|
|
minutes
Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference
Fri 09/20 3:32 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference held on 9/18/2024. Counsel for the parties appeared. Court asked whether the parties consented to trial before the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Court proceeded to provide counsel with Claim Construction and Jury Selection/Trial dates. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts) (aeb)
Related: [-]
|
20
|
|
20
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 09/16 4:43 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of ASUSTeK Computer Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
motion
Dismiss
Fri 09/13 7:06 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Malikie Innovations LTD and Key Patent Innovations LTDs First Amended Complaint by ASUSTeK Computer Inc..(Schmidt, Chris)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Proposed Order
|
18
|
|
18
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/11 6:44 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Caroline Walters on behalf of Malikie Innovations Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10354116. (Walters, Caroline)
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
notice
Notice of Discovery Disclosure
Fri 09/06 9:01 AM
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Key Patent Innovations Limited, Malikie Innovations Limited re P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Fair, Andrea)
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 08/30 12:56 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ASUSTeK Computer Inc., filed by Malikie Innovations Limited, Key Patent Innovations Limited.(Henry, Claire)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1 - 7,956,581,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2 - 8,334,847,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 3 - 9,179,147,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit 4 - 9,292,066,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit 5 - website pages,
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit 6 - '581 Claim Chart,
|
| |
Att: 7
Exhibit 7 - '847 Claim Chart,
|
| |
Att: 8
Exhibit 8 - '147 Claim Chart,
|
| |
Att: 9
Exhibit 9 - '066 Claim Chart
|
15
|
|
15
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Tue 08/27 9:21 AM
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ASUSTeK Computer Inc..(Schmidt, Chris)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Tue 08/27 9:26 AM
Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ASUSTeK Computer Inc. to 9/4/2024. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(CH)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 08/19 10:59 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: In-Person Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2024 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. **NOTE: Only the time has changed. (aeb)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Tue 08/06 12:04 PM
ORDER - Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2024 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/6/2024. (NKL)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Thu 07/25 3:22 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ASUSTeK Computer Inc..(Schmidt, Chris)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Thu 07/25 3:37 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ASUSTeK Computer Inc. to 8/28/2024. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(NKL)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
notice
Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge
Wed 07/17 10:18 AM
NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Michael Matulewicz-Crowley on behalf of Malikie Innovations Limited (Henry, Claire) Modified on 7/17/2024 (NKL)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/12 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Yue Wang on behalf of Malikie Innovations Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10235530. (Wang, Yue)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/08 9:59 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael Matulewicz-Crowley on behalf of Malikie Innovations Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10227123. (Matulewicz-Crowley, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 07/08 9:23 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Naveed S Hasan on behalf of Malikie Innovations Limited (Hasan, Naveed)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 04/29 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Malikie Innovations Limited (Fair, Andrea)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 04/29 10:25 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Malikie Innovations Limited. ASUSTeK Computer Inc. waiver sent on 4/29/2024, answer due 7/29/2024. (Henry, Claire)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/03 2:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Malikie Innovations Limited. ASUSTeK Computer Inc. served on 3/28/2024. (Henry, Claire)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/22 9:10 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to ASUSTeK Computer Inc.. (ch, )
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
notice
Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Fri 03/15 3:26 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Malikie Innovations Limited identifying Interested Party Key Patent Innovations Limited for Malikie Innovations Limited. (Henry, Claire)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 03/15 3:23 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Malikie Innovations Limited. (Henry, Claire)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Fri 03/15 3:22 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Henry, Claire)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/15 3:20 PM
COMPLAINT against ASUSTeK Computer Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10033210.), filed by Malikie Innovations Limited.(Henry, Claire)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 1 - 7,956,581,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 2 - 8,334,847,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit 3 - 9,179,147,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit 4 - 9,292,066,
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit 5 - Best Buy ASUS 2-in-1 Touchscreen Chromebook,
|
| |
Att: 7
Exhibit 6 - '581 Claim Chart,
|
| |
Att: 8
Exhibit 7 - '847 Claim Chart,
|
| |
Att: 9
Exhibit 8 - '147 Claim Chart,
|
| |
Att: 10
Exhibit 9 - '066 Claim Chart
|
|
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/15 3:28 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )
Related: [-]
|
|
|
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Fri 03/15 3:29 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, )
Related: [-]
|