Malikie Innovations Limited v. Acer Inc.
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Referred: | Roy S Payne |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00179 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2024 4:09 AM CDT |
Defendant
Acer Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Malikie Innovations Limited
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Key Patent Innovations Limited
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/20/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 09/13 1:12 PM
Defendant Acer Inc.'s ANSWER to34 Amended Complaint, for Patent Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial by Acer Inc..(Craft, Roger) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/11 6:37 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Caroline Walters on behalf of Malikie Innovations Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10354112. (Walters, Caroline) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
16
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 08/30 4:29 PM
AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER re32 Motion For Entry of Agreed Amended Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/30/2024. (NKL) |
|
34 | 34
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 08/30 1:04 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Acer Inc., filed by Malikie Innovations Limited, Key Patent Innovations Limited.(Henry, Claire) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 8,334,847, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 8,610,397, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - 9,179,147, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - 9,292,066, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - website pages, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - '847 Claim Chart, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - '397 Claim Chart, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - '147 Claim Chart, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - '066 Claim Chart | ||
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Compliance
Thu 08/29 5:07 PM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Acer Inc. Regarding Invalidity Contentions and Subject Matter Eligibility Contentions (Craft, Roger) |
|
32 | 32
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 08/29 11:08 AM
JOINT MOTION For Entry of Agreed Amended Protective Order by Malikie Innovations Limited.(Henry, Claire) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 08/26 4:24 PM
E-DISCOVERY ORDER granting30 Motion for Entry of E-Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/26/2024. (CH) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 08/21 1:36 PM
JOINT MOTION for Entry of E-Discovery Order by Malikie Innovations Limited.(Fair, Andrea) |
|
Att: 1 E-Discovery Order | ||
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
order
Protective Order
Fri 08/09 3:08 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER (Motion(s)26 terminated). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/9/2024. (CH) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Compliance
Fri 08/09 10:19 AM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Malikie Innovations Limited Regarding Initial and Additional Disclosures (Fair, Andrea) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Compliance
Thu 08/08 4:55 PM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Acer Inc. Regarding Initial and Additional Disclosures (Craft, Roger) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 08/08 4:45 PM
JOINT MOTION for Entry of Agreed Protective Order by Malikie Innovations Limited.(Fair, Andrea) |
|
Att: 1 Agreed Protective Order | ||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
8
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order
Mon 08/05 8:55 AM
DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting23 JOINT MOTION For Entry of a Docket Control Order. Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2025 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Jury Selection set for 1/5/2026 at 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Markman Hearing set for 7/10/2025 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne (Motion(s)23 terminated). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/2/2024. (CH) |
|
24 | 24
9
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 08/05 8:51 AM
DISCOVERY ORDER granting22 JOINT MOTION For Entry of a Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/2/2024. (CH) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 08/01 2:25 PM
JOINT MOTION For Entry of a Docket Control Order by Malikie Innovations Limited.(Fair, Andrea) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
22 | 22
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 08/01 2:24 PM
JOINT MOTION For Entry of a Discovery Order by Malikie Innovations Limited.(Fair, Andrea) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference
Fri 07/19 12:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference held on 7/18/2024. Counsel for the parties appeared. Court asked whether the parties consented to trial before the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Court proceeded to provide counsel with Claim Construction and Jury Selection/Trial dates. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts) (aeb) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge
Wed 07/17 10:19 AM
NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Michael Matulewicz-Crowley on behalf of Malikie Innovations Limited (Henry, Claire) Modified on 7/17/2024 (NKL) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 07/15 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stuart Hene on behalf of Acer Inc. (Hene, Stuart) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
Fri 07/12 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Malikie Innovations Limited (Henry, Claire) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/12 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Yue Wang on behalf of Malikie Innovations Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10235547. (Wang, Yue) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Compliance
Wed 07/10 11:45 AM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Malikie Innovations Limited re11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Infringement Contentions (Henry, Claire) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Wed 07/10 8:18 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Acer Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Acer Inc.. (Craft, Roger) |
|
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/10 8:15 AM
Defendant Acer Inc.'s ANSWER to1 Complaint,, for Patent Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial by Acer Inc..(Craft, Roger) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/09 1:39 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Craig R Kaufman on behalf of Acer Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10228277. (Kaufman, Craig) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/08 10:03 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael Matulewicz-Crowley on behalf of Malikie Innovations Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10227125. (Matulewicz-Crowley, Michael) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 07/08 9:25 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Naveed S Hasan on behalf of Malikie Innovations Limited (Hasan, Naveed) |
|
Sunday, June 30, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 07/01 9:31 AM
ORDER granting10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Serve Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/30/2024. (CH) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File
Thu 06/27 1:44 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Serve Infringement Contentions by Malikie Innovations Limited.(Henry, Claire) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order
Tue 06/25 9:25 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2024 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/24/2024. (CH) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 04/29 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Malikie Innovations Limited (Fair, Andrea) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 04/12 3:40 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Malikie Innovations Limited. Acer Inc. waiver sent on 4/11/2024, answer due 7/10/2024. (Henry, Claire) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/03 2:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Malikie Innovations Limited. Acer Inc. served on 3/28/2024. (Henry, Claire) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/22 9:11 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Acer Inc.. (ch, ) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 03/15 3:53 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Malikie Innovations Limited. (Henry, Claire) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Fri 03/15 3:52 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Malikie Innovations Limited identifying Interested Party Key Patent Innovations Limited for Malikie Innovations Limited. (Henry, Claire) |
|
2 | 2
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Fri 03/15 3:50 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Henry, Claire) |
|
1 | 1
16
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/15 3:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Acer Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10033352.), filed by Malikie Innovations Limited.(Henry, Claire) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - 8,334,847, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - 8,610,397, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - 9,179,147, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - 9,292,066, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Best Buy and Walmart - Acer Chromebook 315, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 8 - '847 Claim Chart, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - '397 Claim Chart, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - '147 Claim Chart, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - '066 Claim Chart | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/15 3:50 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Fri 03/15 3:50 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, ) |