J.P. Morgan Securities LLC v. Parsons et al
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Irene C Berger |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00142 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 7:20 PM EDT |
Defendant
James A. Parsons
|
|
Defendant
Audra R. Pritt
|
|
Plaintiff
J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
5
pgs
order
Order
Thu 03/28 9:17 AM
STIPULATED ORDER resolving temporary restraining order as more fully detailed herein. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 3/28/2024. (cc: counsel of record) (btm) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Order
Wed 03/27 5:59 PM
PROPOSED ORDER Resolving Temporary Restraining Order by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC (Tully, Jared) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate Of Service
Mon 03/25 4:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC for Certificate of Service. (Tully, Jared) |
|
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Hearing on Motion
Mon 03/25 11:06 AM
ORDER setting Hearing on4 MOTION by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC for a Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and an Order Permitting Expedited Discovery for 3/28/2024 at 10:00 AM in Charleston before Judge Irene C. Berger; directing the Plaintiffs ensure that the Defendants are served with the Complaint, Motion and supporting documents and this Order immediately or by 5:00 p.m. today 3/25/2024. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 3/25/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (tmr) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Mag. Judge Aboulhosn - Judge Berger Administrative Order
Fri 03/22 10:57 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (klc) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
17
pgs
respm
Memorandum In Support
Thu 03/21 3:49 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC in support of4 MOTION by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC for a Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and an Order Permitting Expedited Discovery. (kew) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Expedite
Thu 03/21 3:47 PM
MOTION by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC for a Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and an Order Permitting Expedited Discovery. (kew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Rule 7.1, FRCivP
Thu 03/21 3:45 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (kew) |
|
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 03/21 3:44 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James A. Parsons, Audra R. Pritt, re:1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons Issued as to James A. Parsons) (kew) |
|
1 | 1
33
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/21 3:43 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8617392. (kew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons as to Audra R. Pritt, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons as to James A. Parsons, | ||
Att: 3 Receipt, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Fri 03/22 10:56 AM
CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc) |