Gary Clapp v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01335 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 15, 2024 5:42 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Ciba Inc 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Plaintiff
Gary Clapp
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 03/22 12:13 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 3/19/2024), Gary Clapp v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-01335-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern Michigan (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/22 12:12 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/22 12:11 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11658522.), filed by Gary Clapp. Service due by 6/17/2024(sshe, ) |