Ramirez-Torres v. Rokosky
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | David A Faber |
Referred: | Cheryl A Eifert |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00133 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal) |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/26 9:33 AM
ORDER directing Respondent to answer or otherwise respond to the1 Petition by Patricio Ramirez-Torres for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) within 60 days of the entry of this Order showing cause, if any, why the relief sought should not be granted. Petitioner may file a reply to the answer within 60 days after service of same by the Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 3/26/2024. (cc: Petitioner; USA w/2241 Petition) (arb) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 03/25 11:55 AM
Filing Fee: $5.00, Receipt No. 2002322. (arb) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Mag. Judge Eifert - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters
Tue 03/19 9:58 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (klc) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/18 3:10 PM
NOTICE to Petitioner of Failure to Remit Filing Fee. (arb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus (2241)
Mon 03/18 2:45 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Patricio Ramirez-Torres against E. Rokosky, Warden pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2241. (arb) |
|
Att: 1 Continuation - Section 2241 Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Supporting Documentation, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Tue 03/19 9:44 AM
CASE assigned to Senior Judge David A. Faber. (klc) |