Philmar Studios Inc et al v. Patrizio Moi, an individual et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-10377
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-10377
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Victoria S Kaufman |
Case #: | 1:24-ap-01006 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Mar 11, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Cross Defendant
Philmar Studios, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Patrizio Moi, an individual
4770 Von Karman Ave
Newport Beach, CA 92660 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Moi Productions, Inc., a Delaware corporation
3600 Wilshire Blvd Ste 1014
Los Angeles, CA 90010 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Record Plant, Inc., a Delaware corporation
4770 Von Karman Ave
Newport Beach, CA 92660 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Philmar Studios Inc
1032 N. Sycamore
Los Angeles, CA 90038 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Philip Lawrence
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 1:05 PM PDT |
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Wed 08/07 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 08/07/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
Mon 08/05 4:34 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference And Hearing On Order to Show Cause Re: Remand; And Setting Related Deadlines. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 8/5/2024 (PG) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
court
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case)
Fri 08/02 5:15 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Status Hearing to be held on 10/30/2024 at 01:30 PM 21041 Burbank Blvd Woodland Hills, CA 91367 for1 , (LF1) |
||
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
court
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case)
Thu 06/27 2:19 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Status Hearing to be held on 07/31/2024 at 01:30 PM 21041 Burbank Blvd Woodland Hills, CA 91367 for1 , (PG) |
||
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Declaration
Thu 06/20 3:50 PM
Declaration re: of Debra R. Brand re Service of Notice of Removal of Action and Related Documents Filed by Attorney Robert M. Law Offices of Robert M. Yaspan . (Yaspan, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, June 19, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Statement
Wed 06/19 4:03 PM
Statement TRUSTEES STATEMENT RE: ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REMAND AND SETTING RELATED DEADLINES, AND THE REMOVED ACTION Filed by Trustee Chapter 7 Trustee Lawrence Estate. (Kwong, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, June 12, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/13 11:30 AM
|
|
13 | 13
misc
Status report
Thu 06/13 11:24 AM
Status Report (Unilateral) Filed by Defendants Moi Productions, Inc., a Delaware corporation , Patrizio Moi, an individual , The Record Plant, Inc., a Delaware corporation . (PG) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Status report
Wed 06/12 4:42 PM
Status report (Unilateral) Status Report Filed by Plaintiff Philmar Studios Inc . (Frey, Sandford) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Opposition
Wed 06/12 4:04 PM
Opposition to Opposition of Debtor to Remand of Removed Action Filed by Plaintiff Philmar Studios Inc (Frey, Sandford) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
court
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required
Mon 05/20 1:43 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Other - Filer is instructed for future filing not to select "Deferred" but to select "Fee not required" for this type of filing. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (LF1) |
|
Saturday, May 11, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sat 05/11 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 05/11/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)
Thu 05/09 4:57 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference And Hearing On Order To Show Cause Re: Remand And Setting Related Deadlines. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 5/9/2024 (PG) |
|
court
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case)
Thu 05/09 4:59 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Status Hearing to be held on 06/26/2024 at 01:30 PM 21041 Burbank Blvd Woodland Hills, CA 91367 for1 , (PG) |
||
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Thu 03/14 9:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 03/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Proof of service
Wed 03/13 1:09 PM
Proof of service (Amended) Filed by Plaintiff Philmar Studios Inc . (Yaspan, Robert) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Proof of service
Wed 03/13 12:47 PM
Proof of service Filed by Plaintiff Philmar Studios Inc . (Yaspan, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
court
Hearing Set (Other) (AP Case)
Tue 03/12 4:52 PM
Hearing Set Status hearing to be held on 5/8/2024 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 301, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Victoria S. Kaufman (PG) |
|
3 | 3
order
OSC to appear and show cause (BNC-PDF)
Tue 03/12 4:52 PM
Order to Show Cause Re: Remand And Notice of Setting Status Conference (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/12/2024. (PG) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Declaration
Mon 03/11 5:10 PM
Declaration re: of Robert Yaspan Filed by Plaintiff Philmar Studios Inc . (Yaspan, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-25 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 26-50 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 51-75 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 76-100 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 101-125 | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 126-150 | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 151-175 | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 176-184 | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 185-190 | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 191-193 | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 194 | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 195 part 1 | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 195 part 2 | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 195 part 3 | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 195 part 4 | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 196-200 | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 201-212 | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 217-217 part 1 | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 217-217 part 2 | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 218-225 part 1 | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 218-225 part 2 | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 218-225 part 3 | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit 226-252 | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit A | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/11 4:44 PM
Adversary case 1:24-ap-01006. Notice of Removal by Philmar Studios Inc. Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Yaspan, Robert) |