Ward v. Carter County Detention Center
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | John T Copenhaver, Jr |
Referred: | Dwane L Tinsley |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00138 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Confirmation Re Opening of Transferred Case
Fri 03/22 12:20 PM
CONFIRMATION from Kentucky Eastern that the case has been opened in that district as 0:24-cv-00035, filed 3/22/2024. (msa) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/22 11:16 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE directing that this matter be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky for additional proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 3/22/2024. (cc: Plaintiff) (msa) |
|
utility
Case Transferred Out To Another District Case No Longer Referred To Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/22 11:38 AM
CIVIL CASE TERMINATED and ELECTRONICALLY TRANSMITTED to the Eastern District of Kentucky pursuant to the3 Order Transferring Case. (msa) |
||
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Mag. Judge Tinsley - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters
Thu 03/21 2:30 PM
STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (klc) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/20 12:27 PM
LETTER-FORM COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (ts) |
|
utility
Case Assigned
Thu 03/21 2:29 PM
CASE assigned to Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc) |