District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Rosemary M Collyer
Case #: 1:14-cv-01967
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2014
Terminated:May 12, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday May 20, 2015 10:31 AM EDT
Defendant
SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL
Defendant
JACOB J. LEW
Represented By
Joel L. McElvain
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By
Joel L. McElvain
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Represented By
Joel L. McElvain
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
SYLVIA M. BURWELL
Represented By
Joel L. McElvain
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Movant
STATE OF ARIZONA
Movant
STATE OF LOUISIANA
Represented By
James D. Caldwell
Louisiana Attorney General
contact info
Movant
STATE OF OKLAHOMA
Represented By
Patrick R. Wyrick
Attorney General Of Oklahoma
contact info
Movant
STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By
Alan McCrory Wilson
Office Of The South Carolina Attorney General
contact info
Movant
STATE OF TEXAS
Movant
STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA
Represented By
Elbert Lin
Office Of The West Virginia Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Represented By
Jonathan Robert Turley
George Washington University Law School
contact info
Eleni Maria Roumel
U.S. House Of Representatives
contact info
Todd Barry Tatelman
U.S. House Of Representatives
contact info
Kerry William Kircher
U.S. House Of Representatives
contact info
Jonathan Turley
George Washington Law School
contact info
William Bullock Pittard, IV
U.S. House Of Representatives
contact info
Isaac Benjamin Rosenberg
U.S. House Of Representatives
contact info
Kimberly Ann Hamm
U.S. House Of Representatives
contact info

GPO Sep 09 2015
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/9/2015. (lcrmc3)
GPO May 12 2016
OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/12/2016. (lcrmc3)

1. Speaker.gov | Fight on House ObamaCare Lawsuit Continues (speaker.gov)
Submitted Tue 03/03/2015
2. Can the House's Obamacare Lawsuit Succeed? (dailysignal.com)
Submitted Mon 11/24/2014
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 18, 2018
88 88 order .Order Fri 05/18 3:00 PM
ORDER vacating the portion of74 this Court's final Order dated May 12, 2016, providing that "reimbursements paid to issuers of qualified health plans for the cost-sharing reductions mandated by Section 1402 of the Affordable Care Act, Pub. L. 111-148, are ENJOINED pending an appropriation for such payments." See Order for details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/18/2018. (lcrmc3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
87 87 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 05/16 12:13 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to75 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by JACOB J. LEW, SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. USCA Case Number 16-5202 (zrdj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 order filed May 16, 2018