Discover Bank v. McGraw
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | John T Copenhaver, Jr |
Referred: | Dwane L Tinsley |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00127 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Jackson County Circuit Court, CC-18-02024-C-17 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 6:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Linda M. McGraw
P. O. Box 747
Ripley, WV 25271 |
|
Plaintiff
Discover Bank
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Proposed Findings and Recommendations By Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/16 4:01 PM
PROPOSED FINDINGS & RECOMMENDATION It is RECOMMENDED that Defendant's1 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs be DENIED as moot and that this case be REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Jackson County, West Virginia. This case is no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. If the PF&R was served electronically, Objections are due by 4/30/2024. If the PF&R was served by mail, Objections are due by 5/3/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 4/16/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
State Court Records
Mon 03/18 4:19 PM
STATE COURT RECORDS from the Circuit Court of Jackson County County. Includes: Docket Sheet, Complaint, Summons, Answer and Other Misc. Documents (ts) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/18 3:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Linda M. McGraw re:2 Notice of Removal (ts) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/18 3:11 PM
AMENDED NOTICE by Linda M. McGraw of Dishonor Affidavit of Truth re:2 Notice of Removal (Attachment: #1 Exhibits 1-7) (ts) |
|
3 | 3
order
Mag. Judge Tinsley - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters
Mon 03/18 9:21 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (klc) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Notice Of Removal
Fri 03/15 4:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Linda M. McGraw with complaint and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Jackson County. (kew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits A-C, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment Of Fees Or Costs
Fri 03/15 4:47 PM
APPLICATION by Linda M. McGraw to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (kew) |
|
utility
Case Assigned
Mon 03/18 9:21 AM
CASE assigned to Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc) |