Cordova:Initial Appearance as to Orvin Morales-Garcia held on 2/13/2024 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 2/16/2024 9:00AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Orvin Morales-Garcia (Court Reporter FTR GOLD-MG CIENEGA.) (drda) [2:24-mj-00367-JAC]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Orvin Morales-Garcia; Attorney Minerva Torres for Orvin Morales-Garcia appointed.. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:24-mj-00367-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
6 6 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Orvin Morales-Garcia (Torres, Minerva) [2:24-mj-00367-JAC]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights by Orvin Morales-Garcia (Torres, Minerva) [2:24-mj-00367-JAC]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Orvin Morales-Garcia. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (bot1) [2:24-mj-00367-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
9 9 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Orvin Morales-Garcia (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
11 11 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Orvin Morales-Garcia (bot2)
Related: [-]